Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/24/2013 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
01/24/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 13-02548
|
01/24/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 13-02550
|
01/28/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Response to Notice of Potential Dismissal for Failure to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. | | 13-02802
|
01/28/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 13-02840
|
01/30/2013 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: James Georgeson. | | 13-03178
|
03/21/2013 | Settlement Notice | Filed Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge James Georgeson to file Early Case Assessment Report. | | 13-08455
|
03/26/2013 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | | 13-08907
|
04/02/2013 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 13-09638
|
04/04/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | | 13-09883
|
04/16/2013 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 13-11171
|
04/18/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate that no transcript is being requested. | | 13-11436
|
06/28/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 9, 2013. | | 13-19102
|
07/10/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 13-20116
|
07/10/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | | 13-20117
|
08/06/2013 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. | | 13-23034
|
08/06/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: September 10, 2013. | | 13-23052
|
08/07/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Respondent ESD's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time and Court's Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. | | 13-23128
|
09/10/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent ESD's Answering Brief. | | 13-26620
|
10/11/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: October 17, 2013. | | 13-30379
|
10/18/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 13-31409
|
10/18/2013 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
11/25/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. | | 13-35570
|
11/25/2013 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
12/30/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This appeal may assigned to the court of appeals for disposition. Each party shall have until January 5, 2015, to file a written statement of no more than 500 words. No extensions of time will be granted. | | 14-42434
|
01/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Respondent ESD's Non-Opposition to Transfer of Case to the Court of Appeals. | | 15-00075
|
01/05/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant Goodwin's Statement Opposing Assignment To Appellate Court. | | 15-00137
|
01/08/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Transferring to Court of Appeals. The clerk of this court is directed to assign this appeal to the Court of Appeals of Nevada for disposition. | | 15-00871
|
01/08/2015 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
05/22/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Notice of Change of Address and Telephone Numbers; and, Notice of Change of Attorney of Record for Nevada Employment Security Division. | | 15-900554
|
07/02/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . The Clerk shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 15-900711
|
08/11/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. before the Court of Appeals on October 21, 2015, at the hour of 10:30 a.m., in Reno at the National Judicial College's Model Courtroom. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 15-900901
|
09/25/2015 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Requesting permission to bring a still camera in the courtroom. Nos. 62047/62493/62794. | | 15-901163
|
10/07/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 15-901209
|
10/09/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Request. It is HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news and informational purposes and not for commercial exploitation. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m. | | 15-901221
|
10/21/2015 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals. MG/JT/AS. | | |
03/03/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Silver. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 12. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver. | | |
03/03/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Silver. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 12. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver. | | 16-900259
|
03/21/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
03/21/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review of Court of Appeals Decision. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 5/20/16). | | |
03/21/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
03/21/2016 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
05/12/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/66473 (Letter entered in Docket No. 65424 as document no. 16-14923.) | | |
05/12/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. Letter (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/66473 (Letter entered in Docket No. 66816 as document no. 16-900562.) | | |
05/20/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Striking Petition for Review. Because the petition is not prepared in accordance with NRAP 32, the clerk of this court is directed to strike the petition filed on March 21, 2016. Appellant shall have 10 days within which to file and serve a petition for review that complies with NRAP 32. | | 16-16022
|
06/01/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition For Review Of Court Of Appeals Decision. | | 16-17007
|
06/07/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Attorney of Record, Laurie L. Trotter, Esq, Division Senior Attorney of the Nevada Employment Security Division, in place and stead of Neil A. Rombardo, Esq. | | 16-17629
|
07/21/2016 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." NRAP 40B Cherry, J., dissenting. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] | | 16-22747
|
08/15/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 16-25196
|
08/15/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
08/26/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2016. | | 16-25196
|