Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/04/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Holland & Hart. Check no. 67006921. (SC) | | |
09/04/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-36918
|
09/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-36920
|
09/05/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford Levitt. (SC) | | 19-37068
|
09/30/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | | 19-40483
|
10/10/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-42091
|
12/10/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for February 5, 2020, at 8:00 am. Case Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 19-49937
|
02/07/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-05360
|
02/12/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We conclude that in the interest of judicial economy, these appeals should be consolidated. Accordingly, we consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. These appeals shall follow parallel briefing schedules. Appellant in Docket No. 79425 shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellants in Docket No. 79526 shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellant in Docket No. 79425 shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Appellants in Docket No. 79526 shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-05787
|
02/25/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants in Docket No. 79526 shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why their appeal from the order granting summary judgment should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for filing documents in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent in Docket No. 79526 may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-07506
|
02/25/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/28/19, 01/29/19, 01/30/19, 01/31/19, 02/01/19 and 02/06/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-07629
|
02/25/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/28/19, 01/29/19, 01/30/19, 01/31/19, 02/01/19 and 02/06/19. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-07653
|
03/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos 79425/79526.(SC) | | 20-11527
|
03/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Weiser's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-11696
|
03/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The appeal in Docket No. 79526 may proceed. Appellant in Docket No. 79425 (Skarpelos) shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, appellants in Docket No. 79526 shall have 30 days to file a combined answering brief to Skarpelos's opening brief and opening brief in Docket No. 79526. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-12248
|
04/01/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Marie Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/30/19. 01/31/19 and 02/01/19. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-12503
|
04/15/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy B. Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/28/19. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-14299
|
04/15/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lori Urmston stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/06/19. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-14301
|
04/15/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lori Urmston stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/29/19. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-14304
|
05/05/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy B. Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/28/19. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-16974
|
05/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File and Serve Opening Brief and Appendix; Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal; Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Response on Cross-Appeal and Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request). Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-20320
|
06/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant shall have until July 1, 2020, to file and serve the appendix and opening brief on appeal. The combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal shall be filed on or before July 31, 2020. The combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal shall be filed on or before August 31, 2020, and any reply brief on cross-appeal shall be filed on or before September 30, 2020. Nos.79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-20546
|
07/01/2020 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief (REJECTED PER 07/01/20 NOTICE). Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | |
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24443
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24445
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24447
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24449
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 5. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24446
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 6. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24448
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 7. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24450
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 8. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24451
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 9. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24453
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 10. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24452
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 11. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24454
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 12. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24456
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 13. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24457
|
07/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 14. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24455
|
07/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (Opening Brief). Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-24482
|
07/01/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-24491
|
07/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation To Supplement Joint Appendix. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-25550
|
07/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-26614
|
07/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Weiser Asset Management, Ltd. and Weiser, Ltd. shall have until August 19, 2020, to file and serve a combined answering brief and opening brief on cross-appeal and a supplemental appendix. Athanasios Skarpelos shall have until September 21, 2020, to file and serve a combined reply brief and answering brief on cross-appeal. Weiser shall have until October 19, 2020, to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. The stipulation of the parties to supplement the appendix with an appendix filed with Weiser's answering brief is approved. Weiser may file an appendix with the answering brief containing the missing documents. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-27493
|
08/19/2020 | Brief | Filed Brief Weiser's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-30665
|
08/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Joint Appendix, Volumes 1-2. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | 20-30667
|
08/19/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance (Joshua M. Halen). Nos. 79425/79426 (SC) | | 20-30671
|
08/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Skarpelos shall have until September 21, 2020, to file and serve a combined brief to reply to Weiser's arguments regarding the judgment and denial of motion for new trial and to answer Weiser's arguments regarding the award of attorney fees. Weiser shall then have 30 days from the service of that combined brief to file a reply addressing the award of attorney fees, if deemed necessary. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-31823
|
09/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-33386
|
09/17/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant and respondent Athanasios Skarpelos shall have until October 21, 2020, to file and serve the combined reply and answering brief. Respondents and appellants Weiser Asset Management and Weiser Ltd. shall have until December 21, 2020, to file their reply brief, if deemed necessary. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-34270
|
10/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-38496
|
10/26/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-39202
|
10/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Athanasios Skarpelos's motion requesting an extension of time to file the combined reply and answering brief is granted. NRAP 31(a)(1). The combined brief was filed on October 26, 2020. Respondents and appellants Weiser Asset Management and Weiser Ltd. shall have until December 28, 2020, to file their reply brief, if deemed necessary. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-39292
|
10/29/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney (Jeremy J. Nork as counsel for respondents/cross-appellants). Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-39729
|
10/29/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Matthew B. Hippler of Holland & Hart LLP as co-counsel on behalf of respondents/cross-appellants). Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-39731
|
12/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-45655
|
12/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Reply Brief due: January 15, 2021. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 20-45675
|
01/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Weiser's Reply Brief. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 21-01530
|
01/22/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | |
08/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on October 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 21-24116
|
08/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument Date. Nos. 79425/79526 (SC) | | 21-24775
|
08/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents have filed a motion to postpone the oral argument in this matter. The motion is granted. The oral argument currently scheduled for October 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. is vacated and rescheduled for December 15, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-24840
|
12/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-34245
|
12/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. Oral argument in this matter is currently scheduled for December 15, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Given the inclement weather in Carson City and health concerns related to the pandemic, counsel may appear in person in the Carson City or Las Vegas courtroom or by videoconference. At least one Justice will be in the Carson City and Las Vegas courtrooms.
If counsel appears by videoconference, the court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection.
Counsel shall notify the clerk of court no later than 3:00 p.m. on December 14, 2021, if counsel intends to appear for oral argument by videoconference or in person and which courtroom. Counsel may notice the clerk of court by telephone at (775) 684-1600 or by email at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. Nos. 79425/79526 (SC) | | 21-35580
|
12/15/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC). | | |
01/28/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. Nos. 79425/79526(SC) | | 22-03041
|
03/03/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH. Nos 79425/79526. (SC) | | 22-06874
|
03/28/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-09484
|
03/28/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 29, 2022. Nos. 79425/79526. (SC) | | 22-09484
|