Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/24/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. Check no. 177709 from Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie. | | |
10/24/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-36595
|
10/25/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 17-36740
|
10/26/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg. | | 17-36886
|
11/08/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 15, 2017, at 10:00 am. | | 17-38484
|
11/15/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Docketing Statement due: November 28, 2017. | | 17-39332
|
11/29/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-41006
|
12/15/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March of 2018. | | 17-43467
|
03/26/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 24, 2018, at 9:00 am. | | 18-11595
|
03/29/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 18-12164
|
05/04/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Mark Simons to replace Andrew Wolf as counsel for the Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate LLC). | | 18-17009
|
05/10/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 18-17913
|
05/11/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 18-18091
|
05/30/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: June 12, 2018. | | 18-20420
|
06/13/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Request for Transcripts. | | 18-22552
|
06/25/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: July 12, 2018. | | 18-24142
|
07/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Request for Transcripts. | | 18-26679
|
08/02/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the request for transcripts; appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 18-29640
|
08/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Determine Appellate Jurisdiction. | | 18-30755
|
08/24/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion for this court to determine its jurisdiction over this appeal. The appeal was properly taken from the amended order. Appellant's transcript request due: 15 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. | | 18-33097
|
09/11/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 18-35329
|
10/05/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address and Law Firm (Richard G. Campbell, Jr.). | | 18-39191
|
10/24/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 18-41768
|
11/01/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 22, 2019. | | 18-42903
|
01/23/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC). | | 19-03429
|
03/05/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on February 21, 2019. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief(s). (SC) | | 19-09758
|
03/05/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-09764
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-09765
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-09766
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-09767
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-09768
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-09769
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC) | | 19-09772
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC) | | 19-09773
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC) | | 19-09774
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-09776
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC) | | 19-09777
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-09778
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-09780
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13. (SC) | | 19-09781
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14. (SC) | | 19-09782
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 15. (SC) | | 19-09783
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 16. (SC) | | 19-09784
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 17. (SC) | | 19-09785
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 18. (SC) | | 19-09786
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 19. (SC) | | 19-09795
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 20. (SC) | | 19-09787
|
03/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 21. (SC) | | 19-09788
|
03/21/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Briefs. (SC) | | 19-12679
|
03/28/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Briefs due: June 3, 2019. (SC). | | 19-13698
|
05/22/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Firm Name Change. (SC) | | 19-22403
|
06/03/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents David Marriner's and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON JUNE 4, 2019). (SC) | | |
06/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 19-24389
|
06/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondents David Marriner's and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-24258
|
06/05/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-24320
|
06/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC) | | 19-24322
|
06/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC) | | 19-24323
|
06/05/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Appendix Vol. 3. (SC) | | 19-24324
|
07/03/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC, CR Cal Neva, LLC; Robert Radovan; William Criswell; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP shall have until July 10, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 19-28462
|
07/11/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC; CR Cal Neva, LLC, Robert Radovan; William Criswell; Cal Neva Lodge, LLC; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED JULY 11, 2019). (SC) | | |
07/11/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-29602
|
07/11/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 19-29649
|
07/11/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC; CR Cal Neva, LLC, Robert Radovan; William Criswell; Cal Neva Lodge, LLC; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-29650
|
07/11/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-29651
|
07/22/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The motion for extensions of time filed on July 11, 2019, are granted. the answering brief of respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC; CR Cal Neva, LLC, Robert Radovan; William Criswell; Cal Neva Lodge, LLC; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP, was filed on July 11, 2019. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days. (SC). | | 19-30797
|
08/21/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File the Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-35143
|
08/27/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 20, 2019. (SC) | | 19-35757
|
09/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File the Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-39409
|
09/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-39731
|
10/01/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of "Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief." | | 19-40849
|
10/16/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: October 21, 2019. (SC) | | 19-42838
|
10/21/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-43582
|
10/22/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
07/30/2020 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish.136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. En Banc. (SC). | | 20-27719
|
08/17/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing to Clarify and Correct the Opinion. (SC) | | 20-30355
|
08/17/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Daniel F. Polsenberg. (SC) | | |
09/25/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). EN BANC. (SC) | | 20-35358
|
10/20/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-38365
|
10/20/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/05/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 10/22/2020. (SC) | | 20-38365
|