Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/30/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Luke Andrew Busby, Ltd. Check no. 8000. | | |
04/30/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 18-16351
|
04/30/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 18-16353
|
05/01/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Docketing Statement + Exhibits | | 18-16437
|
05/01/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. | | 18-16451
|
05/08/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 11, 2018, at 10:00 am. | | 18-17523
|
07/11/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 18-26333
|
07/11/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 18-26462
|
07/17/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/21/17, 9/5/17, 11/1/17, 11/6/17 and 11/14/17. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services and Technologies. | | 18-27091
|
07/17/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/21/17, 9/5/17, 11/1/17, 11/6/17 & 11/14/17. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services and Technologies. | | 18-27323
|
08/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Direct Transmittal of Trial Exhibits. | | 18-33021
|
08/23/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Constance Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/17/17. | | 18-33027
|
08/23/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Carol Hummel stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/14/17. | | 18-33028
|
08/23/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Amy Jo Trevino stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/6/16. | | 18-33030
|
08/23/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Ann Kernan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/21/17. | | 18-33032
|
08/23/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lesley Clarkson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/5/17. | | 18-33034
|
09/07/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. | | 18-35000
|
09/11/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Trial Exhibits. District Court Exhibits due: 15 days. (1. Trial Exhibit 23 - February 10, 2017 Photos of Property flooding w/Declaration; 2. Trial Exhibit 27 - Pictures of 14400 Bihler Rd; 3. Trial Exhibit 28 - Photographs of August 9th 2014 flooding at 14400 Bihler Rd; 4. Trial Exhibit 30 - Melissa Fritz Photos Jan 8-9 2017; 5. Trial Exhibit 45 - Movie "25.mov" ? post January 2017 Storm; 6. Trial Exhibit 46 - Movie "34.mov" ? post January 2017 Storm; 7. Trial Exhibit 47 ? Movie "IMG_2376(1).MOV" Taken by Melissa Fritz January 2017 Storm; 8. Trial Exhibit 48 - Clark Stoner photos May 19, 2017; 9. Trial Exhibit 51 - May 19, 2017 Clark Stoner Videos entitled: vid3; and 10. Trial Exhibit 52 - May 19, 2017 Clark Stoner Videos entitled: vid4.) | | 18-35428
|
09/18/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-36510
|
09/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. | | 18-36514
|
09/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. | | 18-36515
|
09/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. | | 18-36516
|
09/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. | | 18-36518
|
09/19/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. | | 18-36520
|
09/19/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. | | 18-36521
|
09/19/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. | | 18-36522
|
09/19/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Alphabetical Index. | | 18-36523
|
10/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time. (Answering Brief). | | 18-40157
|
10/12/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 19, 2018. | | 18-40160
|
11/13/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address (Washoe County District Attorney's Office). (SC) | | 18-903749
|
11/20/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 18-904910
|
11/20/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix, Volume I. (SC) | | 18-904911
|
11/30/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 18-906406
|
11/30/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/04/2018 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae City of North Las Vegas and Truckee River Flood Management Authority. (SC) | | 18-906812
|
05/31/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC) | | 19-23685
|
06/02/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-23854
|
06/02/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Luke A. Busby | | |
06/03/2019 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Appellants' Amended Certificate of Service: Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-23920
|
07/24/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 19-31183
|
08/07/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent Washoe County's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-33291
|
08/29/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 19-36255
|
09/10/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 19-37854
|
10/11/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC). | | 19-42201
|
10/23/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent Washoe County's Answer to Petition for Rehearing En Banc. (SC) | | 19-43857
|
11/22/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (SC). | | 19-47888
|
11/25/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-48096
|
12/12/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Remittitur. The issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until April 15, 2020. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by April 15, 2020, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellants have filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by April 15, 2020, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. (SC) | | 19-50322
|
01/03/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from the United States Supreme Court. The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kagan, who on December 23, 2019, extended the time to and including March 23, 2020. (SC). | | 20-00434
|
03/31/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Filing of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. (SC). | | 20-12301
|
04/01/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed March 23, 2020, and placed on the docket as Case No. 19-1175. 9SC). | | 20-12433
|
05/11/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SC) | | 20-17659
|
05/14/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Denial of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. (SC) | | 20-18525
|
06/18/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-22739
|
06/18/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/29/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 23, 2020. (SC) | | 20-22739
|