Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/10/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Fennemore Craig. Check no. 5596. (SC) | | |
12/10/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-49993
|
12/10/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-49995
|
12/20/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-51608
|
12/20/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Docketing Statement - Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-51612
|
12/27/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC). | | 19-52223
|
01/09/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for February 6, 2020, at 2:00 PM. (SC) | | 20-01149
|
02/19/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Based on the Settlement Conference, the Settlement Judge intends to remain in contact with, and available to, both sides' counsel under the Court's Settlement Program to see whether settlement efforts might lead to a reasonable prospect for settlement. (SC) | | 20-06882
|
04/03/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to mediate via a private global JAMS mediation. (SC) | | 20-12825
|
06/02/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-20761
|
06/04/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-20947
|
06/10/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/03/19, 06/04/19, 06/05/19, 08/19/19 and 09/30/29. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. (SC) | | 20-21794
|
06/15/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC). | | 20-22325
|
06/26/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 20-23880
|
06/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Apco Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Co. of America's Response to Order to Show Cause (REJECTED PER 06/29/20 NOTICE). (SC). | | |
06/29/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Response to Order to Show Cause). (SC). | | 20-23926
|
06/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants APCO Constriction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-24082
|
08/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 20-28423
|
10/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-39766
|
11/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 6, 2021. (SC). | | 20-40685
|
12/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-46927
|
01/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: February 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-00632
|
02/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-03319
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until February 26, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-04258
|
02/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). (SC) | | 21-05628
|
03/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' unopposed motion for a fourth extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. Appellants shall have until March 19, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-07063
|
03/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Motion to File Oversize Brief. (SC) | | 21-08045
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume I (part 1 of 2). (SC) | | 21-08047
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume II. (SC) | | 21-08048
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume III. (SC) | | 21-08049
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IV (Part 1 of 2). (SC) | | 21-08050
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume V. (SC) | | 21-08051
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VI. (SC) | | 21-08052
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VII. (SC) | | 21-08053
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VIII. (SC) | | 21-08054
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IX. (SC) | | 21-08055
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume X (Part 1 of 2). (SC) | | 21-08056
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XI (Part 1 of 8). (SC) | | 21-08057
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XI (Part 5 of 8). (SC) | | 21-08058
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XII (Part 1 of 8). (SC) | | 21-08059
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XII (Part 5 of 8). (SC) | | 21-08060
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XIII (Part 1 of 4). (SC) | | 21-08061
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XIV (Part 1 of 2). (SC) | | 21-08062
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XV (Part 1 of 2). (SC) | | 21-08063
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XVI (Part 1 of 2). (SC) | | 21-08064
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XVI (Part 3 of 3). (SC) | | 21-08065
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XVII (Part 1 of 3). (SC) | | 21-08066
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XVIII (Part 1 of 3). (SC) | | 21-08067
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XIX. (SC) | | 21-08068
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XX. (SC) | | 21-08069
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XXI. (SC) | | 21-08070
|
03/19/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/2/21). (SC) | | |
04/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on March 19, 2021. Appellants shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief that complies with the page or type-volume limitation set forth in NRAP 32(a)(7)(A). (SC) | | 21-09542
|
04/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-11141
|
05/12/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: June 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-13668
|
05/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15440
|
06/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent shall have until June 15, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-15644
|
06/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-17302
|
07/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-20297
|
07/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Reply Brief due: August 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20299
|
08/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants APCO Construction, Inc. and Safeco Insurance Company of America's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-23886
|
08/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-01440
|
05/05/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Silver/Cadish/Pickering. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Cadish/Pickering. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 31. NNP22-AS/EC/KP. (SC). | | 22-14316
|
05/23/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Christopher H. Byrd. (SC) | | |
05/23/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-16338
|
05/23/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing - Duplicate. (SC) | | 22-16330
|
06/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-17691
|
06/16/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-19126
|
07/01/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-20845
|
07/26/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. {SC} | | 22-23430
|
07/26/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed {SC} | | |
08/16/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23430
|