Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/03/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
01/03/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-00296
|
01/15/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-02079
|
01/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant. (SC) | | 20-02080
|
01/21/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-02853
|
01/21/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service for Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-02857
|
01/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Attorney K. Ryan Helmick has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion is denied without prejudice because it does not comply with NRAP 46(d)(3)(A)(i). (SC). | | 20-03659
|
01/28/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Copy of District Court Order Denying Harlan's Motion to Set Aside Guilty Verdict as to Counts One and Two and Motion for a New Trial. (SC) | | 20-03909
|
02/13/2020 | Motion | Filed Attorney Ryan Helmick's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant. (SC) | | 20-06107
|
02/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. The clerk shall remove attorney K. Ryan Helmick as counsel of record for appellant. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 37 days. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 20-07917
|
03/13/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/12/20. Order Appointing Jean Schwartzer as Counsel for Appellant. (SC). | | 20-10057
|
03/31/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Change of Address. (SC) | | 20-12354
|
04/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. fn1 [ Appellant's previous counsel filed a transcript request form in accordance with NRAP 9(a). Should newly appointed counsel require the production of additional transcripts, counsel shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). If the necessary transcripts have already been prepared and are on file in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in the appendix without filing a transcript request form.] (SC). | | 20-13238
|
04/10/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/13/20). (SC) | | |
04/10/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/13/20). (SC) | | |
04/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Two Filed Requests for Rough Draft Transcripts of Proceedings. (SC) | | 20-13928
|
04/14/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/23/19, 5/2/19 To Court Reporter: Jill Jacoby. Request for Transcripts. (SC) | | 20-14134
|
04/14/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/7/18. To Court Reporter: Sara Richardson. Request for Transcript. (SC) | | 20-14135
|
05/28/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/7/18, 4/23/19, 5/2/19. (SC) | | 20-20171
|
06/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Request for Transcript. (SC) | | 20-21522
|
06/08/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/13/18 To Court Reporter: Sara Richardson. (SC) | | 20-21523
|
06/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's untimely motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). The transcript request form was filed on June 8, 2020. (SC) | | 20-22780
|
07/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-25071
|
07/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 5, 2020. (SC). | | 20-26124
|
08/10/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Recorder Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/13/18. (SC) | | 20-29255
|
10/05/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-36565
|
10/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 4, 2020. (SC) | | 20-37670
|
12/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 20-44481
|
12/15/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 2, 2021. (SC) | | 20-45377
|
02/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (Fourth Request). (SC) | | 21-03213
|
02/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-03621
|
02/10/2021 | Other | Justice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings | | |
02/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Fifth Request). (SC) | | 21-04582
|
02/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 8, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-05779
|
03/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-06748
|
03/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume I. (SC) | | 21-06823
|
03/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume II. (SC) | | 21-06826
|
03/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume III. (SC) | | 21-06829
|
03/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume IV. (SC) | | 21-06830
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume V. (SC) | | 21-06992
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume VI. (SC) | | 21-06995
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume VII. (SC) | | 21-06996
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume VIII. (SC) | | 21-06997
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume IX. (SC) | | 21-06998
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume X. (SC) | | 21-07004
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume XI. (SC) | | 21-07005
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume XII. (SC) | | 21-07006
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume XIII. (SC) | | 21-07007
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume XIV. (SC) | | 21-07011
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume XV. (SC) | | 21-07012
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume XVI. (SC) | | 21-07013
|
03/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Volume XVII. (SC) | | 21-07014
|
03/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07338
|
03/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07781
|
03/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions for sixth and seventh extensions of time to file the opening brief are granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on March 9 and 17, 2021. Respondent's answering brief due: April 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08612
|
04/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Taleen Pandukht, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Respondent). (SC) | | 21-11059
|
04/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 21-11060
|
04/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: June 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-11672
|
06/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Second Request. (SC) | | 21-17192
|
06/17/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: July 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-17450
|
07/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits. (SC) | | 21-20411
|
07/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-20412
|
07/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-20413
|
07/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Original Exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court original State's Exhibits 147 and 149, identified on the district court exhibit list as "Videos pulled from Jaiden's Phone" and "Galleria Mall Video," respectively. (SC) | | 21-21809
|
08/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-23945
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-24359
|
09/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (Second Request) (SC) | | 21-26328
|
09/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (STRICKEN PER 9/21/21 ORDER). (SC) | | |
09/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Striking Brief. The motion for an extension of time filed on September 10, 2021, is granted. Because the brief is not prepared in accordance with NRAP 32, the clerk of this court shall strike the reply brief filed on September 13, 2021. Appellant's reply brief due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-27289
|
09/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-27817
|
09/28/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." RP/JH/MG (SC) | | 22-05360
|
03/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-07250
|
03/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 17, 2022, to file and serve any petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-07405
|
03/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-08594
|
03/17/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. (SC) | | |
03/25/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-09346
|
04/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-10966
|
04/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 26, 2022, to file and serve any petition for en banc reconsideration. If no petition for en banc reconsideration is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-11616
|
04/26/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-13238
|
05/13/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC (SC) | | 22-15237
|
06/07/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-18075
|
06/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/24/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18075
|