Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/11/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
06/11/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-25205
|
06/11/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 19-25209
|
06/19/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel and Directing Transmission of Record. The clerk of this court shall transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Appellant's Notice of Appearance of Counsel or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. fn1[A copy of the district court order appealed from is attached.] (SC) | | 19-26419
|
06/26/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/30/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC) | | 19-27466
|
06/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Funds. (SC) | | 19-27471
|
06/28/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC) | | 19-27874
|
06/28/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - VOL 2. (SC) | | 19-27882
|
06/28/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - VOL 3. (SC) | | 19-27883
|
06/28/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's pro se request for transcripts and motion for funds. This appeal has been referred to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for evaluation for appointment of pro bono counsel, and the deadlines for filing of documents have been suspended. (SC) | | 19-27951
|
07/01/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-28231
|
07/05/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 1-5, 6-8, 580-582, 588-589 (SEALED). (SC) | | |
08/15/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Stephanie Zinna as counsel for the Appellant). (SC). | | 19-34326
|
08/20/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Transcript Request due: 14 days; Opening Brief due: 90 days. (SC). | | 19-34778
|
11/12/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief due: December 2, 2019. (SC). | | 19-46332
|
12/02/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-48727
|
12/09/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 16, 2020. (SC). | | 19-49840
|
01/16/2020 | Brief | Filed Larry Porchia's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-02334
|
02/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-05577
|
02/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: March 31, 2020. (SC). | | 20-06429
|
03/31/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' City of Las Vegas, Stephen Massa, and Nicholas Pavelka's Answering Brief. (SC). | | 20-12378
|
04/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Reply Brief. (SC). | | 20-16100
|
04/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: June 1, 2020. (SC). | | 20-16136
|
06/01/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-20558
|
06/02/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
07/21/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 20-26640
|
07/21/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
07/21/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Preparation of Transcript. Transcript Video Services' Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 28 days. We direct the district court clerk to transmit a copy of the transcript to this court as a supplement to the record within 7 days of the district court's receipt of the transcript. (SC) | | 20-31134
|
09/14/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (Supplemental) Vol 4 (SC) | | 20-33752
|
09/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on October 27, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Oral argument will be held in Las Vegas or by videoconference, depending on current public health conditions. The Clerk of the Court will notify the parties by October 13, 2020, as to whether the argument will be in person or conducted via videoconference. On or before September 28, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. fn1[The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. If argument is conducted by videoconference, the attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument.] (COA) | | 20-34010
|
09/17/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:4/30/2019 (SC) | | 20-34260
|
10/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This case is currently scheduled for oral argument on October 27, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (COA) | | 20-37256
|
10/27/2020 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. 78954-COA. COA20-MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
12/16/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 20-45504
|
12/16/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
12/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent City of Las Vegas' Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (COA) | | 20-46697
|
01/04/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 21-00108
|
01/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. The respondents filed a motion in the Court of Appeals requesting that the order of affirmance be published as an opinion. We conclude that a response is warranted. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve a response to the motion to publish. (SC) | | 21-02337
|
02/09/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Answer to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 21-03875
|
02/17/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Publish. On December 28, 2020, the City of Las Vegas moved this court to reissue the order as a published opinion. we deny the motion to publish. (COA). | | 21-04663
|
02/17/2021 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA). | | |
03/19/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review. Having considered the petition for review and answer to the petition, we have determined that our review is warranted. Accordingly, we grant the petition for review. EN BANC. (SC) | | 21-07978
|
03/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's supplemental opening brief due: 30 days. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief, if warranted. (SC) | | 21-07980
|
04/16/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: May 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-11107
|
05/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 21-12593
|
05/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Stipulation. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental brief. (SC) | | 21-13123
|
05/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-14060
|
06/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15902
|
06/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Las Vegas, Massa, and Pavelka shall have until July 14, 2021, to file and serve the supplemental answering brief. (SC) | | 21-16326
|
06/09/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Appearance for Rebecca Wolfson. (SC) | | 21-16608
|
07/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-20341
|
07/29/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's supplemental reply brief due: August 12, 2021. (SC) | | 21-21962
|
08/12/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellans's Supplemental Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-23559
|
02/17/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part, and Remanded." Before the Supreme Court, En Banc. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Parraguirre, Hardesty, Stiglich, Cadish, Silver, Pickering, Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. (SC) | | 22-05252
|
03/14/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-07979
|
03/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-07979
|