Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
03/25/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-11524
|
03/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-11526
|
03/31/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lovato Law Firm. Check no. 2482. (SC) | | |
03/31/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-12219
|
04/02/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/02/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 20-12610
|
04/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 20-12613
|
04/02/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Terry A. Moore. (SC) | | |
04/02/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Young. (SC) | | 20-12651
|
04/21/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-15123
|
04/23/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-15398
|
04/23/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 30, 2020, at 9:00 AM via video conference. (SC) | | 20-15440
|
05/07/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-17418
|
05/11/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s) and Respondent(s): 14 days transcript request; Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief and appendix. Respondent(s): 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant(s): 30 days from that combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent(s): 14 days from that combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 20-17770
|
05/20/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC). | | 20-19241
|
08/10/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 24, 2020. (SC) | | 20-29376
|
09/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Attached Opening Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/03/20). (SC) | | |
09/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Attached Opening Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/03/20). (SC) | | |
09/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Attached Opening Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/03/20). (SC) | | |
09/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Attached Opening Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/03/20). (SC) | | |
09/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Attached Opening Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/03/20). (SC) | | |
09/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Attached Opening Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/03/20). (SC) | | |
09/03/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Attached Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-32594
|
09/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File the Completed Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-32799
|
09/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-32801
|
09/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (Vol. 1). (SC) | | 20-32807
|
09/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (Vol. 2). (SC) | | 20-32809
|
09/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (Vols. 3-5). (SC) | | 20-32810
|
09/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (Vols. 6-10). (SC) | | 20-32812
|
09/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (Vols. 11-12). (SC) | | 20-32813
|
09/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix (Vols. 13-14). (SC) | | 20-32814
|
09/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants/cross-respondents' motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief on appeal is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on September 4, 2020. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until October 5, 2020, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 20-33185
|
10/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 20-36254
|
10/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal is due: | | 20-36275
|
11/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 20-40227
|
11/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-40230
|
11/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-40232
|
11/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-40233
|
12/04/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants/cross-respondents' reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: December 18, 2020. (SC) | | 20-43924
|
12/31/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 20-47091
|
12/31/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 20-47092
|
01/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Tropicana Investments, LLC's Opposition to Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Extension/Leave to File Completed Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-00191
|
01/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion for Extension/Leave to File Completed Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-00603
|
01/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 21-01148
|
01/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants/cross-respondents have filed an untimely motion for a second extension of time to file the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Despite counsel's failure to comply with this court's rules, appellants/cross-respondents' extension motion is granted. The combined brief was filed on December 31, 2020. Respondent/cross-appellant's requests to strike the combined brief or dismiss this appeal are denied. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until February 5, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-01967
|
02/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-03535
|
02/08/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief Notice of Supplemental Authorities | | 21-07861
|
03/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (STRICKEN PER 4/2/21 ORDER). (SC) | | |
03/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Strike Motion to Strike Appellants/Cross-Respondents' "Notice of Supplemental Authorities." (SC) | | 21-07903
|
03/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Opposition To Tropicana Investments, LLC's Motion to Strike. (SC) | | 21-07917
|
04/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Strike. Respondent/cross-appellant (respondent) has filed a motion to strike appellants/cross-respondents' (appellants) notice of supplemental authorities on the basis that the filing exceeds the permissible scope of such a notice. Appellants oppose the motion. The motion is granted. The clerk shall strike the notice of supplemental authorities filed on March 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-09556
|
04/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants'/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. (DETACHED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 4/30/21). (SC) | | 21-10335
|
04/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Tropicana Investments, LLC's Response to Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 21-11136
|
04/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The opposed motion of appellants/cross-respondents' seeking leave to file a supplemental brief is denied. The clerk shall detach the proposed supplemental brief from the motion filed on April 9, 2021, and return it unfiled. (SC) | | 21-12458
|
05/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on July 7, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-13077
|
06/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 21-18009
|
06/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-18049
|
07/07/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. 80849. (NNP21-EC/KP/DH) (SC) | | |
03/30/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Pickering, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC) | | 22-09885
|
04/13/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Tropicana Investments, LLC's Verified Bill of Costs. (SC) | | 22-11702
|
04/19/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent JSJBD Corp.'s Objection To Bill Of Costs. (SC) | | 22-12326
|
04/21/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Tropicana Investments, LLC's Response to JSJBD's Objection to Bill of Costs. (SC) | | 22-12642
|
06/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Approving Bill of Costs. The bill of costs is disapproved with respect to the lodging costs as lodging is not a cost taxable in this court.The bill of costs is disapproved with respect to photocopying costs. The bill of costs is approved with respect to the costs for parking. The clerk of this court shall issue an itemized statement of costs in the amount of $20 for insertion in the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-17278
|
06/01/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $20.00. | | 22-17411
|
06/01/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur/Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements. (SC) | | 22-17413
|
06/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 2, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17413
|