Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/12/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial. Check no. 144301. (SC) | | |
02/12/2019 | Filing Fee | Returned Bond Fee $500. Check No. 144302 returned to Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial. (SC) | | |
02/12/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-06492
|
02/12/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-06499
|
02/12/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC). | | 19-06666
|
02/19/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted as the parties have a private mediation scheduled for April 10, 2019. The Settlement Judge will schedule a telephone conference subsequent to the mediation. (SC). | | 19-07772
|
03/05/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-09813
|
04/29/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC). | | 19-18698
|
05/01/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-19074
|
05/15/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC) | | 19-21382
|
05/28/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/12/18 and 12/11/18. To Court Reporter: Debbie Hines. (SC) | | 19-23142
|
06/19/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Debbie Hines stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: None listed. (SC) | | 19-26578
|
07/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 19-30589
|
07/19/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 29, 2019. (SC) | | 19-30646
|
08/28/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-36014
|
09/03/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 12, 2019. (SC). | | 19-36758
|
09/12/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-38300
|
09/26/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 3, 2019. (SC). | | 19-40033
|
10/03/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-41109
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-41111
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-41112
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-41113
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-41114
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-41133
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 19-41116
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC) | | 19-41118
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC) | | 19-41119
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-41120
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 10. (SC) | | 19-41121
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-41124
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-41125
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 13. (SC) | | 19-41126
|
10/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 14. (SC) | | 19-41127
|
10/31/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-44893
|
11/01/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 4, 2019. (SC) | | 19-44910
|
11/25/2019 | Motion | Filed Agreed Motion to Stay or Extend Briefing for 90 Days or, in the Alternative, for a 45 Day Extension to File the Brief of Respondent (Second Request). (SC) | | 19-48043
|
12/12/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant shall have until March 3, 2020, to file either a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal. If no motion or stipulation is to be filed, respondent shall file the answering brief within the same time period. (SC) | | 19-50299
|
03/03/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-08584
|
03/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-08585
|
03/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-08586
|
03/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-08587
|
03/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 4. (SC) | | 20-08588
|
03/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 5. (SC) | | 20-08590
|
03/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 6. (SC) | | 20-08591
|
03/12/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Amended Appendix. (SC) | | 20-09885
|
04/01/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC). | | 20-12470
|
04/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 4, 2020. (SC). | | 20-12514
|
05/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-16841
|
05/05/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay. (SC) | | 20-31082
|
08/31/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." NNP20-RP/JH/EC (SC) | | 20-32030
|
09/25/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 5/10/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 20-35335
|
09/25/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 5/10/22 ORDER). (SC) | | |
10/12/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 30, 2020. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 5/10/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 20-35335
|
03/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Move to Reinstate Appeal. (SC) | | 21-06898
|
03/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant requests this court extend the time to move to reinstate the appeal to 30 days after disposition of the creditors' appeal, because it is possible the decision on the bankruptcy appeal could affect how the parties decide to proceed on the instant appeal. The motion is granted. Appellant shall have 30 days from a final decision on the appeal in In Re Tonopah Solar Energy, LLC, Case No. 20-11884- KBO, ECF No. 307, (Bankr. D. Del. Dec. 23, 2021), to move to reinstate this appeal. (SC) | | 21-08019
|
04/29/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeal. (SC) | | 22-13621
|
05/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur and Reinstating Appeal. Appellant has timely filed its motion for reinstatement. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur and reinstate appellant's appeal. (SC) | | 22-14804
|
09/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefs and Supplementation of Appendix. Appellant: Supplemental Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date Appellant's Supplemental Brief is filed to file and serve Responding Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-27686
|
09/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice. (SC) | | 22-28190
|
09/09/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC) | | 22-28234
|