Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/13/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-06033
|
02/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-06035
|
02/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 20-07456
|
02/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | | 20-07544
|
02/25/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Notice of Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis). (SC) | | 20-07643
|
02/27/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/28/19, 04/03/19, 06/04/19, 07/10/19, 08/27/19, 10/07/19, 11/21/19, 12/04/19, 12/05/19, 12/06/19, 12/09/19, 12/10/19, 12/11/19, 12/12/19, 12/16/19, 12/17/19 and 12/18/29. To Court Reporter: Sandra Harrell. (SC) | | 20-08056
|
02/27/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/13/19. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay. (SC) | | 20-08057
|
03/31/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 20-12384
|
04/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion and Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order by the District Court. Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as premature. The district court shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, enter a written order ruling on appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis in compliance with NRAP 24. (SC). | | 20-13270
|
05/13/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 6, 2020. Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed On Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 20-18177
|
05/13/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 6, 2020. Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 20-18178
|
05/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 80581 and 81151. (SC) | | 20-18528
|
05/15/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Waiving Filing Fee. (SC) | | 20-18564
|
05/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-18809
|
05/19/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 20-19050
|
05/22/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of No Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 80581 and 81151. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC). | | 20-19613
|
05/27/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation's Notice of No Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 80581 and 81151. (SC) | | 20-19971
|
06/02/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 12, 2020, at 9:30 AM. Case Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 20-20660
|
06/08/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 20-21528
|
08/11/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 21, 2020, at 9:00 am. (SC). | | 20-29590
|
09/15/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 29, 2020, at 9:00 AM. Case Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 20-33999
|
10/20/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 3, 2020, at 9:00 am. Settlement Judge requests a 45 day extension of time to file the final report. Case Nos. 80581/81151. (SC). | | 20-38427
|
10/22/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to December 31, 2020. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC). | | 20-38694
|
12/01/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement process is continued to the following date: February 10, 2021, at 9:30 AM. The Settlement Judge requests an extension until February 15, 2021 to file the final report. Case Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 20-43457
|
12/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge's recommendation that this appeal remain assigned to the settlement program for an additional 45 days is approved. Final Settlement Program Status Report due: February 15, 2021. (SC) | | 20-43720
|
02/10/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Other. No mediation was held in this case. The appellant recently passed away and as a third party will be substituted in this matter, the chance for resolution without this court is unlikely. Case Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-04066
|
02/17/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge, this appeal is removed from the settlement program. Counsel for Joe N. Brown shall have 90 days from the date of this order to: (1) file a motion for the substitution of a personal representative or (2) inform this court that Mr. Brown has no personal representative. The briefing of these appeals shall be stayed pending receipt and review of a response to this order. Nos. 80581/51151. (SC) | | 21-04637
|
05/14/2021 | Motion | Filed The Estate of Appellant Joe N. Brown's Motion for the Substitution of a Personal Representative. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-14059
|
05/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent GNL Corp.'s Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellant's Motion for the Substitution of a Personal Representative. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-14718
|
05/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Substituting Personal Representative and Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall substitute Shalonda Mollette as the personal representative of the estate of appellant Joe N. Brown, and shall amend the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and an appendix. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-14882
|
07/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Opening Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(B)(2). Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-21514
|
07/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: August 25, 2021. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-21518
|
08/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for an order Directing the District Court to Order Transcripts Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(3) or, in the Alternative Rule 9(a)(6). Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 21-24218
|
08/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151 (REJECTED PER TELEPHONE CONVERSATION 08/23/21). (SC) | | |
08/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-24600
|
08/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel for appellant has filed a motion in which he requests, in part, that this court suspend the briefing schedule in order to allow for the preparation of requested transcripts. The motion is granted to the following extent. Opening brief and appendix due: October 11, 2021. fn1 [Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix is denied as moot.] Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-24971
|
10/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Second Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-28747
|
10/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Court Reporter's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcripts. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-29434
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Court Recorder Lara Corcoran's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 60 days. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. All other relief requested in appellant's motion is denied. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 21-30368
|
01/13/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Third Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-01352
|
01/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's motion requesting a fourth extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. Appellant shall have until April 18, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. This court's October 21, 2021, order directed court recorder Lara Corcoran to deliver the requested transcripts to appellant and file a certificate of delivery in this court by December 20, 2021. To date, Ms. Corcoran has failed to comply with this court's order or to otherwise communicate with this court. Court reporter certificate due: 14 days. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-02198
|
01/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Affidavit and Second Request for Extension of Time to File Transcripts. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-02348
|
01/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Court recorder Lara Corcoran's motion for a second extension of time to prepare the transcripts requested in these consolidated appeals is granted to the following extent. Court reporter certificate due: February 4, 2022. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-02465
|
02/02/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/28/19, 4/3/19, 6/4/19, 7/10/19, 8/27/19, 10/7/19, 11/21/19, 11/22/19, and 12/4/19-12/18/19. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-03554
|
04/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Fourth Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-12223
|
04/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 9, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 22-12923
|
05/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Fifth Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-14783
|
05/12/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: May 19, 2022. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-15069
|
05/19/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Sixth Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-15975
|
05/31/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 3, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 22-17176
|
06/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-17802
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 1. Nos. 80581/81151(SC) | | 22-18462
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 2. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18464
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 3. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18465
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 4. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18466
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 5. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18467
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 6. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18469
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 7. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18470
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 8. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18472
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 9. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18474
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 10. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18475
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 11. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18476
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 12. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18477
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 13. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18478
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 14. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18493
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 15. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18495
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 16. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18496
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 17. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18497
|
06/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 18. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18498
|
06/14/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting further extension of time to file the opening brief is granted to the following extent. Appellant's opening brief due: June 17, 2022. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-18951
|
08/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Nos. 80581/81151. (SC) | | 22-25786
|
08/29/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Withdrawal of Appeal and Request for Dismissal. Nos. 80581/81151 (SC) | | 22-26942
|
08/30/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of these appeals is granted. "These appeals are dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. Nos 80581/81151. (SC) | | 22-27176
|