Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/18/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/18/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-22727
|
06/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-22729
|
06/18/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael K. Wall. (SC) | | |
06/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-22796
|
06/18/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 20-22832
|
07/09/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-25427
|
08/03/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued to August 11, 2020, at 11:00 AM to allow the District Court to rule on a related matter. (SC) | | 20-29127
|
08/27/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 1, 2020, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 20-31695
|
08/28/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg, Joel Henriod, and Abraham Smith of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP) for National Union Fire Insurance Company andRoof Deck Enterainment, LLC d/b/a Marquee Nightclub. (SC) | | 20-31826
|
08/31/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge . (SC) | | 20-31918
|
09/02/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Certificate of Service on Settlement Judge (SC) | | 20-32396
|
10/06/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 20-36644
|
10/07/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-36772
|
10/21/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-38664
|
12/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-46298
|
12/23/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: February 4, 2021. (SC) | | 20-46388
|
01/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief. (Second Request)(SC) | | 21-02934
|
02/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 18, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-03330
|
02/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File an Opening Brief that Exceeds the Word Limit. (SC) | | 21-04901
|
02/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/19/21)(SC) | | |
02/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/19/21)(SC) mmercier | | |
02/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/19/21)(SC) mmercier | | |
02/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/19/21)(SC) | | |
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief VOLUME 11. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/19/21)(SC) | | |
02/19/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-04924
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-05026
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-05027
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-05028
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-05029
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-05032
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-05033
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-05035
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-05038
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-05040
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 10. (SC) | | 21-05042
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 11. (SC) | | 21-05044
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 12. (SC) | | 21-05047
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 13. (SC) | | 21-05048
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 14. (SC) | | 21-05050
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 15. (SC) | | 21-05052
|
02/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 16. (SC) | | 21-05054
|
02/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is denied without prejudice. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. (SC) | | 21-05825
|
03/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File an Opening Brief that Exceeds the Word Limit NRAP 32(a)(7)(D). (SC) | | 21-05938
|
03/01/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-05940
|
03/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Errata to Motion for Leave to File an Opening Brief that exceeds the Word Limit. (SC) | | 21-06096
|
03/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion and errata to motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The opening brief was filed on March 1, 2021. Respondents shall have until March 31, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief(s). (SC) | | 21-06143
|
03/30/2021 | Motion | Filed stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-09128
|
03/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date April 30, 2021. (SC) | | 21-09139
|
04/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' (National Union Fire Insurance and Roof Deck Entertainment, LLC) Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-12491
|
05/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and to File Document. National Union and Roof Deck shall have until June 1, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. To date, Aspen has failed to file the answering brief. Aspen shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-13036
|
05/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Non-Party Respondent Aspen Specialty Company's Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 6/4/21). (SC) | | |
05/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix of Exhibits to Non-Party Respondent Aspen Specialty Company's Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 6/4/21). (SC) | | |
05/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike. (SC) | | 21-14161
|
05/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15433
|
06/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Aspen's) Response/Opposition to Motion to Strike. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/2/21) (SC) | | |
06/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Motion). (SC) | | 21-15686
|
06/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. The clerk of the court shall strike the answering brief and appendix filed by Aspen on May 13, 2021, remove Aspen as a respondent in this appeal, and amend the caption to conform to the caption on this order. Respondents shall have until July 1, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-16062
|
06/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-18760
|
07/06/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief due: July 21, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19201
|
07/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Mark Hutchison. (SC) | | 21-20998
|
07/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition regarding Motion for Extension of Time. (SC) | | 21-21005
|
07/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answering brief due: August 2, 2021. (SC) | | 21-22160
|
08/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Alex R. Velto. (SC) | | 21-22385
|
08/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-22457
|
08/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to File Supplemental Appendix Under Seal. (SC) | | 21-22458
|
08/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to file a supplemental appendix under seal. The motion is granted. See SRCR 7. The clerk shall file the supplemental appendix received on August 4, 2021, under seal. (SC) | | 21-22914
|
08/06/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix - Volume 1 (SEALED). | | |
08/09/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel H. Stewart of Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC, enters his appearance in the above-captioned matter as attorney for Appellant). (SC) | | 21-23067
|
08/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-24648
|
08/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: November 30, 2021. (SC) | | 21-24998
|
11/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-34228
|
12/01/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 5, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-06866
|
03/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Strike Portions of Reply Brief and Motion for Leave to Respond to Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 22-06931
|
03/10/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until March 25, 2022, to file and serve an opposition to respondents' motion to strike portions of reply brief and motion for leave to respond to supplemental authority. (SC) | | 22-07630
|
03/21/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (REJECTED PE NOTICE FILED ON 3/22/22) (SC) | | |
03/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-08929
|
03/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-08976
|
03/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Reply Brief and Opposition to Motion for Leave to Respond to Supplemental Authority. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/25/22) (SC) | | |
03/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-09419
|
03/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Reply Brief and Opposition to Motion for Leave to Respond to Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 22-09448
|
03/25/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service Re Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Reply Brief and Opposition to Motion for Leave to Respond to Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 22-09456
|
03/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply to "Motion to Strike Portions of Reply Brief and Motion for Leave to Respond to Supplemental Authority". (SC) | | 22-10135
|
04/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion to strike portions of appellant's reply brief on the ground that the reply raises issues not addressed in the opening brief. Appellant opposes the motion. Having considered the arguments of the parties this court denies the motion to strike but cautions the parties that during the disposition of the appeal, the court will disregard matters not properly raised. Respondents' motion for leave to respond to a recent unpublished federal district court order cited by appellants is also denied. (SC) | | 22-10536
|
04/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC). | | |
12/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." CADISH, J., with whom, STIGLICH, J., agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part fn1 [The Honorable Abbie Silver having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] - EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-38580
|
12/23/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Joseph C. Reynolds. (SC) | | 22-40378
|
12/23/2022 | Petition/Bar | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/23/22) (SC) | | |
12/23/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-40381
|
12/23/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-40389
|
12/23/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Mark A. Hutchison. (SC) | | |
12/27/2022 | Other | Justice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
12/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-40878
|
01/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Rehearing. (SC). | | 23-01026
|
01/12/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC). | | 23-01164
|
01/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until February 13, 2023, to file and serve answer to the petition for rehearing. (SC) | | 23-01233
|
02/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-04428
|
02/16/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-04901
|
02/16/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-04902
|
02/17/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Respondents have filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the answer to petition for rehearing and a motion for leave to file an answer in excess of the type-volume limitation. The motions are granted. The answer was filed on February 16, 2023. (SC) | | 23-05021
|
03/03/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The honorables Justice Lee and Justice Bell did not participate in the decision on rehearing] (SC) | | 23-06394
|
03/28/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/28/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-09436
|
04/14/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on March 29, 2023. (SC) | | 23-09436
|