Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/02/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-12618
|
04/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-12621
|
04/02/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/02/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 20-12623
|
04/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 20-12626
|
04/13/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Dennis Vincent Stanton. Check no. 9001. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) (SC) | | |
04/13/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Twyla M. Stanton. Money Order no. 19-090201764. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) (SC) | | |
04/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). (SC) | | 20-13964
|
04/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). (SC) | | 20-13967
|
04/30/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/07/19, 06/10/19 and 02/10/20. To Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting & Transcription, LLC. (SC) | | 20-16410
|
05/07/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-17426
|
05/19/2020 | Transcript | Filed Transcripts of Proceedings: 1/7/2019, 6/10/2019, and 2/10/2020. (SC) | | |
05/20/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Part 1. (SC) | | 20-19279
|
05/20/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Part 2. (SC) | | 20-19281
|
05/28/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Part 1. (SC) | | 20-20224
|
05/28/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Part 2. (SC) | | 20-20230
|
06/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC). | | 20-20554
|
06/01/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Remove This Appeal from the Fast Track Program and Direct Full Briefing. (SC) | | 20-20557
|
06/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition to the Motion to Remove This Appeal From the fast Track Program and Direct Full Briefing. (SC) | | 20-20690
|
06/17/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-22601
|
06/17/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-22602
|
06/17/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-22603
|
06/17/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 4. (SC) | | 20-22604
|
06/17/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volume 5. (SC) | | 20-22605
|
06/22/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel and Directing Transmission of Record. The clerk of this court is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary and district court order to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notices of Appearance for Appellant and Cross-Appellant or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. The motion filed on June 1, 2020, is denied at this time. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 20-23118
|
06/24/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Court Order Information Sheet (SEALED). (SC) | | |
07/14/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Christopher P. Burke appearing as counsel for respondent. (SC) | | 20-25831
|
08/31/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time Notice of Determination of Eligibility for Pro Bono Representation and Request an Extension.(SC) | | 20-32007
|
09/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Christopher P. Burke as counsel for respondent/cross-appellant. The Legal Aid Center shall have until September 30, 2020, to file a response or notice of appearance for appellant/cross-respondent. (SC) | | 20-32702
|
09/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time for Notice of Determination of Eligibility for Pro Bono Representation and Request for Extension of Time. (SC) | | 20-35915
|
10/07/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. (John Savage) (SC) | | 20-36749
|
10/07/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Statement of Legal Aid Representation. (SC) | | 20-36754
|
10/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties shall have 14 days from the date of this order to determine the transcripts necessary for a review of this appeal and cross-appeal and to file either a supplemental transcript request form or a supplemental certification that no transcripts are requested under NRAP9(a). Appellant/cross-respondent's opening brief due: 90 days. fn1 [The Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada's motion for an extension of time to file a notice of appearance is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A).] (SC) | | 20-37479
|
10/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Waiver of Costs of Transcripts. (SC) | | 20-39251
|
10/27/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH APPELANT/CROSS-RESPONDENT'S) (SC) | | |
10/27/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's transcript request due: November 10, 2020. (SC) | | 20-39297
|
11/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion to waive the costs associated with the preparation of the requested transcripts. The motion is granted to the following extent. Counsel shall follow NRS 12.015(3) for obtaining any necessary transcripts at county expense. See NRAP 9(a)(6). (SC) | | 20-40854
|
11/10/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/7/19, 6/10/19, and 2/10/20. To Court Reporter: Cecilia Thomas. (SC) | | 20-41088
|
12/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-46743
|
01/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's opening brief due: March 12, 2021. (SC) | | 21-00677
|
01/20/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Notice of Statement of the Evidence. (SC) | | 21-01700
|
02/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Motion for Stay. (SC) | | 21-03873
|
02/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed a motion to file a motion for stay and accompanying appendix under seal. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file appellant's motion for stay and accompanying appendix, received on February 11, 2021, under seal. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file any opposition to the motion for stay. Appellant/cross respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file, in this court, proof of service of the motion and appendix in accordance with NRAP 25(d)(1). (SC) | | 21-04798
|
02/18/2021 | Motion | Filed SEALED Appellant's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiving Bond. (SC) | | |
02/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed SEALED Appendix of Exhibits to Appellant's Motion for Stay - Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiving Bond. (SC) | | |
02/18/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Proof of Service for Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiving Bond and Appendix of Exhibits. (SC) | | 21-04895
|
02/18/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Proof of Service for Motion to Seal. (SC) | | 21-04896
|
03/12/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07319
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-07327
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-07329
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-07334
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-07335
|
04/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-10302
|
04/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date May 12, 2021. (SC) | | 21-10313
|
05/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-13313
|
05/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion for a stay is denied without prejudice so that he may seek relief in the district court in the first instance. In the event appellant thereafter seeks relief before this court, the district court's reasoning may provide useful information in this court's consideration of the matter. (SC) | | 21-14881
|
06/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-16502
|
06/09/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on December 15, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-28489
|
12/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-34248
|
12/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. Oral argument in this matter is currently scheduled for December 15, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. Given the inclement weather in Carson City and health concerns related to the pandemic, counsel may appear in person in the Carson City or Las Vegas courtroom or by videoconference. At least one Justice will be in the Carson City and Las Vegas courtrooms.
If counsel appears by videoconference, the court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection.
Counsel shall notify the clerk of court no later than 3:00 p.m. on December 14, 2021, if counsel intends to appear for oral argument by videoconference or in person and which courtroom. Counsel may notice the clerk of court by telephone at (775) 684-1600 or by email at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. (SC) | | 21-35578
|
12/15/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. (SC). | | |
03/03/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "ORDER the judgement of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC) | | 22-06873
|
03/17/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: April 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08543
|
04/04/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-10286
|
04/04/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John J. Savage. (SC) | | |
04/15/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC) | | 22-12021
|
04/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record for Dennis Vincent Stanton. (SC) | | 22-13338
|
04/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record. (SC) | | 22-13390
|
04/29/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's En Banc Reconsideration due: May 13, 2022. (SC) | | 22-13587
|
05/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions to Withdraw as Counsel. Cause appearing, the motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant/cross-respondent is granted. The clerk shall remove John J. Savage as counsel of record for appellant/cross-respondent, and it appears appellant/cross-respondent will proceed pro se. Appellant/cross-respondent has submitted a pro se motion to extend time to file a petition for en banc reconsideration. The clerk of this court shall file the motion received on May 16, 2022, and the motion is granted. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until June 13, 2022, to file and serve a petition for en banc reconsideration. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. Counsel for respondent/cross-appellant has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Accordingly, this court defers ruling on the motion. Counsel for respondent/cross-appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to provide proof of service of the motion to withdraw on respondent/cross-appellant. (SC). | | 22-16157
|
05/20/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Extend Time to File and Serve the Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-16160
|
06/14/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-18909
|
07/14/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On April 27, 2022, respondent/cross-appellant's counsel filed a motion to withdraw. Because the motion was not accompanied by proof of service on respondent/cross-appellant, this court entered an order on May 20, 2022, that deferred ruling on the motion and directed counsel to file proof of service of the motion within 7 days. Counsel was cautioned that failure to comply could result in the denial of the motion. To date, counsel has not provided this court with proof of service of the motion to withdraw. Accordingly, the motion is denied. (SC) | | 22-22199
|
07/14/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-22281
|
08/09/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 8/29/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 22-24846
|
08/09/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 8/29/22 ORDER) (SC} | | |
08/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Stay the Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-24936
|
08/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur and Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of the Remittitur.
Appellant/cross-respondent mailed a motion to stay issuance of the remittitur pending the filing of a petition for a writ of certiorari with the United States Supreme Court on August 8, 2022. The motion is therefore construed as a motion to recall and stay issuance of the remittitur. Cause appearing, the motion is granted to the following extent. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur. Issuance of the remittitur is stayed until December 7, 2022. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by December 7, 2022, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant/cross-respondent has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by December 7, 2022, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-26956
|
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2022. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 8/29/22 ORDER) (SC) | | 22-24846
|
12/21/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 22-40001
|
12/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-40001
|