Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/06/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
11/06/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-40586
|
11/06/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
11/17/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. Notice of appearance due: 35 days. (SC) | | 20-41796
|
11/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (SC) | | 20-41984
|
11/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 20-41985
|
11/17/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC) | | 20-41997
|
11/17/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA) (SC) | | 20-42000
|
11/19/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant's motion for the appointment of counsel is denied as moot. The filing fee was waived when this appeal was docketed in this court. No action will be taken on appellant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (SC) | | 20-42377
|
11/20/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on November 20, 2020. This matter is referred to the Washoe County conflict counsel administrator Krista Meier, Esq. for the selection and appointment of counsel for Appellant. (SC) | | 20-42518
|
11/24/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC) | | |
11/25/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. (Dist. Ct. Order Appointing Counsel Thomas Qualls filed 11/25/20) (SC) | | 20-43035
|
11/25/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Fourth NOA) (SC) | | 20-43049
|
12/01/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC) | | |
12/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Setting Briefing Schedule. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Thomas L. Qualls as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 21 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC) | | 20-43649
|
12/17/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter Regarding Case. (SC) | | 20-45717
|
12/22/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 20-46206
|
12/22/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/10/17, 08/24/17, 09/06/17, 09/20/17, 10/23/17, 01/23/18, 01/29/18, 07/06/18, 09/11/18, 10/15/18, 11/28/18, 02/13/19, 05/01/19, 10/17/19, 10/22/19, 10/29/19, 12/17/19 01/08/20, 01/24/20, 01/27/20, 01/28/20, 01/29/20, 01/30/20, 01/31/20 and 10/29/20. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. (SC) | | 20-46215
|
03/11/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Case. (SC) | | 21-07156
|
03/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-08511
|
03/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: May 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08864
|
03/31/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Due to Employment with State of Nevada. (SC) | | 21-09381
|
04/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. Appellant's appointed counsel, Thomas L. Qualls, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion is granted. The clerk shall remove Mr. Qualls as counsel of record for appellant. This appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. Order appointing counsel due: 35 days. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 21-09890
|
04/09/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 9, 2021. This matter is referred to the Washoe County conflict counsel administrator Krista Meier, Esq. for the selection and appointment of counsel for Appellant. (SC) | | 21-10240
|
04/26/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter to the Supreme Court and Future Attorney - "URGENT." (SC) | | 21-11966
|
04/30/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on April 28, 2021 appointing Victoria T. Oldenburg as counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 21-12439
|
05/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk shall add Victoria T. Oldenburg as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. This court takes no action on the pro se letter filed by appellant on April 26, 2021. Appellant shall address all concerns to her counsel of record. (SC) | | 21-12644
|
05/08/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-13228
|
06/21/2021 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document: Appellant's letter regarding case. (SC) | | 21-17665
|
07/07/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter Regarding her Attorney. (SC) | | 21-19484
|
07/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-19892
|
07/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date September 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19935
|
07/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se motion requesting new counsel and a "Young hearing" regarding her appointed counsel. The pro se motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-20640
|
08/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC) | | 21-24717
|
08/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Counsel. (SC) | | 21-24813
|
09/03/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Counsel. (SC) | | 21-25701
|
09/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant shall have until October 18, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for a "Young hearing" if the deadline to file the opening brief has not been extended. As the motion for an extension of time has been granted, the pro se motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-25732
|
10/05/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter Regarding Counsel. (SC) | | 21-28477
|
10/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Third Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief). (SC) | | 21-28821
|
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Counsel. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 18, 2021. Appellant has also filed a pro se notice regarding her counsel. As this court has granted counsel a third extension of time to file the opening brief, no further action will be taken on appellant's notice. (SC) | | 21-29852
|
11/16/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter Regarding Appellant's Communication with Attorney Victoria Oldenburg. (SC) | | 21-32983
|
11/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-33313
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-33315
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-33316
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-33317
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-33318
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-33319
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 6. (SC) | | 21-33320
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 7. (SC) | | 21-33321
|
11/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 8. (SC) | | 21-33322
|
12/20/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-36143
|
12/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time. (Answering Brief) (SC) | | 21-36145
|
12/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 19, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-36427
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-01632
|
01/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until February 3, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 22-01912
|
02/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-03813
|
02/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion. Request for Young Hearing. (SC) | | 22-06050
|
03/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's pro se motion for a "Young Hearing" regarding her counsel is denied. All other relief requested in the motion is also denied. (SC) | | 22-06922
|
03/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-07126
|
03/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion. Request for Young Hearing. (SC) | | 22-08554
|
03/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for a "Young Hearing" against her counsel. The motion is denied. To the extent appellant seeks to dismiss her counsel, the motion is also denied because appellant does not demonstrate good cause. (SC) | | 22-09743
|
04/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion. Request for Young Hearing. (Inadvertently filed on 1/18/22 in docket no. 83810) (SC) | | 22-10949
|
04/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion. Request for Young Hearing. (SC) | | 22-10950
|
04/11/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Replacement of Counsel with Repeated Request for Young Hearing. (SC) | | 22-11385
|
04/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed a pro se notice requesting a "Young Hearing" and that this appeal be held in abeyance until that hearing has occurred. Appellant has also filed a pro se letter in which she asserts that several documents she mailed to this court have not been docketed. Appellant has filed a pro se motion to replace her counsel and/or for a "Young Hearing." Any other relief requested is also denied. (SC) | | 22-12314
|
05/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Objection to Denial; Request for Young Hearing Renewal; Allonges. (SC) | | 22-14820
|
06/01/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Objection to Denial; Request for Young Hearing Renewal; Allonges. - Courtesy Copy - (SC) | | 22-17295
|
06/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Court Orders, Re: Legal Mail. (SC) | | 22-17297
|
06/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Discharge Counsel and Order Transport. (SC) | | 22-17957
|
06/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se objection to this court's April 19, 2022, order denying several pro se requests relating to her appointed counsel and the processing of this appeal. The objection is construed as a motion for reconsideration. Having considered the motion, this court concludes that no relief is warranted. Accordingly, all requests for relief in the motion are denied. (SC) | | 22-18519
|
06/13/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Mailing. (Motion to Discharge Counsel and Order Transport.) (SC) | | 22-18799
|
06/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se motion asking that this court (1) label all mailings to her as "legal mail" and (2) direct the correctional center where she resides to allow her to use certified mail or other specialized mail services. The motion is granted to the following extent. The clerk of this court shall label all documents sent to appellant as "legal mail." All other relief requested in the motion is denied. Appellant has also filed a motion to discharge counsel and order transport. The motion is denied. However, the clerk of this court shall provide appellant with a copy of the docket sheet in this matter. (SC) | | 22-18967
|
06/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Notice of Appeal to the U.S. District Court. (SC) | | 22-20266
|
06/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Objection to Order Re: Removal of Counsel. (SC) | | 22-20267
|
06/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Notice of Appeal to the U.S. District Court. (SC) | | 22-20268
|
06/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Objection to Order Filed 6/15/22. (SC) | | 22-20269
|
07/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed pro se notices of appeal to the United States Supreme Court. Such notices of appeal are not appropriately filed in this court and this court takes no action on them. Appellant has also filed pro se objections to this court's June 10, 2022, and June 15, 2022, orders. The objections are treated as motions for reconsideration and denied. (SC) | | 22-21211
|
07/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Remand. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 7/19/22). (SC) | | |
07/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for a remand. Appellant is represented by counsel in this matter and is not permitted to file such a motion pro se. The clerk shall strike the motion filed on July 12, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22699
|
08/11/2022 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Letter. (SC) | | 22-25158
|
08/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 22-25259
|
08/16/2022 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Letter in regards to Proposals for the Order of Decision. (SC) | | 22-25648
|
08/16/2022 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Letter. (SC) | | 22-25650
|
08/25/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP22 - AS/EC/KP. (SC) | | 22-26610
|
09/08/2022 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter. (SC) | | 22-28112
|
09/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has submitted, in pro se, an emergency motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing, as well as an emergency motion imploring annulment. Appellant may not file a motion for an extension of time or a motion for annulment in pro se in this appeal. The clerk shall return the motions unfiled. Appellant's counsel may file a petition for rehearing within 14 days from the date of this order, if deemed warranted. (SC) | | 22-29408
|
10/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Emergency Motion for Extension of Time. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/5/22). (SC) | | |
10/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant is represented by counsel in this matter and may not file a pro se motion for an extension of time. NRAP 46A(b)(1). The clerk shall strike the pro se motion for an extension of time filed on October 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31428
|
10/10/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-31789
|
10/10/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31789
|