Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81456
Short Caption:NELSON VS. BURR, ESQ.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81456-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A794939Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Gibbons for Justice SilverPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/27/2020 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/25/2022How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-25812
07/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-25814
07/21/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro, Ltd. Check no. 1877. (SC)
07/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-26621
07/27/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)20-27195
08/11/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Docketing Statement due: August 25, 2020. (SC)20-29602
08/12/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: As soon as possible telephonically; having talked with both counsel a mediation date by counsel should be selected. (SC).20-29803
08/25/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-31311
08/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge - Docketing Statement. (SC)20-31377
08/26/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service Certificate of Service on the settlement Judge. (SC)20-31466
09/24/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).20-35204
09/24/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-35239
10/08/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/10/2019 To Court Reporter: Video Transcript Services. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)20-36870
11/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Court Reporter's Notice of Appellant's Failure to Pay. (SC)20-42807
12/01/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jennifer Gerold stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:10/10/19. (SC)20-43443
12/22/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Telephonic. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 6, 2021. (SC)20-46202
01/04/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-00049
01/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The stipulation is approved. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: February 5, 2021. (SC)21-00926
02/05/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (SC)21-03547
02/05/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-03549
03/05/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: March 22, 2021. (SC)21-06502
03/22/2021MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time for Respondents to File Answering Brief. (SC)21-08158
03/22/2021MotionFiled Stipulation Amended Stipulation Extending Time for Respondents to File Answering Brief. (SC)21-08214
03/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Stipulation. Respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-08501
04/01/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-09500
04/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: May 17, 2021. (SC)21-12192
05/17/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-14125
05/17/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-17688
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
08/18/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
11/08/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. (SC)21-32049
11/09/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
11/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until December 8, 2021, to file and serve any petition for review. If no petition for review is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur forthwith. (SC)21-32184
12/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod, and Abraham G. Smith. (SC)21-35050
12/08/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review. (SC)21-35051
12/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's petition for review due: January 7, 2022. (SC)21-35894
01/07/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Petition for Review. (SC)22-00788
01/12/2022OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
01/18/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)22-01677
01/25/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review due: February 15, 2022. (SC)22-02470
02/15/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Answer to Petition for Review. (SC)22-05114
03/24/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Review. "We grant the petition for review." fn1 [The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Chief Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] EN BANC. (SC)22-09279
03/24/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's supplemental opening brief due: 21 days. Respondent shall file and serve a supplemental answering brief within 21 days after service of appellant's brief. Appellant shall then have 14 days after service of respondent's supplemental answering brief to file and serve any supplemental reply brief. (SC)22-09280
04/12/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's supplemental opening brief due: April 28, 2022. (SC)22-11579
04/28/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. (SC)22-13546
05/19/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' supplemental answering brief due: June 2, 2022. (SC)22-15872
06/02/2022BriefFiled Respondents' Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC)22-17635
06/08/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Amicus curiae State Bar of Nevada, Probate and Trust Law Section's amicus brief due: June 23, 2022. (SC)22-18301
06/13/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Supplemental Reply Brief due: June 30, 2022. (SC)22-18766
06/22/2022MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Amicus Curiae Brief Under NRAP 29(c)(SC)22-19781
06/29/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion of the Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of respondents is granted. The clerk shall detach the amicus brief from the motion filed on June 22, 2022, and file it separately. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental reply brief, including any response to the amicus brief. (SC)22-20582
06/29/2022BriefFiled State Bar of Nevada Amicus Curiae Brief Under NRAP 29(c). (SC)22-20585
07/01/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (SC)22-20838
07/06/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief and Response to Amicus Brief. (SC)22-21332
07/07/2022Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
10/25/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)22-33510
12/29/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Pickering/Herndon/Gibbons. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 85. fn1 [The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Chief Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter. The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to sit in place of the retired Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice.] En Banc. (SC).22-40820
01/23/2023Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
01/23/2023RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)23-02051
02/02/2023RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on January 28, 2022. (SC)23-02051