Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/21/2018 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | | |
09/21/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 18-37012
|
09/21/2018 | Other | Chief Justice Michael L Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties. | | |
10/04/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request (Certification Under NRAP 9(A)). | | 18-38915
|
10/11/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 18-39878
|
01/16/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-02539
|
01/31/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 22, 2019. (SC). | | 19-04760
|
02/06/2019 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC) | | |
04/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 19-17573
|
04/25/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 2, 2019. (SC) | | 19-18292
|
05/02/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-19239
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-19241
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-19243
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-19244
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-19245
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-19246
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 19-19247
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC) | | 19-19248
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC) | | 19-19249
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-19250
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 10. (SC) | | 19-19252
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-19254
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-19255
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 13. (SC) | | 19-19258
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 14. (SC) | | 19-19260
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 15. (SC) | | 19-19262
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 16. (SC) | | 19-19266
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 17. (SC) | | 19-19268
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 18. (SC) | | 19-19269
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 19. (SC) | | 19-19271
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 20. (SC) | | 19-19272
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 21. (SC) | | 19-19274
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 22. (SC) | | 19-19278
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 23. (SC) | | 19-19280
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 24. (SC) | | 19-19281
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 25. (SC) | | 19-19283
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 26. (SC) | | 19-19284
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 27. (SC) | | 19-19285
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 28. (SC) | | 19-19288
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 29. (SC) | | 19-19289
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 30. (SC) | | 19-19291
|
05/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 31. (SC) | | 19-19292
|
06/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 19-23877
|
06/19/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until August 2, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 19-26486
|
08/02/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 19-32659
|
08/14/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 1, 2019. (SC). | | 19-34158
|
09/30/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-40419
|
10/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-44446
|
11/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until December 30, 2019, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 19-45787
|
12/27/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-52209
|
12/27/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1 of 1. (SC) | | 19-52210
|
12/27/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
12/29/2020 | Other | Justice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings | | |
01/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC) | | 21-00379
|
12/30/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Pickering. fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, and Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 83. En Banc. (SC) | | 21-37157
|
01/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-01523
|
01/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 17, 2022, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is timely filed, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-01876
|
02/17/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Request Judicial Notice of Court Records. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/17/22) (SC) | | |
02/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/17/22) (SC) | | |
02/17/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. (SC) | | |
02/17/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection - Appellant's Notice Request Judicial Notice of Court Records and Petition for Rehearing. (No Notice of Appearance for Attorney David Anthony.) (SC) | | 22-05358
|
02/17/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Request to Take Judicial Notice of Court Records. (SC) | | 22-05385
|
02/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-05387
|
02/17/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. (SC) | | |
02/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Amicus Curiae (Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice.) (SC) | | 22-05816
|
02/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (SC) | | 22-05817
|
02/22/2022 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice, In Support of Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-05819
|
02/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-06395
|
03/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant has filed a motion for this court to take judicial notice of a different matter that involves the same issues present in the instant appeal in order to demonstrate to this court how the postconviction issues in this appeal play out. The motion is granted. However, upon consideration of the merits, this court will disregard any information that is determined to be inappropriate for consideration. Proposed amicus curiae, Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ), have filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of appellant's petition for rehearing. The motion is granted. The amicus brief was filed on February 22, 2022. (SC). | | 22-07757
|
03/11/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen L. Mishler. (SC) | | 22-07851
|
03/11/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-07852
|
03/24/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[Justice Abbi Silver and Justice Douglas Herndon did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC) | | 22-09198
|
03/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Filing of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. (SC) | | 22-09547
|
04/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. Appellant has now filed a motion to stay issuance of the remittitur pending consideration of filing a writ of certiorari with the United States Supreme Court. The motion is granted. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until August 16, 2022. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by August 16, 2022, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by August 16, 2022, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-10528
|
06/21/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of an Application for an Extension of Time to File Petition for a Writ of Certiorari until August 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-19610
|
06/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a notice informing this court that the time for filing the petition has been extended to August 20, 2022. Accordingly, the stay of the issuance of the remittitur is hereby extended until September 6, 2022. . If the clerk of this court receives written notice by September 6, 2022, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by September 6, 2022, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-20383
|
08/25/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on August 18, 2022 and placed on the docket as Case No. 22-5416. (SC) | | 22-26613
|
11/08/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SC). | | 22-35188
|
11/08/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-35192
|
11/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/30/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-35192
|