Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/27/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellants Liberman and Casino Coolidge)(SC) | | |
02/27/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellants Liberman and Casino Coolidge) (SC) | | 20-08006
|
02/27/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-08009
|
03/02/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellants, Mitchell Defendants) (SC) | | |
03/02/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellants, Mitchell Defendants) (SC) | | 20-08236
|
03/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellants, Mitchell Defendants) (SC) | | 20-08241
|
03/02/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jerome L. Blut, Chartered. Check no. 7327. (Appellants Liberman and Casino Coolidge) (SC) | | |
03/05/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Cohen-Johnson. Check no. 6091. (Appellants, Mitchell Defendants) (SC) | | |
03/05/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-08899
|
03/09/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC) | | 20-09214
|
03/26/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/26/20). (SC) | | |
03/26/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. | | 20-11689
|
03/26/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-11726
|
03/31/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 20-12287
|
03/31/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 15, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC) | | 20-12344
|
06/04/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. (SC) | | |
06/04/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 22, 2020, at 11:30 AM. (SC) | | 20-21101
|
07/23/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 14, 2020, at 1:00 PM (SC) | | 20-26952
|
08/07/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 27, 2020 at 9:00 am. (SC). | | 20-29206
|
08/31/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement process is continued to the following date: September 11, 2020, at 12:00 PM. (SC) | | 20-32044
|
09/13/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-33674
|
09/16/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-34003
|
09/30/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/30/19, 12/31/19, 1/2/20, 1/3/20, 1/6/20, 1/7/20, 2/24/20. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. (SC) | | 20-35924
|
10/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Responses due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' responses are served. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 20-36330
|
11/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-39875
|
11/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. We conclude that this appeal may proceed, and we reinstate the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 20-40308
|
12/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Briefs. (SC) | | 20-46840
|
01/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation and to File Documents. David J. Mitchell; Las Vegas Land Partners, LLC; Meyer Property Ltd.; Zoe Property, LLC; Leah Property, LLC; Wink One, LLC; Aquarius Owner, LLC; LVLP Holdings, LLC; and Live Works Tic Successor, LLC shall have until February 3, 2021, to file and serve their opening brief and appendix. Appellants Barnet Liberman and Casino Coolidge, LLC shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve their opening brief and appendix. Respondents shall have 30 days from service of the last-filed opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. fn1[Counsel for Mitchell shall have 7 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether he still represents Liberman Holdings, LLC, and whether it was inadvertently omitted from the stipulation for an extension of time.] (SC) | | 21-00385
|
01/14/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Clarification Pursuant to January 7, 2021 Order of this Court (David J. Mitchell, Las Vegas Land Partners, LLC, Meyer Property, Ltd., Zoe Property, LLC, Leah Property, LLC, Wink One, LLC, Aquarius Owner, LLC, LVLP Holdings, LLC, and Live Works Tic Successor, LLC). (SC) | | 21-01307
|
01/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall remove James L. Edwards, Kevin M. Johnson, H. Stan Johnson, and Cohen Johnson Parker Edwards as counsel of record for Liberman Holdings, LLC. Liberman Holdings shall have 21 days from the date of this order to retain counsel and cause counsel to enter an appearance in this appeal. Failure of Liberman Holdings to retain new counsel will result in the dismissal of its appeal. (SC) | | 21-02054
|
01/29/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Clarification. (SC) | | 21-02809
|
01/29/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/30/19, 12/31/19, 01/02/20, 01/03/20, 01/06/20, 01/07/20 and 02/24/20. (SC) | | 21-02823
|
02/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-03261
|
02/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to February 2, 2021, Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-03323
|
02/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Granting Motion. The clerk of this court is directed to remove Liberman Holdings, LLC, as an appellant in this appeal. As Casino Coolidge, LLC, and Barnet Liberman have not filed the opening brief, nor otherwise communicated with this court, their appeal is dismissed. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption to conform to the caption on this order. Appellants shall have until March 19, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-05829
|
03/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to File Appendix Volumes XXI to XXIX Under Seal. (SC) | | 21-07886
|
03/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Mitchell Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07895
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. (SC) | | 21-07910
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. (SC) | | 21-07911
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III. (SC) | | 21-07912
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV. (SC) | | 21-07913
|
03/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. (SC) | | 21-07914
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI. (SC) | | 21-07934
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII. (SC) | | 21-07935
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VIII. (SC) | | 21-07936
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume X. (SC) | | 21-07937
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IX. (SC) | | 21-07952
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XI. (SC) | | 21-07938
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XII. (SC) | | 21-07939
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XIII. (SC) | | 21-07940
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XIV. (SC) | | 21-07941
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XV. (SC) | | 21-07942
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XVI. (SC) | | 21-07943
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XVII. (SC) | | 21-07944
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XVIII. (SC) | | 21-07945
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XIX. (SC) | | 21-07946
|
03/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XX. (SC) | | 21-07947
|
04/19/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: May 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-11171
|
04/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-12507
|
05/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents Russell L. Nype and Revenue Plus, LLC, have filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the answering brief. The motion is granted to the following extent. The parties shall have until July 2, 2021, to file and serve either a motion or stipulation to dismiss the appeal or respondents shall file the answering brief. Appellants have filed an unopposed motion to file volumes 21-29 of the appendix under seal on the ground that the volumes contain confidential documents ordered sealed by the district court. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file under seal volumes 21 through 29, received on March 22, 2021. fn1 [This court's docket reflects that counsel for Nype and Revenue Plus also represents respondent Shelley D. Krohn in this appeal. However, the instant motion does not appear to be filed on Krohn's behalf. Accordingly, counsel shall have 7 days from the date of this order to notify this court in writing if he represents Krohn in this appeal, and if the motion was meant to be filed on her behalf.] (SC) | | 21-13017
|
05/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volumes XXI to XXIX (SEALED). (SC) | | |
05/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Clarification Regarding Respondent Shelley Krohn, U.S. Bankruptcy Trustee for LVLP. (SC) | | 21-13147
|
05/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. In response to this court's order entered on May 6, 2021, counsel for respondents has confirmed that he does represent respondent Shelley D. Krohn and that the motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief was intended to be filed on behalf of Krohn as well as the other respondents. Accordingly, the schedule set forth in this court's May 6, 2021, order applies with equal force to respondent Krohn. (SC) | | 21-13585
|
06/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-16493
|
06/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or answering brief due: August 31, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16869
|
08/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Fourth Request). (SC) | | 21-23487
|
08/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties shall have until September 28, 2021, to file and serve a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or, within the same time period, respondents shall file the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-24472
|
09/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Fifth Request). (SC) | | 21-27900
|
10/06/2021 | Appendix | Filed Errata to Appellants' Appendix - Volume II of XXIX. | | 21-28688
|
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents have filed a motion for a fifth extension of time to file the answering brief. The parties shall have until October 28, 2021, to file and serve a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or, within the same time period, respondents shall file the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-29807
|
10/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to File Appendix Vols. 49-65 Under Seal. (SC) | | 21-31205
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1-2. (SC) | | 21-31207
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 3-4. (SC) | | 21-31208
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 6-8. (SC) | | 21-31215
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 8-15. (SC) | | 21-31217
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-31218
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 16-21. (SC) | | 21-31219
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 22-23. (SC) | | 21-31220
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 24-36. (SC) | | 21-31221
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 37-39. (SC) | | 21-31222
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 40-43. (SC) | | 21-31223
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 44-47. (SC) | | 21-31224
|
10/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 48. (SC) | | 21-31225
|
10/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-31227
|
11/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file "Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 49-65," received on November 2, 2021, under seal. (SC) | | 21-31842
|
11/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 49-65 (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 11/5/21). (SC) | | |
11/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-33992
|
12/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 28, 2022, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-35892
|
02/28/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-06476
|
03/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on August 1, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-19556
|
07/18/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-22542
|
07/26/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Recusal. I (Justice Abbi Silver) believe my impartiality might reasonably questioned because of counsel John Muije's representation of my spouse in a similar but unrelated matter. Accordingly, I have decided to recuse myself voluntarily. (SC) | | 22-23394
|
07/26/2022 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
07/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Appearance of Counsel for E. Brent Bryson. (SC) | | 22-23645
|
07/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed July 27, 2022, the clerk of this court shall add attorney E. Brent Bryson of E. Brent Bryson, Ltd., to the docket as co-counsel for appellants. fn1 [Counsel states he is also appearing on behalf of Liberman Holdings, LLC. Liberman Holdings was removed as an appellant on February 26, 2021.] (SC) | | 22-23802
|
08/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court En Banc. (SC). | | |
09/23/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in part, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgement of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED INB PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn7 [The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-29877
|
10/05/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Petition for Rehearing due: October 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31439
|
10/20/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice Regarding Their Intent Not To File A Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-33051
|
10/21/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-33166
|
10/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 24, 2022. (SC) | | 22-33166
|