Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/09/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellants Vannah) (SC) | | |
11/09/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellants Vannah) (SC) | | 20-40855
|
11/09/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellants Vannah) (SC) | | 20-40857
|
11/09/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellants Edgeworth) (SC) | | |
11/09/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellants Edgeworth) (SC) | | 20-40901
|
11/09/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellants Edgeworth) (SC) | | 20-40903
|
11/16/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Patricia A. Marr. Check no. 2232. (Appellants Vannah) (SC) | | |
11/18/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Messner Reeves. Check no. 58527. (Appellants Edgeworth) (SC) | | |
11/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-42120
|
11/20/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC) | | 20-42472
|
12/04/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement.(Vannah and Greene). (SC) | | 20-44016
|
12/09/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-44859
|
12/15/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued pending the outcome of 3 pending appeals. The Settlement Judge will follow up. (SC) | | 20-45472
|
02/11/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-04155
|
02/16/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-04473
|
02/27/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Filing Request for Transcripts. REJECTED PER NOTICE). (SC) | | |
03/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-05891
|
03/02/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/20. To Court Reporter: Nancy Maldonado. (SC) | | 21-06058
|
03/02/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/13/20 and 10/1/20. To Court Reporter: Susie Schofield. (SC) | | 21-06094
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/20. To Court Reporter: Nany Maldonado. (SC) | | 21-06852
|
04/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Appearance for Steve Morris and Rosa Solis-Rainey. (SC) | | 21-12509
|
05/12/2021 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms. (SC) | | |
05/12/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-13662
|
05/17/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. appellants John Buchcanan Greene; Robert D. Vannah, Chtd., d/b/a Vannah & Vannah; and Robert Darby Vannah's opening brief and appendix due: June 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-14149
|
05/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulated Request to Extend Briefing Schedule. (First Request)(SC) | | 21-14338
|
05/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Stipulation. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-15429
|
05/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Edgeworth Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-15446
|
06/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' (John Buchcanan Greene, Robert D. Vannah, Chtd., and Robert Darby Vannah) Motion to Extend Time To File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-15739
|
06/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve their opening briefs and appendices. (SC) | | 21-15984
|
06/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' (John Buchcanan Greene, Robert D. Vannah, Chtd., and Robert Darby Vannah) Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-16559
|
06/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appellants' Appendix. Vols. 1-5. (SC) | | 21-16698
|
06/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appellants' Appendix. Vols. 6-11. (SC) | | 21-16700
|
06/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appellants' Appendix. Vols. 12-18. (SC) | | 21-16702
|
06/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appellants' Appendix. Vols. 19-21. (SC) | | 21-16703
|
06/11/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Edgeworth Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-16924
|
06/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Edgeworth Errata to the Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-17600
|
06/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-17971
|
06/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answering brief due: September 9, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18346
|
09/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief to Edgeworth Parties'. (SC) | | 21-26195
|
09/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-26196
|
09/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-26197
|
09/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-26198
|
09/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-26199
|
09/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-26200
|
09/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-26201
|
09/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief to Vannah Parties'. (SC) | | 21-26202
|
09/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Edgeworth Appellants' Motion to Extend Deadline for Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-27080
|
09/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Edgeworth Appellants' Motion to Extend Deadline for Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-27312
|
09/24/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants John Buchcanan Greene, Robert D. Vannah, Chtd., and Robert Darby Vannah's reply brief due: October 25, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27668
|
09/27/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants American Grating, LLC, Brian Edgeworth, Angela Edgeworth, and Edgeworth Family Trust's reply brief due: October 25, 2021. fn1 [These appellants have withdrawn their prior motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief. Accordingly, no action will be taken on their September 18, 2021, motion for an extension of time.]. (SC) | | 21-27733
|
10/25/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (Vannah and Greene)(SC) | | 21-30713
|
10/25/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' (Edgeworth) Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-30756
|
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. I (Justice Douglas Herndon) make this disclosure so that any person who wishes to request my disqualification may do so by filing a motion pursuant to NRAP 35. Any such motion shall be filed no later than February 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-03341
|
02/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 22-05445
|
03/28/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authority Under NRAP 31(e). (SC) | | 22-09492
|
03/31/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. (SC) | | 22-10045
|
04/25/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-12982
|
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 26, 2022. (SC) | | 22-12982
|