Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/13/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/13/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-25596
|
06/13/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-25598
|
06/13/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-25601
|
06/14/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC0 | | |
06/19/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from McFarling Law Group. Check no. 6616. (SC) | | |
06/20/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 19-26696
|
06/24/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 06/24/19). (SC) | | |
06/24/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Case Appeal Statement). (SC) | | 19-27181
|
06/25/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC). | | 19-27382
|
06/28/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 19-28049
|
07/01/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Case Appeal Statement). (SC) | | 19-28149
|
07/10/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC). | | 19-29292
|
07/11/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program and Reinstating Briefing Pursuant to NRAP3E. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent: 21 days from fast track statement to file fast track response. (SC). | | 19-29439
|
07/12/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 25, 2019. (SC). | | 19-29680
|
07/22/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-30795
|
07/22/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/9/19. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 19-30796
|
07/22/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Remand for Limited Purpose. (SC) | | 19-30798
|
07/29/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Limited Remand and Suspending Briefing Schedule. Appellant has moved to remand this case to the district court for the limited purpose of allowing the court to decide a motion concerning which school the parties' child will attend during the upcoming school year. Attached to the motion is a July 19, 2019, district court order certifying, under NRCP 62.1, the district court's intent to decide the motion if this court grants the remand and tentatively setting an evidentiary hearing for August 5, 2019. Appellant and respondent shall have 21 days from the August 5 hearing date to notify this court of the district court's decision on the school choice motion. (SC) | | 19-31750
|
08/09/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/09/19. (SC). | | 19-33624
|
08/13/2019 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on August 7, 2019. Notice of Entry of Order. (SC) | | 19-34024
|
08/16/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing Pursuant to NRAP 3E. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days; Respondent shall have 21 days from the date appellant's fast track statement is served to file and serve the fast track response. (SC). | | 19-34514
|
08/23/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Outcome of Proceedings. (SC) | | 19-35427
|
09/16/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: September 23, 2019. (SC) | | 19-38596
|
09/23/2019 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 19-39570
|
09/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-39571
|
09/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-39573
|
09/23/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-39575
|
11/12/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent's Fast Track Response due: 7 days. (SC) | | 19-46180
|
11/19/2019 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Child Custody Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 19-47384
|
11/20/2019 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
05/29/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 20-20255
|
05/29/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
05/29/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
07/23/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for an evidentiary hearing consistent with this order." Tao, J., dissenting. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. | | 20-26871
|
07/23/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for an evidentiary hearing consistent with this order." Tao, J., dissenting. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
08/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
08/17/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-30229
|
08/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/04/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 18, 2020. (SC) | | 20-30229
|