Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/14/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
09/14/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-33706
|
09/23/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on Response to Supreme Court Email dated 09/23/2020 - C342405 (SC) | | 20-35008
|
10/02/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-36342
|
10/08/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Santi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/23/19, 2/7/20. 2/21/20, 2/28/20, 3/27/20, 5/29/20, 7/17/20, 7/31/20, 8/14/20, and 8/21/20. | | 20-36965
|
01/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-00864
|
01/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01353
|
03/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-07218
|
03/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-07996
|
04/01/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-09489
|
04/01/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-09490
|
04/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Christopher T. Howell. (SC) | | 21-11512
|
04/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-11534
|
04/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date 6/2/21. (SC) | | 21-11562
|
06/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time To File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15562
|
06/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: September 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16755
|
08/31/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents Motion for Extension of Time. Answering Brief (50) days. (SC) | | 21-25366
|
09/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent's motion requesting a third extension of time to file the answering brief is denied. Respondent's answering brief due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-26508
|
09/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27854
|
10/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-30833
|
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing and Inviting Amicus Briefing. The parties shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file a supplemental brief. The Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice and Nevada District Attorney's Association are invited to submit amicus briefs addressing the issues set forth above. Any amicus brief must be filed within 15 days from the filing of the party's supplemental brief being supported by the amicus curiae. Nos 81782/82038 (SC) | | 22-01362
|
02/08/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Deborah L. Westbrook. (SC) | | 22-04250
|
02/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Joint Motion for Extension to File Supplemental Briefing and Amicus Briefing. (SC) | | 22-04256
|
02/22/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant and respondents shall have until April 13, 2022, to file their supplemental briefs addressing the issues outlined in this court's January 13 order. Any amicus brief from the Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice and Nevada District Attorney's Association shall be filed within 15 days from the filing of the party's supplemental brief being supported by the amicus curiae. Other interested amici may proceed by motion in accord with NRAP 29. The brief shall not exceed 10 pages and shall otherwise comply with the requirements of NRAP 32(a)(4)-(6). Nos. 81782/82038. (SC) | | 22-05679
|
04/13/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-11677
|
04/13/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-11690
|
04/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Participate as Amicus Curiae and Motion to Submit Amicus Brief in Excess of 10 pages. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/18/22) (SC) | | |
04/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief Brief of the Washoe County Public Defender's Office as Amicus Curiae. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/18/22) (SC) | | |
04/18/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-12087
|
04/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Participate as Amicus Curiae and Motion to Submit Amicus Brief in Excess of 10 pages. (SC) | | 22-12102
|
04/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Brief of the Washoe County Public Defender's Office as Amicus Curiae. (SC) | | 22-12103
|
04/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The motions filed by the Washoe County Public Defender's office for leave to file briefs of amicus curiae in excess of 10 pages are granted. The amicus briefs were filed on April 18, 2022. Nos. 81782/82038. (SC) | | 22-12929
|
04/27/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Nevada District Attorney Association shall have until May 12, 2022, to file and serve its amicus curiae brief. (SC) | | 22-13240
|
04/27/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice shall have until May 12, 2022, to file and serve its amicus curiae brief. (SC) | | 22-13294
|
04/28/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Jennifer Noble appearing for Amicus Nevada District Attorney's Association. (SC) | | 22-13534
|
05/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 7, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-13820
|
05/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for attorney Stacy Newman for Amicus Curiae Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice. (SC) | | 22-15121
|
05/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Allow Amicus Curiae to Submit a Brief Exceeding 10 Pages. (SC) | | 22-15123
|
05/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief Brief by Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice as Amicus Curiae, Supporting Affirmance for Manson & Adams. (SC) | | 22-15125
|
05/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support if Affirmance Nevada District Attorney's Association. (SC) | | 22-15172
|
05/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Allow Amicus Curiae to Submit a Brief Exceeding 10 Pages. (SC) | | 22-15174
|
05/13/2022 | Motion | Filed Request for Permission to File a Reply to the Amicus Brief Filed by the Nevada District Attorney's Association. (SC) | | 22-15254
|
05/13/2022 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief of the Washoe County Public Defender's Office as Amicus Curiae. (STRICKEN PER 5/20/22 ORDER). (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Both NACJ and NDAA have filed motions for leave to file an amicus brief in excess of 10 pages. NRAP 29(e). Cause appearing, the motions are granted. Amicus Washoe County Public Defender has filed a motion for leave to file a reply to the amicus brief filed by the Nevada District Attorneys' Association. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall strike the reply filed on May 13, 2022. fn1 [Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed May 12, 2022, the clerk of this court shall add attorneys Rene L. Valladares and Stacy Newman and the federal public defender's office to the docket as counsel for amicus NACJ and shall add Jennifer Noble and the Washe County District Attorney as counsel for NDAA.] 81782/82038. (SC) | | 22-16044
|
05/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-16464
|
06/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |
09/12/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." HERNDON, J., with whom PARRAGUIRRE, C.J., and HARDNESTY, J., agree, concurring in part and dissenting in part. EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-28427
|
10/07/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-31679
|
10/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 10, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31679
|