Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/07/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Petition in regards to the July 2020 Nevada State Bar Examination. | | 20-17361
|
05/07/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Inviting Public Comment. The Nevada Supreme Court invites written comment from the bench, bar, and public regarding the proposed modified format of the bar examination for the July 2020 examination. Comments may be submitted to: Elizabeth A. Brown, Clerk of the Supreme Court, 201 South Carson Street, Carson City, Nevada 89701 by 5:00 p.m., May 14, 2020.Comments may be submitted to the court by hard copy or electronically to nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. EN BANC. | | 20-17365
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kimberly M. Carrubba. | | 20-17452
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Olivia Campbell. | | 20-17547
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ben Lehavi. | | 20-17548
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from James R. Donahue. | | 20-17549
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Courtney Devine. | | 20-17551
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michelle Mowry. | | 20-17553
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Janette Bloom. | | 20-17554
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Samantha Edmondo. | | 20-17556
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Clay A. Tillack. | | 20-17557
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jim Smyth. | | 20-17595
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Bradley L. Kenny. | | 20-17596
|
05/08/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Craig P. Kenny. | | 20-17597
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michael E. Stoberski. | | 20-17623
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Andrea D. Orwoll. | | 20-17624
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Judge James E. Wilson, Jr. | | 20-17625
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Carol F. Chesnut. | | 20-17626
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ravi N. Bawa. | | 20-17627
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Nallely Abad. | | 20-17628
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Julianna Zieno. | | 20-17629
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Valeska Alvarado. | | 20-17630
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Noah A. Duran. | | 20-17631
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Eric Posin. | | 20-17632
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Steven Abbott. | | 20-17633
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Mike Rowe. | | 20-17634
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Arleen N. Kaizer. | | 20-17635
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Claudia Angelos. | | 20-17636
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jason Margolis. | | 20-17638
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Margo Chernysheva. | | 20-17640
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Angela M. | | 20-17641
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from David Stern. | | 20-17642
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Curt Harrington. | | 20-17643
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Angela M. | | 20-17647
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Patricia E. Salkin and Sara J. Berman. | | 20-17648
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Steven E. Kish III. | | 20-17681
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Carol L. Chomsky and Andrea A. Curcio. | | 20-17682
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lisa Evans. | | 20-17695
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Gokalp Bayramoglu. | | 20-17696
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Mandana Divanbeiki. | | 20-17810
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Eckley M. Keach, III. | | 20-17813
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Christine L. Atwood. | | 20-17815
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Thomas A. Collins. | | 20-17816
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jessica Gandy. | | 20-17818
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Deborah Jones Merritt. | | 20-17850
|
05/11/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Judge Barry L. Breslow. | | 20-17851
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Eileen Kaufman. | | 20-17933
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Pamela Everett. | | 20-17948
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Shirin Dorin. | | 20-17949
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kristine Bernhardt. | | 20-18003
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Judith Welch Wegner. | | 20-18004
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Rich Sanchez. | | 20-18005
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kendall Lovell. | | 20-18006
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments for Andrea Vieira. | | 20-18059
|
05/12/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments for Bianca V. Gonzalez. | | 20-18063
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from David Lyubarsky. | | 20-18185
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Astasia Lucas. | | 20-18186
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Scott Whitworth. | | 20-18190
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Christopher Janof. | | 20-18191
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Stace Taylor. | | 20-18192
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Haley Beza. | | 20-18193
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Paige Hall. | | 20-18194
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Trenton Ross. | | 20-18195
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ryan A. Semerad. | | 20-18196
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Megan M. Ortiz. | | 20-18197
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jose I. Rivera. | | 20-18198
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jade Askeroth and Thomas Askeroth. | | 20-18206
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ronald D. Alling. | | 20-18208
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jennifer E. Yee. | | 20-18211
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Norman V. Ortega. | | 20-18274
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Barbara Buckley. | | 20-18275
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Daniel R. Sanchez. | | 20-18276
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Judith Berkley. | | 20-18281
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from M. Torrence. | | 20-18286
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sandra G. Lawrence. | | 20-18288
|
05/13/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Matthew Hughes. | | 20-18291
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Nicole Lutey. | | 20-18344
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Yolanda Carapia. | | 20-18345
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Robert Reinhardt. | | 20-18347
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Tracie M. Jefcik. | | 20-18348
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Tamara Cannella. | | 20-18349
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Richard A. Manhattan. | | 20-18350
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Carol Davis Zucker. | | 20-18351
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Steven Broka. | | 20-18360
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Candace Herling. | | 20-18361
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sophia A. Romero. | | 20-18366
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Nick Sabatino. | | 20-18367
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jamie Cogburn. | | 20-18368
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Silvia U. Villanueva. | | 20-18372
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Benjamin P. Edwards. | | 20-18373
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jaclyn Kliewer. | | 20-18374
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ariana M. Kenourgios. | | 20-18376
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Walter B. Fey. | | 20-18384
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jessica K. Peterson | | 20-18385
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Marsha Griggs. | | 20-18388
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Bryce R. Moir. | | 20-18390
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Peter Petersen. | | 20-18393
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Justin Pasquale. | | 20-18394
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kristen Hensley, Victoria McCoy and Olivia Haigler. | | 20-18397
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Brittany M. Woodman. | | 20-18398
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Franny Forsman. | | 20-18400
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from George Omar Koury. | | 20-18401
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Troy Fox. | | 20-18415
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from W. Michael Horvath. | | 20-18419
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Priscilla L. Baker. | | 20-18422
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from KC Caraballo. | | 20-18423
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lori Delaney Johnson. | | 20-18425
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Board of Directors Las Vegas Defense Lawyers. | | 20-18428
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jason R. Wigg. | | 20-18431
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Monique Thompson. | | 20-18432
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Regina Bradley. | | 20-18487
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Tosha Perry. | | 20-18488
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Vickie Clark. | | 20-18489
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Casey A. Xavier. | | 20-18492
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kelley K. Blatnik. | | 20-18493
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lane R. Mills. | | 20-18494
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ryan McConnell. | | 20-18495
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Roger C. Bailey. | | 20-18496
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jean R. Sternlight. | | 20-18497
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sylvia R. Lazos. | | 20-18498
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Karl O. Riley. | | 20-18500
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michael Hill. | | 20-18504
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from UNLV Boyd School of Law Adjunct Faculty. | | 20-18505
|
05/14/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kerry E. Kleiman. | | 20-18506
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Daniel Hamilton. | | 20-18529
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sarah I Perez. | | 20-18530
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Rebecca Crooker. | | 20-18531
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Dean O'Connell Navalta. | | 20-18532
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Brandon P. Kemble. | | 20-18533
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Chandler Pohl. | | 20-18534
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Steven M. Silva. | | 20-18535
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Nathaniel T. Collins. | | 20-18536
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Arthur Burns. | | 20-18537
|
05/15/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from the Nevada Licensed Attorneys of Black & Lobello. | | 20-18538
|
05/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission by the Chair of the Board of Bar Examiners for Permission to Submit an Additional Comment on ADKT 558. (SC). | | 20-18804
|
05/20/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Approving Modified July 2020 Nevada Bar Examination. Silver, J., with whom Stiglich, J. agrees, dissenting (SC). | | 20-19320
|
07/29/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Postponing July 2020 Bar Examination. (SC). | | 20-27598
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Matthew Estrada. | | 20-27899
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michael Hill. | | 20-27900
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Olivia Campbell. | | 20-27901
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Paige Hall. | | 20-27903
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from James Puccinelli. | | 20-27904
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Scott Whitworth. | | 20-27905
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Taylor Buono. | | 20-27906
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from L.C. Perry. | | 20-27907
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Megan Ortiz. | | 20-27908
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Nicole A. Bastos. | | 20-27912
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Arthur G. Burns. | | 20-27913
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Austin Maul. | | 20-27914
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kendall Lovell. | | 20-27917
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kathleen S. Villatoro. | | 20-27919
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kaila Patrick. | | 20-27920
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Cory Juelke. | | 20-27924
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Mary Higgins. | | 20-28028
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Haley Beza. | | 20-28029
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Daniel. | | 20-28030
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Daniel Brady. | | 20-28031
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ronni Musumeci. | | 20-28032
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Mary Huggins. | | 20-28033
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order. On July 30, 2020, Meagan Ortiz, a member of the class of 2020, William S. Boyd School of Law, submitted a petition requesting this court reconsider its July 24, 2020, order postponing the July bar examination to August 11 and 12, 2020. Having reviewed the petition, we elect to construe it as a motion to reconsider our July 24, 2020, order postponing the July 2020 examination and our May 20, 2020, order in which we rejected canceling the examination and granting diploma privilege in favor of a modified examination. The clerk of this court is directed to return the $250 filing fee to Ms. Ortiz, to file the petition received on July 30, 2020, in ADKT 0558, and serve a copy of the petition on the members of the Nevada Board of Bar Examiners and the Director of Admissions, Brian Kunzi. The court has been in contact with the chair of the Nevada Board of Bar Examiners, Richard M. Trachok, II, and Mr. Kunzi concerning these issues and directs the clerk to file, also in ADKT 558, the Julky 29, 2020 letter from Mr. Trachok to the court and the Notice of Applicants from Brian Kunzi the court received on July 29, 2020. The court has also received correspondence from examinees concerning the July 2020 exam which, with the writer's permission, it has forwarded to the clerk for filing in ADKT 558. | | 20-28052
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Motion for Reconsideration (Petition to Amended Rule 51). | | 20-28056
|
07/31/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Letter from Richard Trachok. | | 20-28084
|
07/31/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Brian T. Kunzi. | | 20-28085
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Richard Bryant. | | 20-28116
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michael Musumeci. | | 20-28117
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Laura Farr. | | 20-28120
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Maritza Avelar. | | 20-28122
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Liza Ference. | | 20-28124
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Pamela Jackson. | | 20-28127
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lindsey Sanchez. | | 20-28128
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Tori Maul. | | 20-28129
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Donovan Smith. | | 20-28131
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Steven E. Kish III. | | 20-28136
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Troy Gross. | | 20-28140
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Patrick Vasquez. | | 20-28143
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michele Phillips. | | 20-28144
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michelle Karas. | | 20-28149
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Julius Lovell. | | 20-28156
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Zane Willett. | | 20-28157
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Daniel LaPolla. | | 20-28158
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Salma Granich. | | 20-28165
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Felicia Burns. | | 20-28166
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Glezzelle Tapay. | | 20-28167
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from 2020 Bar Exam Applicant. | | |
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jenna Campbell. | | 20-28171
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Cristian Petriuc. | | 20-28173
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Shea Duncan. | | 20-28174
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Alynxandria Sartre. | | 20-28175
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Danyelle M. Matthews. | | 20-28176
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kelly Doran. | | 20-28178
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Layne Heggen. | | 20-28180
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Donald Smith. | | 20-28181
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kendra Patlak. | | 20-28182
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Daniel Huynh. | | 20-28184
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Micah Nihart. | | 20-28185
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Casey J. Dobel. | | 20-28186
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lindsay Beth Willett. | | 20-28190
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jenna N. Lavigna. | | 20-28193
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Barbara Shadoan. | | 20-28197
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Niki Shadoan. | | 20-28198
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sheldon Friedberg. | | 20-28199
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jade Askeroth. | | 20-28201
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from David Scott Rojo. | | 20-28202
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Loree Hearne. | | 20-28203
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lila Guthridge. | | 20-28204
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Rick Mula. | | 20-28205
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Paige Hall. | | 20-28208
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Roxanne Momot. | | 20-28209
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Emily Meibert. | | 20-28211
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Joshua Nelson. | | 20-28212
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sandy Costa. | | 20-28281
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Chris Muto. | | 20-28282
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from B. Wade Lovell. | | 20-28283
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Breanna Smith. | | 20-28284
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Alysha BeDell. | | 20-28286
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kushal S. Patel. | | 20-28287
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Dallas Anselmo. | | 20-28288
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Tosha Perry. | | 20-28291
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Douglas Turner. | | 20-28294
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Terri Berner. | | 20-28295
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Alexander Lovell. | | 20-28296
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ann-Marie Evans. | | 20-28298
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Marissa Otteson. | | 20-28299
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Teran McDaniel-Aberg. | | 20-28301
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sheena Mattimoe-Campbell. | | 20-28303
|
08/03/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from John Flanagan. | | 20-28305
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Katrin Marquez. | | 20-28510
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jungmin Park. | | 20-28511
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Monique Thompson. | | 20-28513
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Thomas W. Askeroth. | | 20-28516
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Raquel Lopez. | | 20-28517
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Thomas Bolen. | | 20-28518
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sierra Stepp. | | 20-28519
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jazmin Chiarella. | | 20-28520
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Gokalp Bayramoglu. | | 20-28522
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Alexander Dorin. | | 20-28530
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Wes L. Blower. | | 20-28532
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Shirin Dorin. | | 20-28534
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Christiana Dupont. | | 20-28535
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Clint Kolseth. | | 20-28536
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Pamela Everett. | | 20-28539
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Osibinaeyi Soje-Diyan. | | 20-28541
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ban Ashak. | | 20-28543
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Future Peacemaker. | | |
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sara Gordon, Lydia Nussbaum and Addie Rolnick. | | 20-28547
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Joseph Ference. | | 20-28549
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Edie Guerra. | | 20-28550
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from John-Martin Meyer. | | 20-28551
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Clay Cooper. | | 20-28553
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Barbara Andrade. | | 20-28554
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kendall Lovell. | | 20-28555
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lina Oraha. | | 20-28556
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Erika Smolyar. | | 20-28559
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Phillip Dorin. | | 20-28561
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Rani Williams. | | 20-28562
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from John Sweeney. | | 20-28563
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jodi Carlisi. | | 20-28564
|
08/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kira Brandt-Askeroth. | | 20-28565
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Memo from Richard M. Trachok. (SC). | | 20-28605
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Corey J. Hallquist. | | 20-28643
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kelsey Angeley. | | 20-28644
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Patrick Harrington. | | 20-28645
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Shirin Dorin. | | 20-28646
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Concerned Bar Applicant 2020. | | |
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Brittany Daisy. | | 20-28649
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Matt Hoffer. | | 20-28652
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Justice Domingo. | | 20-28653
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lauren Gorman. | | 20-28654
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from David L. Berdan. | | 20-28655
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Wright Noel. | | 20-28656
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Pierron Tackes. | | 20-28657
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Charles Deskins. | | 20-28658
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michael Hunter Schwartz. | | 20-28659
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Lamonte W. Carter. | | 20-28660
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Allison Kallin. | | 20-28661
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Christine Ryan Hotchkin. | | 20-28662
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Hon. Frank Sullivan. | | 20-28663
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Shannon A. Kallin. | | 20-28664
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Christopher Estrada. | | 20-28665
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Max Smilow. | | 20-28666
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Bryce Moir. | | 20-28667
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Patrick R. Hulbert. | | 20-28668
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Yasha Ahoubim. | | 20-28671
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Tealanie Baldwin. | | 20-28672
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jennifer Yee. | | 20-28673
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Shaneka Malloyd. | | 20-28674
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Taylor Reeves. | | 20-28675
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Regina Bradley. | | 20-28676
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sumari Barnes. | | 20-28677
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Dennis Huggins. | | 20-28678
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Chris Jennison. | | 20-28679
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Eric Robbins. | | 20-28680
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Samantha N. King. | | 20-28681
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Myrra Dvorak. | | 20-28682
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Taylor Reeves. | | 20-28683
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Robert Holley. | | 20-28684
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Andrea Vieira. | | 20-28685
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michael Olsen and Thomas Grover. | | 20-28686
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michelle Mowry. | | 20-28687
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Randolph Fiedler, Sarah Hawkins, Martin Wiener, Caitlyn McAmis, Maizie Pusich and John Piro. | | 20-28688
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Elody Tignor. | | 20-28737
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Paige Hall. | | 20-28739
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Augusta Massey. | | 20-28740
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Brandi Cassady. | | 20-28741
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Brandi Cassady. | | 20-28744
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Burke Williamson. | | 20-28746
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Abigail Stanley. | | 20-28747
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Daniel Hamilton. | | 20-28748
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Joe Bradley. | | 20-28749
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Michael Flagg. | | 20-28750
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Sumoci Haynes. | | 20-28751
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Zachary Meyer. | | 20-28752
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Mary Beth Beazley. | | 20-28755
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Las Vegas Latino Bar Association. (SC). | | 20-28756
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Ian King. | | 20-28757
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kami Orton. | | 20-28758
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Keith Gibson. | | 20-28759
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Katrina Wagoner. | | 20-28760
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Avetana Lovato. | | 20-28762
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jim Smyth. | | 20-28763
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Dylan Joseph. | | 20-28764
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Frank Fritz, III. | | 20-28765
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Megan Ortiz. | | 20-28766
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Pengxiang Tian. | | 20-28767
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Brian Anderson, Alison Brasier, Jeffrey Rogan, Lawrence Ruiz, Brian Reeve, Kristina Gilmore, Lauren Pena, Josef Karacsonyi, Jon Carlston, and Brandon Kemble. | | 20-28770
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Megan Thomas. | | 20-28772
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Steven Silva. | | 20-28774
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Liza Bradley. | | 20-28775
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Kayla Ballou. | | 20-28778
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jade Byrd. | | 20-28779
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Drake Corbin. | | 20-28781
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Jasmine Penney. | | 20-28783
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Stephen Stubbs. | | 20-28785
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Comments from Mary Huggins. | | 20-28792
|
08/05/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order. The court is not persuaded that it should join the small number of states that have elected to grant diploma privileges. We are persuaded, however, by the public comments expressing concern with the evolving instructions applicants have received, which the BBX must clarify and submit to the court for approval no later than close of business on Thursday, August 6. Accordingly, the court orders as follows: 1. The bar examination should proceed as rescheduled on August 11 and 12, 2020, using the software the Nevada BBX have used to administer the essay sessions for the last three Nevada bar exams; Applicants may use outside materials to complete the exam but are prohibited from seeking or accepting assistance from any other individual during the exam except as provided in paragraph 4 below; 3. The Nevada BBX shall submit a clarified and final set of applicant instructions to the court for approval no later than Thursday, August 6, 2020; 4. The Nevada Board of Bar Examiners shall administer the exam in a manner consistent with this order and have available during the examination proctors and technical support for the examinees to communicate with by phone; 5. The petition to reconsider our May 20, 2020 order declining to grant diploma privileges is denied; and 6. Applicants who cannot take the bar examination on the rescheduled dates may elect to withdraw and receive a full refund or reschedule for the February 2021 examination with no additional fee. | | 20-28917
|
08/06/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Proposed 2020 Nevada Bar Exam; Exam Day Procedures and Instructions; Remote Administration. With attachments. | | 20-29067
|
08/07/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order. We approve the attached applicant instructions for use in the August 11 and 12, 2020 bar examination. The BBX shall transmit a copy of the attached documents to the bar applicants on August 7, 2020. | | 20-29186
|