Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/26/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/26/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-23800
|
06/26/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-23803
|
06/30/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Joel D Henriod. E-Payment via E-Flex. Ref. no. 20062690838329. (SC) | | |
07/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-24463
|
07/07/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 20-25019
|
07/22/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: August 5, 2020. (SC) | | 20-26747
|
07/30/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 20-27782
|
08/03/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 20-28112
|
08/05/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 20-28810
|
08/05/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-28913
|
08/18/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' Transcript Request Due: August 31, 2020. (SC) | | 20-30376
|
08/26/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Errata) (SC) | | 20-31461
|
08/31/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's request for Transcripts pf Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/22/20 and 7/2/20. To Court Reporter: Unknown | | 20-32082
|
10/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-39724
|
11/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-39908
|
11/03/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved to file Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date December 2nd, 2020. (SC) | | 20-39958
|
11/06/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' response to respondents' motion to dismiss appeal due: November 19, 2020. (SC) | | 20-40562
|
11/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss. (SC). | | 20-42413
|
11/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 20-43367
|
12/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Extraordinary and compelling circumstances having been shown, appellants' motion for a second extension of time to file an opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss is granted. The opposition was filed on November 30, 2020. Appellants shall have until December 7, 2020, to file and serve any reply. (SC) | | 20-43607
|
12/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-43701
|
12/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Reply to Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 20-44413
|
01/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-00123
|
01/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents have filed a motion to dismiss the appeal. The motion is denied. Appellants shall have until February 3, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-00620
|
02/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-03373
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 5, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-04246
|
03/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-06566
|
03/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until March 15, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-07088
|
03/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-07521
|
03/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-07522
|
03/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-07523
|
03/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-07524
|
03/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-07525
|
03/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-07526
|
03/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-07527
|
03/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07533
|
04/13/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Robert Z. Disman's and Yvonne A. Disman's Answering Brief due: April 28, 2021. (SC) | | 21-10606
|
04/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answer to Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-11108
|
04/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Zobrist's answering brief due: May 14, 2021. Appellants shall have 30 days from the last-filed answering brief to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-12021
|
04/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents Robert Z. Disman and Yvonne A. Disman's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-12078
|
05/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Disman's answering brief due: May 28, 2021. (SC) | | 21-12572
|
05/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-14038
|
05/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' (Yvonne Disman and Robert Disman) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15395
|
06/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-18604
|
06/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved - Appellants' Reply Brief due: July 28, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18631
|
07/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-21943
|
08/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' reply brief due: August 27, 2021. (SC) | | 21-22912
|
08/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-25090
|
08/31/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until September 3, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-25369
|
09/03/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-25788
|
09/03/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/JH/MG. (SC) | | 22-05423
|
03/15/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-08128
|
03/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08128
|