Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/25/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/25/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-23696
|
06/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-23698
|
06/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-23701
|
07/06/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Byron E. Thomas. (SC) | | |
07/06/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-24800
|
07/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Case Appeal Statement. Appellant shall, within 7 days from the date of this order, file the overdue case appeal statement with the Supreme Court Clerk's Office. (SC) | | 20-25537
|
07/17/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-26279
|
07/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Remove Counsel From the Official Service List. (SC) | | 20-26353
|
07/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. On July 20, 2020, Richard F. Holley, Esq.; F. Thomas Edwards, Esq.; Mary Langsner, Ph.D.; and the law firm of Holley Driggs, filed a "motion to remove counsel from the official service list," which is construed as a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent. We grant the motion. The clerk shall remove attorneys Richard F. Holley, Esq.; F. Thomas Edwards, Esq.; Mary Langsner, Ph.D.; and the law firm of Holley Driggs, from the docket of this appeal. We note that respondent remains represented by Michael F. Lynch, Esq., of the law firm Lynch Law Practice, PLLC. (SC). | | 20-26884
|
07/28/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: August 10, 2020. (SC) | | 20-27405
|
08/06/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Hon. Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 20-28993
|
08/12/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Appellant to File Overdue Docketing Statement. Due: 7 Days. (SC) | | 20-29808
|
08/19/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-30675
|
08/20/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | | 20-30695
|
08/31/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals - Settlement Judge). (SC) | | 20-32111
|
10/09/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. In light of apparent non-responsiveness of both sides' counsel to recent voice mail and email communications, the settlement judge in this matter has set October 27, 2020, at 2:00 pm for a remote settlement conference without a premeditation teleconference per rule 16(b). If a settlement conference is not held, the settlement judge intends to promptly file a report to the Court recommending removal from the Settlement Program. (SC). | | 20-37136
|
10/27/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Other. Because of the non-responsiveness of both sides' counsel in connection with the setting of Rule 16(b), and the settlement judge's voice mails and emails regarding the pre-mediation conference and the attorneys-only conference set by the settlement judge for October 27, 2020, the settlement judge respectfully recommends to the Court that this matter should be removed. (SC). | | 20-39252
|
10/27/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program and Reinstating Briefing. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 20-39343
|
11/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 20-40560
|
12/01/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until December 21, 2020, to file and serve the response to order to show cause. (SC) | | 20-43476
|
12/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-46064
|
12/21/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | | 20-46075
|
12/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. This appeal may proceed and deadlines for filing of documents are reinstated as follows. Appellant's transcript request due: 7 days. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 20-46535
|
03/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend the Time for Appellant's Opening Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(b)(2) (First Request). (SC) | | 21-08367
|
03/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: April 23, 2021. (SC). | | 21-08389
|
04/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-11848
|
04/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 29, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-12092
|
04/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-12381
|
05/03/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-12693
|
05/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). (SC) | | 21-12694
|
05/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. I. (SC) | | 21-12816
|
05/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol II. (SC) | | 21-12818
|
05/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol III. (SC) | | 21-12819
|
05/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol IV. (SC) | | 21-12820
|
05/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Extraordinary circumstances and extreme need having been shown, appellant's motions requesting a third and fourth extension of time to file the opening brief are granted. The opening brief was filed on May 3, 2021 and the appendix was filed on May 4, 2021. Respondent shall have until June 2, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-12855
|
06/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend the Time To File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15523
|
06/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date is July 2, 2021. (SC) | | 21-15530
|
07/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to File Opening (Answering) Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(b)(3) (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-19140
|
07/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: August 2, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19605
|
08/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-22412
|
09/02/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: September 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25567
|
09/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. (SC) | | 21-26772
|
09/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-26773
|
09/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/04/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." RP/JH/KP. (SC) | | 22-03844
|
02/22/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-05839
|
02/22/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Byron E. Thomas. (SC) | | |
03/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-07132
|
04/01/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-10192
|
04/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-10192
|