Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/23/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
08/23/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-35413
|
08/23/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-35416
|
08/23/2019 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms. (SC) | | |
08/26/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 19-35684
|
08/28/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kemp, Jones & Coulthard. Check no. 74621. (SC) | | |
09/09/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/10/19, 04/11/19. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. (SC) | | 19-37708
|
09/13/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-38409
|
09/13/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appendix to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-38410
|
10/04/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Extend Briefing Schedule for Case No. 78341 (78341/79464). (SC) | | 19-41225
|
10/09/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/10/19 and 04/11/19. (SC) | | 19-41889
|
10/24/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. These appeals and cross-appeal shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Appellant/cross-respondent in Docket No. 78341 (Schwartz) shall have until November 15, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief on appeal. Adelson shall have until January 14, 2020, to file and serve a single combined answering brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, opening brief on cross appeal, and opening brief in Docket No. 79464. Schwartz shall then have 30 days from service of Adelson's combined brief to file and serve a single combined reply brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, answering brief on cross-appeal, and answering brief in Docket No. 79464. Adelson shall then have 14 days from service of Schwartz's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief in Docket No. 79464. nOS. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 19-43992
|
11/15/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Second Motion for Extension To File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC). | | 19-47021
|
11/21/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Nos. 78341/79464. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until December 16, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and appendix. Given this extension, respondent/cross-appellant in Docket No. 78341 (Adelson) shall have until February 13, 2020, to file and serve a single combined answering brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, opening brief on cross-appeal, and opening brief in Docket No. 79464. Schwartz will then have 30 days from service of Adelson's combined brief to file and serve a single combined reply brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, answering brief on cross-appeal, and answering brief in Docket No. 79464. Adelson shall then have 14 days from service of Schwartz's combined brief to file and serve a single reply brief in support of the cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341 and in support of the appeal in Docket No. 79464, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 19-47707
|
12/16/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Third Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 19-50943
|
12/19/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Schwartz shall have until December 30, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and appendix. Respondent/cross-appellant in Docket No. 78341 (Adelson) shall have until February 27, 2020, to file and serve a single combined answering brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, opening brief on cross-appeal, and opening brief in Docket No. 79464. Schwartz will then have 30 days from service of Adelson's combined brief to file and serve a single combined reply brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, answering brief on cross-appeal, and answering brief in Docket No. 79464. Adelson shall then have 14 days from service of Schwartz's combined brief to file and serve a single reply brief in support of the cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341 and in support of the appeal in Docket No. 79464, if deemed necessary. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 19-51336
|
12/30/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Fourth Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 19-52430
|
01/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant in Docket No. 78341 (Adelson) shall have until March 27, 2020, to file and serve a single combined answering brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, opening brief on cross-appeal, and opening brief in Docket No. 79464. Schwartz shall have until January 29, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and appendix. Schwartz will then have 30 days from service of Adelson's combined brief to file and serve a single combined reply brief on appeal in Docket No. 78341, answering brief on cross-appeal, and answering brief in Docket No. 79464. Adelson shall then have 14 days from service of Schwartz's combined brief to file and serve a single reply brief in support of the cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341 and in support of the appeal in Docket No. 79464, if deemed necessary. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-01077
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04075
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04076
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04078
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04080
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04081
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04082
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 7. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04083
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 8, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04084
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 9. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04085
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 10. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04086
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 11. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04087
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 11. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04088
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 12. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04089
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 13. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04091
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 14. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04092
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 15. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04093
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 16. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04094
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 17. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04095
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 18. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04096
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 19, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04097
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 20, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04098
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 21, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04100
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 22. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04101
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 22. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04102
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 23, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04103
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 24. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04104
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 25, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04106
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 26, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04107
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 27, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04108
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 28, Part 1. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04109
|
01/29/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix - Volume 29. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04110
|
01/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Order Requiring Transmission of Physical Trial Exhibit from District Court. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04113
|
01/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limit for Opening Brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04114
|
01/29/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant Schwartz's Opening Brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-04115
|
02/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant/cross-respondent's motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The opening brief was filed on January 29, 2020. District Court's Trial Exhibit 1116A due: 14 days. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC). | | 20-05176
|
03/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Combined Brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-11597
|
04/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Combined Brief due: May 26, 2020. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC). | | 20-12766
|
05/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Second Motion for Extension to File Combined Brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC). | | 20-19876
|
06/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until June 26, 2020, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341, and opening brief in Docket No. 79464. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-21032
|
06/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Third Motion for Extension to File Combined Brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-23825
|
06/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Third Motion for Extension to File Combined Brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-23826
|
07/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until July 27, 2020, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-24755
|
07/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limit for Combined Answering Brief/Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal and Appellant's Opening Brief in Case No. 79464. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-27338
|
07/27/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (No. 78341) and Opening Brief on Appeal (No. 79464). Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-27339
|
07/27/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1 - Pages 1-47. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-27342
|
07/27/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (No. 78341) and Opening Brief on Appeal (No. 79464). Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-27343
|
07/27/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1 - Pages 1-47. Nos. 7834179464. (SC) | | 20-27344
|
07/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant's (Adelson) motion to exceed the type-volume limit is granted. Adelson's combined answering brief and opening brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341, and opening brief in Docket No. 79464 and appendix were filed on July 27, 2020. Appellant/cross-respondent (Schwartz) shall have until August 26, 2020, to file a single combined reply brief and answering brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341, and answering brief in Docket No. 79464. Any combined brief filed by Schwartz shall not exceed 60 pages or 28,000 words. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-28068
|
08/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-31539
|
09/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent A. Jonathan Schwartz's motion for an extension of time to file the combined reply brief and answering brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341, and answering brief in Docket No. 79464 is granted. Schwartz shall have until October 26, 2020, to file and serve the combined brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-32557
|
10/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-39225
|
11/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent A. Jonathan Schwartz's combined reply brief and answering brief on cross-appeal due: December 28, 2020. Nos 78341/79464. (SC) | | 20-40677
|
12/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent A. Jonathan Schwartz's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 79464/78341. (SC) | | 20-46713
|
01/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Schwartz shall have until February 26, 2021, to file and serve the combined brief. Nos 78341/79464. (SC) | | 21-00623
|
02/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 21-05851
|
03/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal (No. 78341) and Reply Brief on Appeal (No. 79464). Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 21-08621
|
04/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant and cross-appellant The Dr. Miriam and Sheldon G. Adelson Educational Institute's Combined Reply Brief due: May 26, 2021. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 21-10330
|
05/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Second Motion for Extension to File Rely Brief on Cross-Appeal (No. 78341) and Reply Brief on Appeal (No. 79464). (SC) | | 21-15004
|
05/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant and cross-appellant The Dr. Miriam and Sheldon G. Adelson Educational Institute (Adelson) has filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the combined reply brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 78341 and reply brief on appeal in Docket No. 79464. The motion is denied. Adelson shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the combined brief. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 21-15418
|
06/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix of Exhibits to Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Combined: Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal (No. 78341) & Reply Brief on Appeal (No. 79464). Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 21-16138
|
06/07/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Combined: Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal (No. 78341) & Reply Brief on Appeal (No. 79464). Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 21-16151
|
06/07/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-01345
|
03/30/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-09887
|
04/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension to File Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 78341/79464 (SC) | | 22-12044
|
04/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until June 17, 2022, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-12354
|
06/17/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Malani D. Kotchka. E-Payment Ref. no. 22061819514007. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | |
06/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-19349
|
07/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing is denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-21445
|
07/19/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 78341/79464 (SC) | | 22-22750
|
07/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. A. Jonathan Schwartz shall have until August 22, 2022, to file and serve a petition for en banc reconsideration. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-23047
|
08/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Excess Pages to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 78341/79464 (SC) | | 22-26227
|
08/22/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-26228
|
08/30/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. A. Jonathan Schwartz's motion to exceed the type-volume limitation for his petition for en banc reconsideration is granted. The petition for en banc reconsideration was filed on August 22, 2022. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-27210
|
09/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Chief Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC Nos 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-27954
|
10/03/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 78341/79464 (SC). | | 22-31045
|
10/03/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC). | | |
10/14/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 4, 2022. Nos. 78341/79464. (SC) | | 22-31045
|