Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/17/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
09/17/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-34226
|
09/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 20-34228
|
09/17/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 20-34292
|
09/21/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC) | | |
09/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Attorney Joel E. Tasca, Esq. of the law firm Ballard Spahr LLP, appearing as attorney for appellant Kathleen June Jones. (SC) | | 20-35150
|
10/01/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 16, 2020, at 9:00 am. (SC). | | 20-36099
|
10/05/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Micah S. Echols of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm enters his appearance as associated counsel of record for respondents). (SC) | | 20-36524
|
10/05/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | | 20-36540
|
10/05/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amended Certificate of Service to Notice of Appearance of Counsel. (SC) | | 20-36557
|
10/15/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/15/2020) (SC) | | |
10/15/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (Docketing Statement). (SC) | | 20-37921
|
10/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-38289
|
10/21/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 20-38645
|
11/06/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement and Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. Due: 7 days.The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-40606
|
11/09/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-40896
|
11/09/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals). (SC) | | 20-40960
|
11/19/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Appellant's Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. (SC) | | 20-42395
|
01/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: February 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01855
|
02/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-04902
|
02/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-04904
|
03/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-08143
|
03/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answering brief due: May 6, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08681
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-12941
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-12942
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-12943
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-12944
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-12945
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 6. (SC) | | 21-12946
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 7. (SC) | | 21-12947
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 8. (SC) | | 21-12948
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 9. (SC) | | 21-12949
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 10. (SC) | | 21-12950
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 11. (SC) | | 21-12951
|
05/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 12. (SC) | | 21-12952
|
05/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to File Appendix, Volume Nos. 13, 14 and 15 Under Seal. (SC) | | 21-12953
|
05/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-12954
|
05/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Master Index to Respondents' Appendix - Volume Nos. 1-12. (SC) | | 21-13005
|
05/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Respondents' Appendix - Volume Nos. 1-12. (SC) | | 21-13006
|
05/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answering brief due: May 20, 2021. (SC) | | 21-13712
|
05/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (Third request) (SC) | | 21-14614
|
05/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' unopposed motion for leave to file a portion of their appendix under seal is granted. The clerk shall file volumes 13-15 pf respondents' appendix, received on May 10, 2021, under seal. (SC) | | 21-14890
|
05/25/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix , Volumes 13, 14 & 15. (SEALED). (SC) | | |
05/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15321
|
06/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on May 20, 2021, is granted. The answering brief was filed on May 27, 2021. Appellant shall have until June 28, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-15597
|
06/10/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: July 12, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16642
|
07/12/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-20041
|
07/13/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-24897
|
08/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
10/20/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
02/24/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court of Appeals. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6. fn3 [We initially affirmed in an unpublished order on October 20, 2021, Donna and Robyn thereafter filed a motion to reissue our order as an opinion. We grant the motion and now issue this opinion.] Court of Appeals MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
03/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
03/21/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-08749
|
03/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08749
|