Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/30/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
04/30/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-16280
|
04/30/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-16282
|
04/30/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 18-16284
|
05/01/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 18-16402
|
05/03/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Brenske & Andreevski. Check no. 8343. | | |
05/03/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-16953
|
05/04/2018 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 8345 returned to Brenske & Andressvski. | | |
05/07/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 18-17187
|
05/08/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Brenske & Andreevski. Check no. 8357. | | |
05/24/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-19885
|
09/17/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. | | 18-36206
|
09/17/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation To Extend Time In Which To File Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-36205
|
09/24/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 2, 2018. | | 18-37316
|
10/03/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-38715
|
10/03/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume I. | | 18-38716
|
10/03/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume II. | | 18-38718
|
10/03/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume III. | | 18-38724
|
10/03/2018 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IV. | | 18-38725
|
11/07/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Stipulation to Extend Time in Which to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 18-903252
|
11/13/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 3, 2018. (SC). | | 18-903753
|
12/04/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 18-906853
|
12/06/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 18-907378
|
01/29/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief. | | |
03/07/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 19-10258
|
03/07/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
03/07/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/22/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing and Inviting Participation by Amicus Curiae. Both parties shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve their supplemental briefs. Additionally, this court has determined that briefing by amicus curiae may assist the court in addressing the above issue. Therefore, the Nevada Justice Association and the Las Vegas Defense Lawyers are invited to participate as amicus curiae in this proceeding and to file a brief addressing the issue outlined above. Should these organizations elect to participate as amicus curiae, they shall file and serve an amicus brief within 90 days of this order that complies with the requirements of NRAP 32(a)(4)-(7). Thereafter, appellant and respondent shall each have 20 days from the expiration of the 90-day period to submit one supplemental brief in response to any briefs filed by amicus curiae. (COA). | | 19-35250
|
11/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (COA) | | 19-47482
|
11/20/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (COA) | | 19-47490
|
11/20/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (COA) | | 19-47520
|
11/20/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 11/20/19). (SC) | | |
11/20/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 11/20/19). (COA). | | 19-47550
|
11/20/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief of the Las Vegas Defense Lawyers in Support of Appellant. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/21/19). (COA) | | |
11/21/2019 | Brief | Filed Errata to Amicus Curiae Brief of The Las Vegas Defense Lawyers. (COA) | | 19-47808
|
11/21/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Amicus Brief (Defense Lawyers. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (COA) | | 19-47826
|
11/22/2019 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief of The Las Vegas Defense Lawyers in Support of Respondent. (COA) | | 19-47975
|
12/10/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant And Respondent's Stipulation To Extend Time In Which To File Supplemental Briefs. (COA) | | 19-50078
|
12/11/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this appeal. Accordingly, the appeal will be scheduled for oral argument on February 18, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. We previously invited amicus curiae participation from the Nevada Justice Association and the Las Vegas Defense Lawyers, and both filed briefs as requested. We now invite both amicus curiae to participate in oral argument as well. Accordingly, each party shall have 15 minutes to present oral argument respecting their positions on appeal and each amicus curiae shall have 15 minutes to present oral argument respecting their positions. The oral argument shall be limited to a total of 60 minutes. (COA). | | 19-50173
|
12/20/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. The parties shall each have until January 3, 2020, to file and serve a supplemental brief in response to the briefs of amicus curiae. (COA). | | 19-51541
|
01/03/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Response to Amicus Briefs. (COA) | | 20-00394
|
01/03/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Supplemental Brief and Amicus Curiae. (COA) | | 20-00412
|
02/05/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 20-04949
|
02/18/2020 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals Court. 75688-COA. COA-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
02/28/2020 | Other | Justice James W. Hardesty disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
02/28/2020 | Other | Justice James W. Hardesty disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
07/30/2020 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Bulla, J. Majority: Bulla/Gibbons/Tao. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. | | 20-27744
|
07/30/2020 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Bulla, J. Majority: Bulla/Gibbons/Tao. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
08/17/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. (SC) | | 20-30297
|
08/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
09/15/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice No Longer Disqualified. Upon further review, Justice Hardesty is no longer disqualified and will be participating in the decision of this appeal. (SC). | | 20-33865
|
09/15/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the law firm of Robison, Sharp, Sullivan & Brust previously represented me (Justice Hardesty) in an unrelated matter for which I do not believe disqualification is required. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes disqualification is appropriate may file a motion to disqualify pursuant to NRAP 35. Any motion to disqualify must be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this voluntary disclosure. (SC) | | 20-33870
|
10/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 20-36895
|
10/19/2020 | Petition/Writ | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC) | | 20-38282
|
11/06/2020 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC). | | 20-40667
|
11/06/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-40691
|
11/06/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/11/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 16, 2020. (SC) | | 20-40691
|