Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/29/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Due. (SC) | | |
10/29/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-39648
|
10/29/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-39650
|
10/29/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Aaron Grigsby. (SC) | | |
11/02/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-39865
|
11/03/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC) | | |
11/13/2020 | Settlement Notice | Filed Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (SC) | | 20-41553
|
11/19/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: December 7, 2020. (SC) | | 20-42384
|
12/07/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-44352
|
12/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Stay of Order. (SC) | | 20-44576
|
12/08/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-44579
|
12/14/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for February 4, 2021 at 9:00 AM via BlueJeans. (SC) | | 20-45262
|
12/15/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Response to Motion for Stay of Order due: December 29, 2020. (SC) | | 20-45356
|
12/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay of Order. (SC) | | 20-45343
|
01/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On November 13, 2020, this appeal was assigned to this court's settlement program. Thereafter, appellant filed a motion to stay the district court order challenged on appeal pending resolution of this appeal. Respondent has filed an opposition. This court defers ruling on this motion until after the completion of settlement proceedings. (SC) | | 21-00437
|
02/04/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-03422
|
02/05/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-03579
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellant's response. The deadlines to file documents in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. This court defers ruling on the motion for stay pending resolution of this issue regarding jurisdiction. (SC) | | 21-04340
|
03/15/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause due: March 29, 2021. (SC) | | 21-07372
|
03/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-08810
|
04/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing and Denying Motion for Stay. This court ordered appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Having considered appellant's response, this appeal may proceed. Transcript request form due: 14 days. Opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. Appellant has filed a motion for stay pending appeal. Respondent opposes the motion. The motion for stay is denied. (SC) | | 21-11751
|
05/06/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-13101
|
07/20/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20816
|
08/04/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-22632
|
08/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-22637
|
09/03/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief September 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25762
|
09/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27018
|
09/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix- Volume I. (SC) | | 21-27019
|
10/18/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: November 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-29863
|
11/01/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-31395
|
11/02/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-34630
|
12/06/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
01/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
02/10/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/11/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Review due: February 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-04603
|
02/25/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-06214
|
03/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-07203
|
03/21/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Response to Petition for Review. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/21/22) (SC) | | |
03/21/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-08768
|
03/21/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Response to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-08791
|
03/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance for Respondent's Response to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-08984
|
03/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service for Respondent's Response to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-08989
|
04/08/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review. "We grant the petition for review." (VACATED PER 11/10/22 ORDER). EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-11157
|
06/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-18404
|
11/09/2022 | Case Status Update | No Disposition Filed/Case Closed, (SC). | | |
11/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We vacate the order granting the petition for review and direct the clerk to issue the remittitur forthwith. This disposition has the same effect as a denial of the petition for review when initially considered. Because the Court of Appeals' Order of Affirmance was not reversed or otherwise vacated by this court, that disposition is final. fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court] (SC) | | 22-35516
|
11/10/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-35585
|
11/10/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/30/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-35585
|