Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/09/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/09/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-33253
|
09/09/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC) | | 20-33254
|
09/09/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-33256
|
09/24/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Paul D.S. Edwards. Money Order no. 19-177621645. (SC) | | |
09/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 20-35237
|
10/05/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-36453
|
10/06/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC) | | 20-36631
|
10/12/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 20-37306
|
10/12/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Supreme Court No. 81759 with Supreme Court No. 81595. (Nos. 81595/81759). (SC) | | 20-37374
|
10/23/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-38990
|
10/23/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-38992
|
10/23/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-12 (A-18-776375-C consolidated with A-19-799140-C). (SC) | | 20-39019
|
11/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals. These appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Appellant shall have until January 22, 2021, to file a single combined opening brief. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 20-39812
|
11/20/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. "The petition is DENIED." EN BANC. Nos 81595/81759 (SC) | | 20-42457
|
11/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents Cash4Asking, LLC; Eduardo Romay Hernandez; and Gladys Rionda Suito's Motion for Dismissal of Appeal Challenging Eighth Judicial District Court Case Number A-19-799140-C. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 20-43074
|
12/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Dismissal of Appeal Challenging Eighth Judicial District Court Case Number A-19-799140-C. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 20-44643
|
12/15/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Chad F. Clement and Kathleen A. Wilde of Marquis Aurbach Coffing are appearing in this matter for Gladys Rionda Suito, Respondent). Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 20-45342
|
12/15/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. respondent Cash4Asking, LLC, Eduardo Romay Hernandez, and Gladys C. Rionda's reply to appellant's opposition to respondents' motion for dismissal of appeal challenging eighth judicial district court case number A-19-799140-C due: December 29, 2020. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 20-45413
|
12/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Motion for Dismissal of Appeal Challenging Eighth Judicial District Court Case Number A-19-799140-C. (Cash4Asking, LLC; Eduardo Romay Hernandez; and Gladys Rionda Suito Respondents). Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 20-46799
|
01/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-00957
|
04/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Partially Dismissing Appeals. The motion to dismiss is granted and, as the Cash4Asking respondents were never party to the A-18-776375-C case, they are dismissed entirely from these appeals. The appeals shall proceed regarding the remaining respondents. Appellant's opening brief due: 30 days. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-10123
|
04/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting, Respondents' Motion for Dismissal of Appeal Challenging Eighth Judicial District Court Case Number A-19-799140-C. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-11276
|
05/07/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief due: May 24, 2021. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-13109
|
05/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 7 days. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-13441
|
05/19/2021 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 Check No. 5009 from Paul D.S. Edwards. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | |
05/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Brief. Bos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-14463
|
05/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for an Order Allowing Appellant to File Appendix. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-14465
|
05/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Appellant's Motion for an Order Allowing Appellant to File Appendix Pursuant to NRAP, Rule 30 (Second Request). Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-14900
|
06/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Reply to Respondents' Response to Motion for an Order Allowing Appellant to File Appendix Pursuant to NRAP, Rule 30. (Second Request). Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-16022
|
08/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption In Case No. 81759. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-22290
|
08/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion for reconsideration of that order, which this court has elected to treat as a petition for rehearing. The deadlines for filing briefs is suspended pending resolution of the petition for rehearing. Accordingly, appellant's motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief, filed on May 19, 2021, is denied as moot. Appellant's motion for leave to file an appendix with his brief is denied. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-22888
|
08/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Response to Notice of Modification of Caption. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-22921
|
08/09/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-23083
|
08/23/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-24590
|
09/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's answer due: 14 days. Nos 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-26114
|
09/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Amended Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant has petitioned this court for en banc reconsideration of the order dismissing these appeals as to the Cash4Asking respondents that was entered by a panel of this court on April 8, 2021. Having reviewed the petition, it appears that an answer will assist the court in resolving the issues presented. Cash4asking's answer to the petition due: 14 days. The deadlines for filing briefs shall remain suspended pending resolution of the petition for en banc reconsideration. Nos 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-26661
|
09/29/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Cash4asking, LLC, Eduardo Romay Hernandez, and
Gladys C. Rionda's answer to petition for en banc reconsideration due: October 13, 2021. Nos 81595/81759 . (SC) | | 21-28051
|
10/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Cash4asking, LLC, Eduardo Romay Hernandez, and Gladys C. Rionda's, Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-29485
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. This court entered an order directing respondents Cash4Asking, LLC, Eduardo Romay Hernandez, and Gladys C. Rionda-Suito (the Cash4Asking respondents) to file an answer to appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration of the order dismissing the Cash4Asking respondents from these appeals. The Cash4Asking respondents obtained a telephonic extension and have filed a motion for a second extension. The Cash4Asking respondents shall have until October 27, 2021, to file and serve the answer. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-30362
|
10/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-30454
|
10/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's opposition to the motion for an extension of time to respond to the petition for en banc reconsideration. An order granting the motion was filed on October 21, 2021. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-30742
|
10/27/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-31012
|
11/18/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. Cadish, J., dissenting. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-33300
|
11/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Briefing is reinstated as follows. Appellant's opening brief due: 28 days. The clerk of this court shall add "A/K/A ANGEL SANTILLI" after "A/K/A ANGEL C. MULLIS." No entity listed in the caption is called "A/D/B/A TLC VACATIONS;" accordingly, the caption shall otherwise remain the same. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-33717
|
11/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Correction or Modification of Order Reinstating Briefing. Nos. 81595/81759 (SC) | | 21-33959
|
12/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion for correction or modification of the scope of this court's order entered November 23, 2021, reinstating the briefing schedule. The motion is granted as follows. Appellant may raise any issues he deems necessary for this appeal; this court will consider or disregard matters as it deems appropriate in its disposition of the appeal. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-35888
|
12/17/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until January 4, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 21-36083
|
01/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. Order to File Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 14 days. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 22-02957
|
03/10/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDERS these appeals DISMISSED." SNP22-JH/LS/DH Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 22-07658
|
04/04/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-10274
|
04/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 6, 2022. Nos. 81595/81759. (SC) | | 22-10274
|