Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/08/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
08/08/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-24510
|
08/08/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 16-24512
|
08/23/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marjorie Hauf. E-Payment Ref. no. 16080845874798. | | |
08/25/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 16-26526
|
08/29/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | | 16-26824
|
09/14/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-28528
|
09/14/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). | | 16-28531
|
09/16/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge). | | 16-28733
|
11/16/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge Stephen Haberfeld to file Early Case Assessment Report. | | 16-35738
|
11/28/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 16, 2016, at 10:30 am. | | 16-36770
|
11/29/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-36843
|
12/02/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-37312
|
12/21/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/02/16, 05/31/16. To Court Reporter: Christine Erickson. | | 16-39600
|
02/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-06790
|
02/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 3, 2017. | | 17-06793
|
03/07/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Christine Erickson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/02/16, 05/31/16. | | 17-07671
|
04/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-11021
|
04/03/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service - Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-11022
|
04/04/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-11161
|
04/11/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 3, 2017. fn1[Given this order, we take no action on the stipulation for an extension of time filed on April 4, 2017.] | | 17-11864
|
05/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Briefs. | | 17-14600
|
05/09/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 11 days. | | 17-15491
|
05/23/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Permission To File Opening Brief In Excess of Thirty Pages. | | 17-17155
|
05/23/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. | | 17-17161
|
05/23/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. | | 17-17163
|
05/23/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. | | 17-17168
|
05/23/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. | | 17-17169
|
05/23/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. | | 17-17171
|
06/02/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct the clerk of this court to reject the opening brief received on May 23, 2017. Opening Brief due: 5 days. | | 17-18361
|
06/08/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-18981
|
07/05/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. | | 17-22135
|
07/05/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 9, 2017. | | 17-22165
|
08/09/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 17-26572
|
08/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. (DETACHED BRIEF FROM MOTION AND FILED PER 8/30/17 ORDER.) | | 17-27430
|
08/30/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion of the International Municipal Lawyers Association (IMLA) for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae is granted. The clerk shall detach the brief from the motion filed on August 16, 2017, and file it separately. | | 17-29106
|
08/30/2017 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. | | 17-29107
|
09/11/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-30319
|
09/11/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
10/19/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. | | 17-35810
|
10/19/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
11/20/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-902453
|
12/13/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Tuesday, January 16, 2018 at 1:30 p.m.. | | 17-902582
|
12/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-902771
|
01/05/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel | | 18-00612
|
01/10/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (Jeffrey Galliher as counsel for the Appellant.) | | 18-900042
|
01/16/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. AS/JT/MG | | |
07/19/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Author: Silver, C.J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Concur/Dissent: Tao. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 49. Court of Appeals/Silver/Tao/Gibbons. | | |
07/19/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Author: Silver, C.J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Concur/Dissent: Tao. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 49. Court of Appeals/Silver/Tao/Gibbons. | | 18-901540
|
08/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
08/13/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-31228
|
08/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
08/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
08/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
08/24/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2018. | | 18-31228
|