Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/16/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent T. Jaksick) (SC) | | |
07/16/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent T. Jaksick) (SC) | | 20-26224
|
07/16/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent, T. Jaksick) (SC) | | 20-26226
|
07/16/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents, T. Jaksick, as Co-Trustee of the Samuel S. Jaksick, Jr. Family Tr.; Et. Al.) (SC) | | |
07/16/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents, T. Jaksick, as Co-Trustee of the Samuel S. Jaksick, Jr. Family Tr.; Et. Al.) (SC) | | 20-26228
|
07/16/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents, T. Jaksick, as Co-Trustee of the Samuel S. Jaksick, Jr. Family Tr.; Et. Al.) (SC) | | 20-26230
|
07/16/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, W. Jaksick) (SC) | | |
07/16/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, W. Jaksick) (SC) | | 20-26232
|
07/16/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, W. Jaksick) (SC) | | 20-26234
|
07/21/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Fox Rothschild. Check no. 661347. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | |
07/21/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Therese M. Shanks. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent T. Jaksick) (SC) | | |
07/24/2020 | Other | Justice James W. Hardesty disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. (SC) | | |
07/27/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Maupin Cox Legoy. Check no. 112822. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents, T. Jaksick, as Co-Trustee of the Samuel S. Jaksick, Jr. Family Tr.; Et. Al.) (SC) | | |
07/27/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent Stanley Jaksick, Co-Trustee of the Family Trust). (SC) | | |
07/27/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent Stanley Jaksick, Co-Trustee of the Family Trust). (SC) | | 20-27270
|
07/27/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent Stanley Jaksick, Co-Trustee of the Family Trust). (SC) | | 20-27274
|
07/28/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from McDonald Carano. Check no. 111332. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent Stanley Jaksick, Co-Trustee of the Family Trust). (SC) | | |
07/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for Appellant/Cross-Respondents and Respondent/Cross-Appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-27517
|
07/29/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC) | | 20-27637
|
08/05/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice No Longer Disqualified. Upon further review, Justice Hardesty is no longer disqualified and will be participating in the decision of this appeal. (SC). | | 20-28640
|
08/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the law firm of Robison, Sharp, Sullivan & Brust previously represented me (Justice Hardesty) in an unrelated matter for which I do not believe disqualification is required. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes disqualification is appropriate may file a timely motion to disqualify pursuant to NRAP 35. Any motion to disqualify must be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this voluntary disclosure. (SC) | | 20-28960
|
08/18/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants Civil Docketing Statement of Wendy Jaksick. (SC) | | 20-30478
|
08/18/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-30517
|
08/18/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Civil Docketing Statement of Stanley Jaksick. (SC) | | 20-30518
|
08/18/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Civil Docketing Statement of Todd B. Jaksick's. (SC) | | 20-30519
|
08/19/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (R. Kevin Spencer) (SC) | | 20-30545
|
08/19/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (SC) | | 20-30638
|
09/02/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 16, 2020, at 10:00 AM. (SC) | | 20-32391
|
12/08/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference scheduled for December 16, 2020 is cancelled. (SC) | | 20-44578
|
12/09/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 16, 2020, at 10:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 20-44767
|
12/29/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-46864
|
12/30/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants and respondent: 14 days transcript request. Appellants: 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-46939
|
01/13/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/4/19, 2/5/19, 2/13/19, 2/14/19, 2/15/19, 2/19/19, 2/20/19, 2/21/19, 2/22/19, 2/25/19, 2/26/19, 2/27/19, 2/28/19, 3/1/19, 3/4/19, 5/13/19, 10/14/19, and 11/19/20. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC) | | 21-01094
|
01/13/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-01132
|
01/13/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-01167
|
01/14/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-01194
|
02/10/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Linda Shaw stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/4/19. (SC) | | 21-04029
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/19/19, 3/4/19, and 5/13/19. (SC) | | 21-06862
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Constance S. Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/20/19 and 2/27/19. (SC) | | 21-06867
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Nicole J. Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/5/19. (SC) | | 21-06868
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Ann Kernan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/4/19, 2/15/19, and 2/25/19. (SC) | | 21-06874
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy B. Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/28/19. (SC) | | 21-06877
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Erin T. Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:2/21/19, 3/4/19, 10/14/20. (SC) | | 21-06881
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/13/19, 2/22/19, and 11/19/20. (SC) | | 21-06883
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Debora L. Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/14/19, 2/26/19, and 3/1/19. (SC) | | 21-06885
|
03/15/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent Todd B. Jaksick's opening brief and appendix due: April 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-07409
|
03/15/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Stanley Jaksick's opening brief and appendix due: April 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-07481
|
03/16/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request - Appellants/cross-respondents Michael S. Kimmel, Kevin Riley, and Samuel S. Jaksick, Jr. Family Trust's opening brief and appendix due: April 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-07570
|
04/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-10696
|
04/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Respondent's Opening Brief. (Todd B. Jaksick). (SC) | | 21-10718
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-10723
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 2 (SC) | | 21-10724
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 3 (SC) | | 21-10727
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 4 (SC) | | 21-10728
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 5 (SC) | | 21-10729
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 6 (SC) | | 21-10730
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 7 (SC) | | 21-10731
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 8 (SC) | | 21-10732
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 9 (SC) | | 21-10733
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 10 (SC) | | 21-10734
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 11 (SC) | | 21-10735
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 12 (SC) | | 21-10737
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 13 (SC) | | 21-10738
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 14 (SC) | | 21-10739
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 15 (SC) | | 21-10740
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 16 (SC) | | 21-10741
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 17 (SC) | | 21-10742
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 18 (SC) | | 21-10744
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 19 (SC) | | 21-10743
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 20 (SC) | | 21-10745
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 21 (SC) | | 21-10746
|
04/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 22 (SC) | | 21-10747
|
04/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's (Stanley Jaksick) Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-10751
|
05/04/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys for respondent/cross-appellant. (SC) | | 21-12757
|
05/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief on Appeal/Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal and Reply Briefs on Appeal/Answering Briefs on Cross-Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 21-13867
|
05/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until June 14, 2021, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Thereafter, appellants/cross-respondents shall have until August 13, 2021, to file the combined reply briefs on appeal and answering briefs on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-14272
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 1 (SC) | | 21-17099
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-17100
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-17101
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-17102
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-17104
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 6. (SC) | | 21-17106
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 7. (SC) | | 21-17108
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 8. (SC) | | 21-17110
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 9. (SC) | | 21-17111
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 10. (SC) | | 21-17112
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 11. (SC) | | 21-17113
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 12. (SC) | | 21-17114
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 13. (SC) | | 21-17115
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 14. (SC) | | 21-17116
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 15. (SC) | | 21-17118
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 16. (SC) | | 21-17119
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 17. (SC) | | 21-17127
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 18. (SC) | | 21-17128
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 19. (SC) | | 21-17129
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 20. (SC) | | 21-17130
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 21. (SC) | | 21-17131
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 22. (SC) | | 21-17132
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 23. (SC) | | 21-17133
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Wendy Jaksick's Appendix, Volume 24. (SC) | | 21-17134
|
06/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering and Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER 8/9/21 ORDER). (SC) | | |
06/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents Motion to Strike and Request to Vacate Current Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 21-18729
|
07/01/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until July 20, 2021, to file and serve a response to the motion to strike and request to vacate current briefing schedule filed on June 29, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19014
|
07/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay Briefing Pending Decision on Motion to Strike. (SC) | | 21-19506
|
07/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants/cross-respondents have filed a motion to suspend the briefing schedule pending the resolution of a motion to strike that was filed on June 29, 2021. This court has granted respondent/cross-appellant's telephonic request for an extension, until July 20, 2021, to file a response to the motion to strike. The motion to suspend the briefing schedule is granted as follows. The briefing schedule in this appeal and cross-appeal is suspended pending further order of this court, and the current briefing schedule is vacated. Upon resolution of the motion to strike, a new briefing schedule will be established. (SC). | | 21-19764
|
07/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Motion to Strike and Request to Vacate Current Briefing Schedule; Alternatively, Request for Extension or For Leave. (SC) | | 21-20912
|
07/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike and to Request for Extension or for Leave. (SC) | | 21-21581
|
08/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Strike and Granting Request to Refile Brief. Appellants/cross-respondents filed a motion to strike respondent/cross-appellant Wendy Jaksick's combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal for failure to conform to the typeface and type-volume limitation under NRAP 28.1(e) and NRAP 32(a)(5)(A). Respondent/cross-appellant filed an opposition to the motion, and appellants/cross-respondents filed a reply. The request for leave to exceed the type-volume limitation is denied. Appellants/cross-respondents' motion to strike respondent/cross-appellant's combined brief is granted. Respondent/cross-appellant's alternate request to revise and refile her brief is also granted. Respondent/cross-appellant's revised brief due: 14 days. Appellants/cross-respondent's request for attorney fees for the costs incurred in bringing and defending the motion to strike is denied. (SC) | | 21-23134
|
08/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's (Todd B. Jaksick) Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Therese M. Shanks. (SC) | | 21-23690
|
08/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's (Todd B. Jaksick) Notice of Appearance for Hannah E. Winston, Esq. (SC) | | 21-23691
|
08/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-24593
|
09/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Kristen D. Matteoni. (SC) | | 21-26419
|
09/17/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent Stanley Jaksick's reply brief due: October 6, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27052
|
09/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants/cross-respondents Michael S. Kimmel, Kevin Riley, and Samuel S. Jaksick, Jr. Family Trust's reply brief due: October 6, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27220
|
09/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent Todd B. Jaksick's reply brief due: October 6, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27221
|
10/06/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Todd B. Jaksick's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-28674
|
10/06/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Supplemental Appendix to Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-28735
|
10/06/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Supplemental Appendix to Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-28736
|
10/06/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-28737
|
10/06/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' (Stanley Jaksick's) Combines Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-28749
|
10/06/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's (Stanley Jaksick's) Supplemental Appendix to Answering/Reply Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-28750
|
10/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Notice of Disassociation of Counsel, Therese M. Shanks. (SC) | | 21-29498
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/cross-appellant's reply brief due: November 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30341
|
11/03/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Notice of No Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-31650
|
11/04/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
04/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented in this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for May 17, 2022, at 10:30 a.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-10238
|
04/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. On April 1, 2022, this court entered an order scheduling oral argument in this matter for May 17, 2022, at 10:30 a.m., in Carson City. Upon further consideration, this court has decided to extend the time to allow appellants/cross-respondents and respondent/cross-appellants each 20 minutes to present argument. Accordingly, the argument shall be limited to 40 minutes. (SC) | | 22-10880
|
04/12/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. This appeal is currently scheduled for oral argument on May 17, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. To accommodate this court's calendar, oral argument will begin at 11:00 a.m. on May 17, 2022. Argument shall be limited to 40 minutes. (SC) | | 22-11488
|
05/03/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-13985
|
05/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court En Banc. (SC). | | |
05/24/2022 | Other | Justice James W. Hardesty disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
06/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [The Honorable James W. Hardesty, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-19689
|
07/18/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-22426
|
07/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
08/01/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22426
|