Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/28/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
02/28/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-09152
|
03/15/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 19-11675
|
03/20/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 19-12441
|
06/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-27531
|
07/03/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief due: September 26, 2019. (SC). | | 19-28536
|
09/26/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-40130
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-40131
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-40133
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-40135
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-40136
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-40138
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 19-40139
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC) | | 19-40141
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC) | | 19-40143
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellnat's Appendix Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-40145
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 10. (SC | | 19-40146
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-40147
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-40148
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 13. (SC) | | 19-40149
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 14. (SC) | | 19-40151
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 15. (SC) | | 19-40152
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 16. (SC) | | 19-40153
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 17. (SC) | | 19-40155
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 18. (SC) | | 19-40156
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 19. (SC) | | 19-40157
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 20. (SC) | | 19-40159
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 21. (SC) | | 19-40160
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 22. (SC) | | 19-40161
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 23. (SC) | | 19-40163
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 24. (SC) | | 19-40164
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 25. (SC) | | 19-40166
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 26. (SC) | | 19-40168
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 27. (SC) | | 19-40169
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 28. (SC) | | 19-40170
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 29. (SC) | | 19-40171
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 30. (SC) | | 19-40172
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 31. (SC) | | 19-40175
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 32. (SC) | | 19-40176
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 33. (SC) | | 19-40178
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 34. (SC) | | 19-40179
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 35. (SC) | | 19-40180
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 36. (SC) | | 19-40181
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 37. (SC) | | 19-40182
|
09/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 38. (SC) | | 19-40183
|
09/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to file Under Seal. (SC) | | 19-40185
|
09/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Transmit Select DVD Filed as Exhibit 146 with Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (SC) | | 19-40186
|
09/26/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Appendix Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit 146. (SC) | | 19-40187
|
10/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant (American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/24/19). (SC) | | 19-41054
|
10/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion of Nevada Attorneys For Criminal Justice (NACJ) for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellant's Appeal From Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction). (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/24/19). (SC) | | 19-41065
|
10/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion of the Clark County Public Defender (CCPD), Clark County Special Public Defender (SPD), Nevada State Public Defender (NSPD), Washoe County Alternate Public Defender (APD), and Washoe County Public Defender (WCPD) for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Supporting Exemption of Severely Mentally Ill Persons from the Death Penalty. (SC) | | 19-41080
|
10/03/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of the Clark County Public Defender (CCPD), Clark County Special Public Defender (SPD), Nevada State Public Defender (NSPD), Washoe County Alternate Public Defender (APD), and Washoe County Public Defender (WCPD) Supporting Exemption of Severely Mentally Ill Person from the Death Penalty. (SC) | | 19-41082
|
10/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion of Nevada Law Professors For Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Support of Appellant. (SC) | | 19-41157
|
10/03/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of Nevada Law Professors. (SC) | | 19-41158
|
10/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief for Amicus Curiae The American Bar Association in Support of Appellant and Reversal. (SC) | | 19-41690
|
10/16/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions and Directing Transmission of Exhibit. The clerk shall file the portion of volume 37 received on September 30, 2019, under seal. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court original Exhibit 146 to appellant's petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed on May 5, 2011, consisting of three DVDs. fn1[This court takes no action on appellant's September 26, 2019, notice of manual filing as no relief is requested therein.] (SC) | | 19-42861
|
10/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed SEALED - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 37. (SC) | | |
10/16/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 19-42872
|
10/24/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall detach the proposed brief from the motion filed by the American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada Foundation and the America Civil Liberties Union Foundation, and file it separately. The clerk shall detach the proposed brief from the motion filed by the Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice and file it separately. The briefs of the Nevada Law Professors, and the public defender offices were filed on October 3, 2019. The clerk shall file the brief of the American Bar Association received on October 8, 2019. Respondent shall have until December 12, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 19-44027
|
10/24/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant (American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada Foundation and the America Civil Liberties Union Foundation). (SC) | | 19-44040
|
10/24/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief - Nevada Attorneys For Criminal Justice. (SC) | | 19-44041
|
10/24/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of the American Bar Association in Support of Appellant and Reversal. (SC) | | 19-44042
|
10/31/2019 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document - "Appellant's Pro Se Motion to Dismiss." (SC) | | 19-44759
|
12/12/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-50498
|
01/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-01347
|
01/22/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 10, 2020. (SC). | | 20-03033
|
03/10/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-09526
|
03/11/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/27/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-02698
|
02/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time within which to file Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-04921
|
02/23/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 16, 2022, to file and serve any petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-05924
|
03/16/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-08431
|
03/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-09416
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: April 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-10972
|
04/22/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-12808
|
05/18/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-15757
|
05/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Filing of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. (SC) | | 22-16222
|
05/31/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until October 11, 2022. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by October 11, 2022, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by October 11, 2022, the remittitur shall issue. (SC) | | 22-17194
|
08/15/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court in regards to extension given within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari. Extended to October 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-25473
|
09/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Stay of Remittitur. The stay of issuance of the remittitur is hereby extended until October 31, 2022. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by October 31, 2022, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by October 31, 2022, the remittitur shall issue. (SC) | | 22-29310
|
10/31/2022 | Motion | Filed appellant's Motion to Extend Stay of Remittitur Pending Final Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. (SC) | | 22-33975
|
11/14/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay issuance of Remittitur. Appellant has now filed a motion representing that he filed a petition on October 15, 2022, and asking to stay issuance of the remittitur pending final disposition of that petition. Appellant's motion is granted. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. (SC) | | 22-35741
|
01/13/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SC). | | 23-01377
|
01/13/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/13/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-01380
|
01/27/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on January 19, 2022. (SC) | | 23-01380
|