Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/27/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/27/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-40296
|
09/27/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-40298
|
10/03/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hurtik Law. Check no. 4988. (SC) | | |
10/03/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 19-41062
|
10/04/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | | 19-41191
|
10/15/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9:00 A.M., Tuesday, November 12, 2019. (SC). | | 19-42534
|
10/24/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-44047
|
11/19/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 26, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. | | 19-47346
|
12/06/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 19-49665
|
12/12/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-50326
|
02/26/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-07688
|
03/07/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/15/19, 07/16/19, 07/18/19, 07/19/19. To Court Reporter: Gina Villani. (SC) | | 20-09098
|
03/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. (SC). | | 20-12259
|
04/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-13593
|
04/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-13629
|
04/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-15458
|
04/28/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Court Recorder Gina Villani's Notice of Appellant's Failure to Pay Deposit. (SC) | | 20-15992
|
04/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Court Recorder Gina Villani's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. (SC) | | 20-16171
|
04/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Court Recorder's Motion for Extension of to File Transcript. (SC) | | 20-16295
|
05/20/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Briefing. Counsel for appellants are admonished for certifying that they paid the deposit when they had not actually done so. Such conduct may warrant the imposition of sanctions in the future. Court Reporter's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: June 5, 2020. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 20, 2020. (SC). | | 20-19295
|
06/24/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/15/19, 07/16/19, 07/17/19, 07/18/19, 07/19/19. (SC) | | 20-23406
|
07/24/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-27103
|
07/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-27105
|
07/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC) alococo | | 20-27110
|
07/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC) alococo | | 20-27111
|
07/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC) alococo | | 20-27112
|
07/24/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC) alococo | | 20-27113
|
08/20/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: September 8, 2020. (SC) | | 20-30707
|
09/08/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 9/8/2020) | | |
09/08/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.(SC) | | 20-33061
|
09/09/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (SC) | | 20-33157
|
09/09/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief (SC) | | 20-33158
|
10/02/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Reply Brief due: October 23, 2020. (SC) | | 20-36241
|
10/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-38745
|
11/08/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-40765
|
11/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' motion for a second extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1); NRAP 31(b)(3)(A)(iv). The reply brief was filed on November 8, 2020. (SC). | | 20-41042
|
11/10/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC). | | |
12/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 20-43479
|
12/01/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
12/01/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
01/29/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
01/29/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 21-02755
|
02/23/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
02/23/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/23/2021 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/23/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-05259
|
02/23/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/16/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 24, 2021. (SC) | | 21-05259
|