Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/01/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
10/01/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-40726
|
11/08/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-45954
|
11/18/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 19-47201
|
01/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-04051
|
02/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. (SC). | | 20-04652
|
02/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Court Reporter Brittany Amoroso's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: March 23, 2020. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 28, 2020. (SC). | | 20-05957
|
03/10/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Brittany Amoroso stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/28/19, 0529/19, 05/30/19 and 07/23/19. (SC) | | 20-09414
|
04/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC). | | 20-16076
|
05/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 29, 2020. (SC). | | 20-17506
|
07/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Documents. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. (SC) | | 20-27316
|
07/29/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter Regarding Appellate Counsel. (SC) | | 20-27676
|
07/29/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Letter Regarding Appellate Counsel Due date: 10 days. | | 20-27680
|
08/07/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a letter expressing concern that his appointed counsel has not communicated with him or filed the opening brief. This court entered an order on July 27, 2020, directing appellant's counsel Benjamin J. Nadig to file the opening brief and appendix within 14 days. This court trusts that Mr. Nadig will comply with this court's order. (SC) | | 20-29158
|
08/10/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-29405
|
08/10/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2 of 3. (SC) | | 20-29407
|
08/10/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1 of 3. (SC) | | 20-29408
|
08/10/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3 of 3. (SC) | | 20-29409
|
08/28/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice to the Court as to Assigned Appointmant of Counsel for Direct Appeal. (SC) | | 20-31801
|
08/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-31804
|
09/08/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Deputy District Attorney John T. Niman Appearing as Counsel for Respondent. (SC) | | 20-33014
|
09/08/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-33017
|
09/08/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-33019
|
09/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's "Notice to the Court as to Assigned Appointmant [sic] of Counsel for Direct Appeal." (SC) | | 20-33186
|
10/06/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person "Motion to Suspend Briefing and Direct Appeal, Dismiss Appellate Counsel and Appoint Alternative Appellate Counsel". (SC) | | 20-36670
|
10/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has submitted a pro se motion that requests the discharge of his appointed counsel and the appointment of a new attorney. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 20-37667
|
10/23/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC) | | |
11/10/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Memorandum to the Supreme Court. (SC) | | 20-41188
|
11/10/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Memorandum to the Supreme Court. | | 20-41190
|
11/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a memorandum informing this court that his counsel has not provided him with copies of the documents filed in this appeal or his client file. This court takes no action regarding the memorandum, but trusts that counsel will provide appellant with copies and the file as appropriate. (SC) | | 20-42040
|
11/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Certificate of Service - Memorandum to the Supreme Court. (SC) | | 20-42904
|
07/08/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC). | | 21-19528
|
07/14/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Letter Counsel. (SC) | | 21-20284
|
07/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court issued an opinion affirming the judgment of conviction on July 8, 2021. Appellant has filed a letter asserting that his attorney, Benjamin Nadig, has failed to communicate with him or to send him his files. This court trusts that Mr. Nadig will communicate with appellant as necessary and send appellant all necessary documents. The clerk of this court shall provide appellant with a copy of this court's July 8, 2021, opinion. (SC) | | 21-20414
|
07/21/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 21-21132
|
08/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-22339
|
08/11/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed State's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 21-23318
|
09/23/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing and Amending Opinion. On July 8, 2021, this court issued an opinion affirming the judgment of conviction in this matter, We now amend that opinion. On page 8 of the advance opinion, 491 P.3d at 26, the paragraph before subsection II.B is amended to add, after the third sentence: This evidence "was sufficient to show that a crime had been committed and that there were reasonable grounds to believe that [Bolden] had committed it." With these changes, we deny rehearing. NRAP 40(c). (SC). | | 21-27479
|
09/23/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Amended Authored Opinion. Before: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (OPINION WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 2/3/22). (SC). | | 21-27482
|
10/06/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration due: October 21, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28721
|
10/21/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-30376
|
10/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-31169
|
10/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of Amici Curiae Clark County Public Defender, Clark County SPD and NACJ in support of Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 8/4/22). (SC) | | |
11/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-31542
|
11/03/2021 | Motion | Filed State's Opposition to Amicus' Motion for Permission to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-31648
|
11/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. (SC) | | 21-32109
|
11/16/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-32915
|
02/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. This court's previous opinion in this matter is hereby withdrawn. Pickering, J., dissenting. EN BANC (SC) | | 22-03770
|
02/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. We conclude that supplemental briefing is warranted. Appellant's supplemental brief due: 14 days. Respondent shall have 14 days to respond. (SC) | | 22-03840
|
02/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Brief and Appendix. (Third Request)(SC) | | 22-05376
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental brief in compliance with this court's February 4, 2022, Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellant's supplemental brief to file and serve its response. (SC) | | 22-06224
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. To date appellant has not filed the supplemental brief or otherwise communicated with this court. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental brief. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of service of the supplemental brief to file and serve a response. (SC) | | 22-11102
|
04/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/13/22) (SC) | | |
04/13/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 22-11612
|
04/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/20/22) (SC) | | |
05/02/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-13803
|
05/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 22-16101
|
05/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Docket No. 79715 is a direct appeal from a judgment of conviction in which appellant is represented by counsel. Docket No. 84293 is a pro se appeal from an order denying a postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Appellant, acting pro se, has filed a motion in Docket No. 84293 to consolidate the appeals. The appeals are in substantially different procedural postures and are not appropriate for consolidation. The motion is denied. Nos. 79715/84293. (SC) | | 22-16126
|
05/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Third Motion for Extension of Time For Filing of Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-16962
|
05/27/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (REJECTED PER ORDER FILED 5/31/22). (SC) | | |
05/31/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall reject the supplemental brief filed on May 27, 2022. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a brief that contains a certificate indicating that the supplemental brief complies with the page/word limits applicable to reply briefs. (SC) | | 22-17211
|
06/08/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-18281
|
06/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Fourth Motion for Extension of Time For Filing of Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-18285
|
06/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the supplemental brief ordered by this court is granted. The supplemental brief was filed on June 8, 2022. Respondent's response was filed on May 2, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18734
|
08/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Proposed amici Clark County Public Defender, Clark County Special Public Defender, and Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice have filed a motion for leave to file a brief of amici curiae in support of appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration. Respondent opposes the motion and proposed amici have filed a reply. Having considered the motion, opposition, and reply, the motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall strike the amicus brief filed on October 28, 2021. (SC) | | 22-24437
|
08/04/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." EN BANC Pickering, J., concurring. (SC) | | 22-24438
|
08/30/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-27126
|
08/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC) | | |
09/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 31, 2022. (SC) | | 22-27126
|