Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/08/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/08/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
07/08/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-25209
|
07/13/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Throne & Hauser. Check no. 5246. (SC) | | |
07/14/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-25830
|
07/14/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (SC) | | 20-25836
|
07/15/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC). | | |
07/27/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 18, 2020, at 9:00 AM via Blue Jeans. Case Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-27198
|
08/06/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-29005
|
08/10/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-29331
|
09/18/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 12, 2020. (SC). | | 20-34527
|
10/29/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests an extension of time up to and including December 15, 2020. (SC). | | 20-39744
|
11/11/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-41236
|
11/17/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing Pursuant to NRAP 3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent(s): 21 days from fast track statement to file fast track response. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-41792
|
11/19/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 04/21/20. Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-42315
|
12/08/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Transcriber/Transcript Video Services - Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/21/2020. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-44617
|
12/28/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 4, 2020. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-46663
|
12/31/2020 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Child Custody Fast Track Statement. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-47073
|
12/31/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-47075
|
12/31/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 20-47076
|
01/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Michelle A. Hauser of the law office of Dawson & Lordahl PLLC, in the place and stead of Throne & Hauser as counsel for appellant). Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-01076
|
01/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Fast Track Response due: January 28, 2021. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-01812
|
01/28/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-02737
|
02/25/2021 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | |
03/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel for Appellant (Jennifer V. Abrams of the Abrams & Mayo Law Firm in the place and stead of Michelle Hauser of Dawson & Lordahl as counsel for Appellant). Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-07576
|
05/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Full Briefing and Inviting Amicus Curiae Participation. Having reviewed the fast track statement and response, we conclude that this appeal warrants full briefing. Appellant's supplemental opening brief due: 30 days. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file and serve a supplemental reply brief. It appears that the participation of, and briefing by, amicus curiae may assist our resolution of the issues presented by this appeal. Thus, we request that the Family law Section of the State Bar of Nevada participate in this appeal as amicus curiae by filing a brief addressing the described issues. Amicus brief due: 7 days from the filing of the party's brief that the amicus curiae supports. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-13286
|
06/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's supplemental brief due: June 23, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16323
|
06/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-18158
|
07/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief. Nos. 81259/81439. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 7/22/2021). (SC) | | |
07/22/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Respondent's Deficient Supplemental Answering Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-21260
|
07/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Response. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-21322
|
07/26/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief due: August 23, 2021. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-21541
|
08/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-24612
|
08/24/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | |
08/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on October 4, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Due to the coronavirus pandemic, while in the courtroom attendees will be required to abide by the court's social distancing standards then in effect as recommended by the CDC. The court will also maintain recommended sanitizing standards from the CDC in the courtroom between each case argued. fn1[At this time, oral argument will be held in person. However, should the CDC guidelines and/or circumstances in Las Vegas change, oral argument will be held by videoconference. If oral argument is videoconferenced, the parties will be notified no later than September 28, 2021, and provided BlueJeans videoconferencing information.] Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-25162
|
09/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-27170
|
09/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument on October 4, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. The current status of the Covid-19 pandemic requires counsel to appear remotely for this argument.
The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection.
Within 5 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-27203
|
09/23/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Identifying Attorney for Oral Argument. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-27544
|
09/24/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Regarding Oral Argument. Nos. 81259/81439. (SC) | | 21-27649
|
10/04/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 81259. (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1. En Banc. No. 81259/81439 (SC). | | 22-01343
|
02/07/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-04006
|
02/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 8, 2022. Nos. 81259/81439 (SC) | | 22-04006
|