Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/10/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
03/10/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-09466
|
03/10/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-09468
|
03/10/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-09470
|
03/12/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC) | | |
04/13/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. "This appeal is dismissed." (SC) | | 20-13865
|
05/08/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 06/15/20 ORDER). | | 20-17441
|
05/08/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 06/15/20 ORDER). | | |
05/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reopen Appeal and Allow for Payment of Fees and Filing of Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-18609
|
05/15/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-18679
|
05/18/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service of Motion to Reopen (SC). | | 20-18903
|
05/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition To Appellant's Motion To Reopen Appeal And Allow For Payment Of Fees And Filing Of Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-19097
|
05/26/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 13, 2020. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 06/15/20 ORDER). | | 20-17441
|
06/15/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur and Reinstating Appeal. Appellant filed a motion to reopen the appeal. The clerk is directed to recall the remittitur, and this appeal is reinstated. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. Failure to timely pay the filing fee may result in dismissal of this appeal. No further action will be taken on this appeal until the filing fee is paid. (SC). | | 20-22163
|
06/23/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Grimes Law Office. Check no. 2615. (SC) | | |
06/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-23389
|
06/25/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Appellant to File Case Appeal Statement. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement due: 7 days. (SC). | | 20-23612
|
06/26/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-23774
|
06/29/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. (SC). | | 20-23921
|
07/09/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/18/19 To Court Reporter: Clerk of Family Court. (SC). | | 20-25322
|
07/13/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-25691
|
07/21/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/18/19. (SC). | | 20-26667
|
07/24/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/18/19. (SC) | | 20-27087
|
08/10/2020 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellants Fast Track Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/11/20). (SC) | | |
08/11/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document - Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 20-29535
|
08/17/2020 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellants Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 20-30232
|
08/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 20-30289
|
08/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2 Part 1. (SC) | | 20-30290
|
08/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3 Part 1. (SC) | | 20-30291
|
08/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4 Part 1. (SC) | | 20-30295
|
09/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Deadline to File the Respondent's Answering Brief (Fast Track Response). (SC) | | 20-33097
|
09/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's fast track response due: September 22, 2020. (SC) | | 20-33360
|
09/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for an Extension of Time (First Request). (SC) | | 20-34956
|
09/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's fast track response due: October 1, 2020. (SC) | | 20-35735
|
10/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1 of 2. (SC) | | 20-36165
|
10/01/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 2 of 2. (SC) | | 20-36166
|
10/01/2020 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 20-36190
|
11/04/2020 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
03/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC). | | 21-08718
|
05/27/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC). | | 21-15219
|
06/11/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's petition for rehearing due: June 28, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16913
|
06/28/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing En Banc. (SC) | | 21-18612
|
07/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 5 days. (SC). | | 21-19254
|
07/09/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Errata to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 21-19746
|
07/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Radford J. Smith, Chartered. Check no. 14348. (SC) | | |
07/19/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 21-20734
|
08/02/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-22465
|
09/23/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (SC) | | 21-27521
|
10/18/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 21-29828
|
10/18/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/04/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 20, 2021. (SC) | | 21-29828
|