Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/28/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/28/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-35577
|
09/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-35581
|
09/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-35583
|
09/28/2020 | Other | Justice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. (SC) | | |
09/28/2020 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties. (SC) | | |
09/30/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Brandon L. Phillips. (SC) | | |
10/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-36106
|
10/07/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC). | | 20-36751
|
10/08/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-37062
|
10/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC). | | 20-39474
|
11/02/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC). | | 20-39798
|
11/03/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 20-40008
|
12/08/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/12/20. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/8/20) (SC) | | |
12/08/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (Transcript Request Form). (SC) | | 20-44645
|
12/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for a Continuance of Time to Request Transcripts. (SC) | | 20-45474
|
12/18/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcript request form. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. (SC) | | 20-45833
|
12/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondents. (SC) | | 20-46159
|
12/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Kory L. Kaplan's motion to withdraw as counsel for respondents is construed as seeking withdrawal for himself and his partner, attorney Kyle P. Cottner. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove attorneys Kory L. Kaplan, Kyle P. Cottner, and the law firm of Kaplan Cottner from the docket in this appeal. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance or to inform this court in writing that they intend to proceed pro se. (SC) | | 20-47044
|
01/06/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/12/2020. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (SC) | | 21-00344
|
01/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/21/21) (SC) | | |
01/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-01712
|
01/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-01881
|
01/22/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-01984
|
01/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on January 22, 2021. (SC) | | 21-02382
|
02/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-03112
|
02/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved to File Opening Brief. Due date is February 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-03128
|
02/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-04589
|
02/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appendix to Opening Brief. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-04619
|
02/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Index to Appendix. (SC) | | 21-05308
|
02/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-05371
|
02/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date respondents have not responded to this court's order, nor has new counsel entered an appearance; accordingly, this court concludes that respondents intend to proceed pro se. Respondents' answering briefs are due to be filed on or before March 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-05713
|
03/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for a Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-06936
|
03/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorney Richard F. Scotti has filed a notice of appearance as counsel for respondents. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Scotti to the docket and service list. Respondents' answering brief remains due on or before March 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-07437
|
03/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL) (SC) | | |
03/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/16/21) (SC) | | |
03/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-07632
|
03/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Emergency Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-07706
|
04/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until May 27, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-09563
|
05/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/27/21) (SC) | | |
05/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/27/21) (SC) | | |
05/27/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-15295
|
05/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-15303
|
05/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 5/28/21) (SC) | | |
05/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-15329
|
05/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/28/21) (SC) | | |
05/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-15393
|
05/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-15441
|
07/15/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
09/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-25974
|
09/08/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
10/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Rescinding Transfer to Court of Appeals. On September 8, 2021, this appeal was transferred to the court of appeals. After transferring the appeal, it was discovered that the three court of appeals judges will need to recuse themselves from consideration of the matter. Accordingly, we rescind the September 8 transfer order and recall this appeal to this court for resolution. (SC) | | 21-31162
|
10/28/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgement of the district court AFFIRMED. fn4[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/JH/MG (SC) | | 22-13643
|
05/24/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-16486
|
05/24/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-16486
|