+
Party Information
|
Role | Party Name | Represented By |
Appellant | City of Sterling Heights Police and Fire Retirement System | Randall J. Baron
(Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP/San Diego)
Benny C. Goodman, III
(Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP/San Diego)
Lindsey C. Herzik
(Robbins LLP)
Eric D. Hone
(Hone Law)
Patrick R. Leverty
(Leverty & Associates Law, Chtd.)
Erik W. Luedeke
(Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP/San Diego)
Thomas C. Michaud
(Vanoverbke, Michaud & Timmony, P.C.)
David C. O'Mara
(Former)
(O'Mara Law Firm, P.C.)
Ashley R. Rifkin
(Robbins LLP)
Brian J. Robbins
(Robbins LLP)
Joel Z. Schwarz
(Hone Law)
Kevin Seely
(Robbins LLP)
Howard S. Susskind
(Sugarman & Susskind, P.A.)
Michael J. Vanoverbeke
(Vanoverbke, Michaud & Timmony, P.C.)
Jamie L. Zimmerman
(Hone Law)
|
Appellant | Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Pension Trust Fund | Randall J. Baron
(Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP/San Diego)
Benny C. Goodman, III
(Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP/San Diego)
Eric D. Hone
(Hone Law)
Erik W. Luedeke
(Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP/San Diego)
David C. O'Mara
(Former)
(O'Mara Law Firm, P.C.)
Joel Z. Schwarz
(Hone Law)
Howard S. Susskind
(Sugarman & Susskind, P.A.)
Jamie L. Zimmerman
(Hone Law)
|
Respondent | Cantey M. Ergen | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | Carl E. Vogel | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | Charles W. Ergen | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | David K. Moskowitz | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | Dish Network Corporation | Mark E. Ferrario
(Greenberg Traurig, LLP/Las Vegas)
Christopher R. Miltenberger
(Greenberg Traurig, LLP/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | Dish Network Special Litigation Committee Counsel | Emily V. Burton
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
Robert J. Cassity
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
C. Barr Flinn
(Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP)
J. Stephen Peek
(Holland & Hart LLP/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | Gary S. Howard | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | George R. Brokaw | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | James DeFranco | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | Joseph P. Clayton | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | Steven R. Goodbarn | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Respondent | Tom A. Ortolf | Brian T. Frawley
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
J. Randall Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Mark M. Jones
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
Maya Krugman
(Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP/New York)
Ian P. McGinn
(Kemp Jones, LLP)
|
Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/28/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/28/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-31853
|
08/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-31856
|
09/08/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from The O'Mara Law Firm. Check no. 3003. (SC) | | |
09/08/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-32982
|
09/10/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 20-33309
|
09/29/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement (SC) | | 20-35793
|
10/05/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC). | | 20-36556
|
10/07/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing from Settlement Program and Reinstating Briefing. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 20-36743
|
10/21/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/27/20, 6/10/20, 7/6/20, 7/7/20, To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. (SC) | | 20-38560
|
11/17/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/06/2020, 07/07/20, 06/10/20, 01/27/20. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. (SC). | | 20-42012
|
12/01/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/27/20, 7/6/20, 7/7/20, and 6/10/20. (SC) | | 20-43442
|
12/11/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend the Time for Appellants to File their Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-45020
|
12/11/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date February 4th, 2021. (SC) | | 20-45026
|
01/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Substitution of Liaison Counsel (Eric D. Hone, Joel Z. Schwarz, and Jamie L. Zimmerman in place of the O'Mara Law Firm, P.C.) (SC) | | 21-01349
|
01/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Opening Brief. (Second Requested Extension)(SC) | | 21-01698
|
01/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants have now filed a "Notice of Substitution of Liaison Counsel" substituting attorneys Eric D. Hone, Joel Z. Schwarz, and Jamie L. Zimmerman in place of Mr. O'Mara. The substitution is approved. The clerk shall add Eric D. Hone, Joel Z. Schwarz, and Jamie L. Zimmerman, of H1 Law Group as counsel of record for appellants. Appellants shall have until March 22, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-02819
|
03/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Action Necessary by March 26, 2021. (Third Requested Extension). (SC) | | 21-08195
|
03/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's NRAP 27(e) Certificate. (SC) | | 21-08197
|
03/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: March 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08588
|
03/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Unopposed Motion to File Redacted Opening Brief and Joint Appendix Volumes 78-85 Under Seal. (SC) | | 21-08805
|
03/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief - REDACTED. (SC) | | 21-08807
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-08882
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-08883
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-08886
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 4. Part 1. (SC) | | 21-08890
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 4. Part 2. (SC) | | 21-08893
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-08894
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol 6. Part. 1 (SC) | | 21-08899
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol 6. Part 2. (SC) | | 21-08900
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-08903
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-08905
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-08920
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 10 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-08921
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 10 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-08923
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 10 Part 3. (SC) | | 21-08924
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 10 Part 4. (SC) | | 21-08925
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 11. (SC) | | 21-08926
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 12. (SC) | | 21-08927
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 13. (SC) | | 21-08929
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 14. (SC) | | 21-08932
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 15. (SC) | | 21-08934
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 16. (SC) | | 21-08935
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 17. (SC) | | 21-08937
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 18. (SC) | | 21-08942
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 19. (SC) | | 21-08946
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 20. (SC) | | 21-08959
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 22. (SC) | | 21-08966
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 21. (SC) | | 21-08967
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 22. (SC) | | 21-08969
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 23. (SC) | | 21-08971
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 24. (SC) | | 21-08974
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 25. (SC) | | 21-08978
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 26 (SC) | | 21-08983
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 27. (SC) | | 21-08984
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 28 - Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09000
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 28 - Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09001
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 29 - Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09007
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Vol. 29 - Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09008
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 30. (SC) | | 21-09010
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 31. (SC) | | 21-09018
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 32. (SC) | | 21-09023
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 33. (SC) | | 21-09024
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 34. (SC) | | 21-09025
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 35. (SC) | | 21-09026
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 36. (SC) | | 21-09027
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 37. (SC) | | 21-09028
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 38. (SC) | | 21-09029
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 39, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09034
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 39, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09038
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 40, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09040
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 40, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09041
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 41, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09043
|
03/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 41, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09044
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 42, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09062
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 42, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09065
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 43, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09073
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 43, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09077
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 43, Part 3. (SC) | | 21-09078
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 44, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09085
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 44, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09087
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 45, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09089
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol 45, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09091
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 46, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09103
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 46, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09110
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 46, Part 3. (SC) | | 21-09113
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 47, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09114
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 47, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09117
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 48, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09127
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 48, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09131
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 49, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09140
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 49, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09143
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 50, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09156
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 50, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09157
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 51, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09162
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 51, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09165
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 52. (SC) | | 21-09167
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 53. (SC) | | 21-09168
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 54. (SC) | | 21-09170
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 55, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09174
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 55, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09175
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 56. (SC) | | 21-09178
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 57. (SC) | | 21-09179
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 58. (SC) | | 21-09183
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 59. (SC) | | 21-09185
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 60, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09188
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 60, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09187
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 61, Part 1. (SC) | | 21-09192
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 61, Part 2. (SC) | | 21-09191
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 62. (SC) | | 21-09193
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 63. (SC) | | 21-09194
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 64. (SC) | | 21-09195
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 65. (SC) | | 21-09205
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 66. (SC) | | 21-09204
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 67. (SC) | | 21-09206
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 68. (SC) | | 21-09209
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 69. (SC) | | 21-09211
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 70. (SC) | | 21-09213
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 71. (SC) | | 21-09214
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 72. (SC) | | 21-09215
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 73. (SC) | | 21-09217
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 74. (SC) | | 21-09223
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 75. (SC) | | 21-09224
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 76. (SC) | | 21-09225
|
03/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 77. (SC) | | 21-09227
|
04/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed an unopposed motion to file the opening brief and volumes 78-85 of the joint appendix under seal. The motion is denied without prejudice because it is not accompanied by a copy of the opening brief or a copy of the volumes of the appendix sought to be filed under seal. Appellants may renew the motion to seal upon submission of the brief and volumes of appendix to this court. The submitted documents will remain confidential pending this court's ruling on any renewed motion to file the brief and the appendix volumes under seal. (SC) | | 21-10369
|
04/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend the Time For Respondent to File Its Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-10974
|
04/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief.(Dish Network Special Litigation Committee Counsel) Due date is May 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-10994
|
04/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion Unopposed Motion to File Opening Brief and Joint Appendix Volumes 78-85 Under Seal. (SC) | | 21-11382
|
05/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the joint appendix volumes 78-85 received on April 22, 2021, and the opening brief received on April 29, 2021. (SC) | | 21-13738
|
05/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed (SEALED) Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 78-85. (SC) | | |
05/13/2021 | Brief | Filed (SEALED) Opening Brief. (SC) | | |
05/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Special Litigation Committee of Dish Network Corp.) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15158
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Special Litigation Committee of Dish Network Corp.) Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-15159
|
06/25/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief To Dish Network Special Litigation Committee Counsel Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-18419
|
07/15/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for March 16, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-00235
|
01/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. The oral argument scheduled for March 16, 2022 is vacated and oral argument is rescheduled for February 7, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. before the en banc court in Las Vegas. (SC) | | 22-00907
|
01/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-02437
|
01/31/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Respondent Dish Network Corporation Regarding Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-03244
|
02/01/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Firm Name Change. (SC) | | 22-03353
|
02/01/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Appearance re Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-03366
|
02/01/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance re oral argument. | | 22-03438
|
02/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Amended Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument, Randall J. Baron will argue for Appellants'. (SC) | | 22-03695
|
02/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court En Banc. (SC). | | |
08/04/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We AFFIRM the district court's dismissal of the derivative suit." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-24399
|
08/30/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-27148
|
08/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC) | | |
09/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 31, 2022. (SC) | | 22-27148
|