Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
04/14/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 14-11924
|
04/14/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 14-11928
|
04/14/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 14-11930
|
04/17/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle. | | 14-12405
|
04/17/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Pezzillo Lloyd check no. 8938. | | |
05/12/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice. Appellant shall, within ten days from the date of this order, file a case appeal statement with the Supreme Court Clerk's Office. Appellant has also failed to file the docketing statement when due. Docketing statement due 10 days. | | 14-15149
|
05/13/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 14-15552
|
05/15/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 14-15820
|
05/15/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge - Docketing Statement. | | 14-15823
|
05/15/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Innovative Home Systems Reponse to Case Appeal Statement. | | 14-15847
|
05/19/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 30, 2014. | | 14-16211
|
05/21/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service -Certificate of Service (Docketing statement served on settlement judge). | | 14-16647
|
07/18/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 14-23449
|
07/21/2014 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 14-23478
|
07/21/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos 65419/66006. | | 14-23518
|
07/21/2014 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals on docket nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-23667
|
07/22/2014 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Appeals. | | 14-23718
|
08/13/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 14-26523
|
09/05/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals, Directing Appellant to Comply with NRAP 9, and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule. Transcript request forms in both appeals due: 5 days. Appellant shall have until October 30, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief addressing the issues in both appeals. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-29408
|
10/15/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Transcript Request Form due: 11 days. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-34287
|
10/21/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend the Briefing Schedule. (First Request) Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-35086
|
10/21/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix Due Date: November 13, 2014. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-35126
|
10/23/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/14/14, 2/06/14 and 5/15/14To Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | | 14-35362
|
11/10/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation To Extend Briefing Schedule (Second Request). Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-36941
|
11/18/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 15, 2014. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-37922
|
12/16/2014 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion For Extension Of Time To File Opening Brief (Brief is attached). Nos. 65419/66006. (DETACHED BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 12/17/14). | | 14-40989
|
12/17/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. We direct the clerk of this court to detach and file the proposed opening brief, attached as exhibit 6 to the motion. Appellant's Appendix due: 3 days. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-41113
|
12/17/2014 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON 12/16/2014 AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 12/17/2014). Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-41116
|
12/22/2014 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol 1. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-41659
|
12/22/2014 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol 2. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-41661
|
12/22/2014 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol 3. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-41698
|
12/22/2014 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol 4. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 14-41700
|
01/16/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: January 26, 2015. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-01787
|
01/16/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplement to Joint Appendix Vol 4. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-01831
|
01/27/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-02874
|
02/25/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: March 5, 2015. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-05983
|
03/05/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-06965
|
03/05/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/27/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This appeal may be assigned to the court of appeals for disposition. Each party shall have until May 11, 2015, to file a written statement of no more than 500 words. No extensions of time will be granted. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-12707
|
05/15/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Transferring Case to Court of Appeals. The clerk of this court is directed to assign this appeal to the Court of Appeals of Nevada for disposition. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-15051
|
05/15/2015 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
07/22/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . The clerk shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-900805
|
08/05/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Pezzillo Lloyd is now Howard & Howard). Nos. 65419/66006. | | 15-900875
|
08/11/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 24, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 15-900905
|
09/10/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 15-901069
|
09/24/2015 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals - MG/JT/AS. | | |
03/10/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Silver. Concurrence: Tao. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Nos. 65419/66006 | | |
03/10/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Silver. Concurrence: Tao. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Nos. 65419/66006 | | 16-900278
|
03/31/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. -Innovative Home Systems, Inc.'s Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 16-900374
|
03/31/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. -$150.00 from Snell & Wilmer L.L.P. Check No. 16308. Nos. 65419/66006. | | |
05/10/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Rehearing/En Banc Reconsideration. . Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 16-900555
|
05/27/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant Timothy Tom's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 16-900653
|
06/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Reply. Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply in support of the petition for rehearing. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 16-900781
|
08/04/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. . "We deny the rehearing petition." NRAP 40(c). TAO, J. concurring. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 16-900903
|
08/29/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
08/29/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 65419/66006. | | 16-26782
|
08/29/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 65419/66006. | | |
08/29/2016 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
08/29/2016 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
09/15/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 1, 2016. | | 16-26782
|