Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/31/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived - Criminal. (SC) | | |
05/31/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and notice of briefing schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-23779
|
06/18/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/25/17. (SC) | | 19-26249
|
06/19/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 19-26569
|
09/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (1st Request). (SC) | | 19-40652
|
10/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 30, 2019. (SC) | | 19-41982
|
12/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 19-52374
|
01/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 13 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-01070
|
02/11/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion and Stipulation to Request to Stay the Appeal and Remand this Matter to the District Court for Entry of Plea. (SC) | | 20-05742
|
03/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The parties have filed a stipulation seeking to remand this appeal to the district court in order that appellant can enter a plea of guilty. This court declines to remand this matter at this time. Appellant's counsel shall have 28 days from the date of this order to comply with the procedures set forth in NRAP 12A, inform this court that the district court has denied the requested relief, inform this court of the status of the district court proceedings, or to file a motion or stipulation to voluntarily withdraw this appeal. The briefing of this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 20-08799
|
03/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Procedures Set Forth in NRAP 12A. (SC). | | 20-10831
|
03/26/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 2, 2020, to comply with the procedures set forth in NRAP 12A, inform this court that the district court has denied the requested relief, inform this court of the status of the district court proceedings, or to file a motion or stipulation to voluntarily withdraw this appeal. The briefing schedule shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 20-11656
|
06/02/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Procedures Set Forth in NRAP 12A. (SC) | | 20-20678
|
06/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Limited Remand and to Withdraw Motion for Extension of Time to Comply With NRAP 12A. (SC) | | 20-21014
|
06/15/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand. Appellant has filed a motion to remand this appeal to the district court. Appellant's motion is granted. District Court Order due: 30 days. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the amended judgment. If any amended judgment of conviction renders this appeal unnecessary, appellant shall have 14 days thereafter to file a motion to withdraw this appeal. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant's request to withdraw the motion filed on June 2, 2020, is granted. This court will take no action in regard to that motion. (SC). | | 20-22188
|
07/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time for Limited Remand Due to Quarantine and to Transfer Appellant. (SC). | | 20-26034
|
07/20/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Motion for Extension of Time for Limited Remand Due to Quarantine and to Transfer Appellant. (SC). | | 20-26349
|
08/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has moved for an extension of time for the district court to enter its order. The motion is granted. The district court shall have until September 14, 2020, to either enter an amended judgment of conviction or inform this court, in writing, that it will not be entering an amended judgment of conviction. Upon entry of an amended judgment of conviction, the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the amended judgment. If any amended judgment of conviction renders this appeal unnecessary, appellant shall have 14 days thereafter to file a motion to withdraw this appeal. (SC) | | 20-28733
|
09/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 20-33781
|
09/15/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on September 4, 2020. No amended judgment of conviction will be filed, defendant will proceed with the appeal. (SC) | | 20-33846
|
09/17/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC) | | 20-34249
|
11/16/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC). | | 20-41744
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 1 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41750
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 2 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41755
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 3 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41756
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 4 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41757
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 5 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41760
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 6 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41761
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 7 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41762
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 8 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41764
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 9 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41767
|
11/16/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 10 of 10. (SC). | | 20-41770
|
12/16/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Karen Mishler, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for respondent). (SC) | | 20-45482
|
12/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 20-45483
|
12/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 15, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-45832
|
01/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-01183
|
02/10/2021 | Other | Justice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings | | |
02/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (1st Request). (SC) | | 21-04568
|
02/17/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: April 2, 2021. (SC). | | 21-04700
|
04/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-09492
|
04/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Supplement Appendix. (SC) | | 21-10068
|
04/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 21-10069
|
04/07/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-10071
|
04/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions requesting a second extension of time to file the reply brief and to supplement the appendix are granted. The reply brief and supplemental appendix Volume 11 were filed on April 7, 2021. (SC) | | 21-10958
|
04/15/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/04/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice for Change of Attorneys for Appellant. (SC) | | 21-31693
|
02/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP22 - AS/EC/KP. (SC) | | 22-06105
|
03/21/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-08734
|
03/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08734
|