Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/05/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
08/05/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-32838
|
08/05/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-32842
|
08/08/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC). | | 19-33474
|
08/29/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-36196
|
09/05/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 10, 2019. | | 19-37178
|
09/08/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-37481
|
10/10/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 14, 2019. (SC) | | 19-41990
|
11/25/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 19-48066
|
11/26/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-48375
|
12/09/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 19-49858
|
02/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time For Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-07573
|
03/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 25, 2020. (SC). | | 20-08298
|
03/25/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-11545
|
03/25/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 (Pt 1) (REJECTED PER 3/26/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | 20-11546
|
03/26/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-11561
|
03/28/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1-2. (SC) | | 20-11931
|
04/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-12775
|
04/03/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief Due May 25, 2020. (SC) | | 20-12824
|
05/21/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-19470
|
06/19/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 6, 2020. (SC). | | 20-22910
|
07/06/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-24890
|
07/07/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Amended Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-24891
|
07/07/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
07/27/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 20-27137
|
07/27/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
07/27/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
12/30/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the district court's summary judgement for U.S. Bank and remand this matter for further proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 20-46920
|
12/30/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the district court's summary judgement for U.S. Bank and remand this matter for further proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
01/19/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 21-01565
|
01/21/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
01/21/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
01/21/2021 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Appellant's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-03443
|
02/18/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 21-04914
|
04/23/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review. (SC) | | 21-11724
|
04/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief, if warranted. The supplemental briefs shall comply with NRAP 28, 28.2, and 32. (SC) | | 21-11915
|
04/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Clarification and Extension of Time. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/3/21)(SC) | | |
05/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-12552
|
05/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Maria A. Gall. (SC) | | 21-13033
|
05/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Clarification and Extension of Time. (SC) | | 21-13035
|
05/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On April 26, 2021, this court entered an order directing supplemental briefing in this appeal. Respondent has now filed a motion for clarification of that order and for an extension of time to file its supplemental brief. Appellant Daniel Lakes shall have until May 26, 2021, to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Thereafter, respondent U.S. Bank Trust shall have 30 days from service of Lakes's supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Lakes shall then have 15 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief, if deemed warranted. The supplemental briefs shall comply with NRAP 28, 28.2, and 32. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file its supplemental brief is denied. (SC) | | 21-14369
|
05/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-15172
|
06/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel Stephanie J. Peel, Esq.(SC) | | 21-17337
|
06/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel Gilbert Charles Dickey, Esq. (SC) | | 21-17339
|
06/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Associate Counsel. Respondent has filed motions to associate attorneys Stephanie J. Peel and Gilbert Charles Dickey, both of McGuire Woods, LLP, in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. . Ms. Peel and Mr. Dickey shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondent in this appeal. Nevada attorney Maria Gall of Ballard Spahr, LLP shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. Peel and Mr. Dickey in this matter. (SC) | | 21-18354
|
06/25/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-18404
|
07/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation to Appear as Amicus Curiae and File a Brief in Support of Respondent. (SC) | | 21-19156
|
07/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (SC) | | 21-19157
|
07/09/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief due: July 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19823
|
07/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-21634
|
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of respondent. The motion is granted. NRAP 29(a). The amicus brief was filed on July 2, 2021. (SC) | | 21-29907
|
12/30/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 85. En Banc. (SC). | | 21-37160
|
01/24/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-02298
|
01/24/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-02298
|