Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/17/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant, Father) (SC) | | |
11/17/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellant Father) (SC) | | 20-41911
|
11/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (Appellant Father) (SC) | | 20-41916
|
11/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Father) (SC) | | 20-41918
|
11/17/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant, Adoptive Mother) (SC) | | |
11/17/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellant, Adoptive Mother) (SC) | | 20-41930
|
11/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (Appellant, Adoptive Mother) (SC) | | 20-41932
|
11/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Adoptive, Mother) (SC) | | 20-41936
|
11/17/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC) | | |
11/20/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC) | | |
11/23/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Alverson Taylor & Sanders. E-Payment conf. no. 20112314985422. (Appellant Father) (SC) | | |
11/23/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Alverson Taylor & Sanders. E-Payment conf. no. 20112314984974. (Appellant Adoptive Mother) (SC) | | |
11/23/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-42718
|
12/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Appellants to File Case Appeal Statements. Each appellant shall, within 7 days from the date of this order, file the case appeal statement with the Supreme Court Clerk's Office. (SC) | | 20-43617
|
12/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions and Directing Counsel to File the Case Appeal Statements. Conditional sanction of $250 or Case Appeal Statements due: 14 days. (SC) | | 20-46666
|
12/29/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement for appellant Justin Blount. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-46798
|
12/29/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement for appellant Stephanie Blount. Due date: 10 days.(SC) | | 20-46803
|
01/04/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement (Justin Blount and Stephanie Blount). (SC) | | 21-00100
|
01/07/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-00416
|
01/21/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/20/20 and 01/12/21. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 21-01742
|
02/25/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Joint Docket Statement Civil Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 02/25/21). (SC) | | |
02/25/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellants' Joint Docket Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-05656
|
02/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-05840
|
03/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the docketing statement from the motion and shall file it separately. (SC) | | 21-06019
|
03/02/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Joint Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-06020
|
03/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Non-Payment for Transcripts (Rachel Chaisson, Supervisor Transcript Video Service). (SC) | | 21-07630
|
03/23/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: October 20, 2020. (SC) | | 21-08296
|
03/23/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: March 5, 2020. (SC) | | 21-08297
|
04/20/2021 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
05/07/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 05/10/21). (SC) | | |
05/10/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 21-13235
|
05/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix of Exhibits for Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-13809
|
06/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. To date appellants have not filed the corrected brief or otherwise communicated with this court. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the corrected opening brief. (SC) | | 21-16521
|
06/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-16591
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. To date, respondent has failed to file the answering brief. Respondent shall, within 14 days from the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Appellants may file a reply brief, if deemed necessary, within 30 days from service of the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-24312
|
09/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 21-25772
|
09/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: September 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25927
|
09/07/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-25904
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-25907
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-25908
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-25909
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-25911
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-25912
|
09/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. (SC) | | 21-26159
|
09/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, the motion of Kurt R. Bonds of Alverson Taylor & Sanders to withdraw as counsel for appellants is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Bonds, Alexandre M. Fayad, Trevor R. Waite, and the law firm of Alverson Taylor & Sanders as counsel of record for appellants. Appellant's notice of appearance due: 30 days. Briefing suspended. (SC) | | 21-27247
|
10/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Appearance that they will Proceed as Pro Se. (SC) | | 21-30548
|
11/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants have filed a notice informing this court that they intend to proceed in this appeal pro se. Accordingly, the briefing schedule is reinstated as follows. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-33415
|
12/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-36369
|
12/21/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 22-10049
|
07/07/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | 22-21343
|
08/01/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. {SC} | | 22-23992
|
08/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed {SC} | | |
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 2, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23992
|