Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/03/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/03/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-43889
|
12/03/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-43891
|
12/03/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-43893
|
12/15/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Maier Gutierrez & Associates. Check no. 24617. (SC) | | |
12/15/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-45434
|
12/16/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 20-45622
|
12/18/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-45858
|
12/28/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | |
12/29/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document - Response to Docketing Statement. (NOTICE INADVERTENTLY ISSUED - RESPONSE TIMELY FILED.) (SC) | | |
12/29/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-46794
|
12/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Appellants to File Case Appeal Statement. Appellants' case appeal statement due: 7 days. (SC) | | 20-46962
|
12/31/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-47002
|
01/11/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-00860
|
01/12/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-00949
|
01/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause and Regarding Caption. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellants' response. The deadlines to file the transcript request form and opening brief and appendix are suspended pending further order of this court. Review of the case appeal statement and docketing statement indicates that the only respondents to this appeal are Copperpoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company and Copperpoint General Insurance Company. It appears that the caption of this appeal should be modified by removing the remaining respondents. If any party objects to such modification, they shall so inform this court, in writing, within 14 days of the date of this order. If no objection is timely filed in this court, this appeal shall proceed with Copperpoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company and Copperpoint General Insurance Company as the only respondents. (SC) | | 21-01785
|
01/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Sami Randolph. (Copperpoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company and Copperpoint General Insurance Company) (SC) | | 21-02318
|
01/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion regarding Respondents Law Offices Of Marshall Silberberg, P.C. And Kenneth Marshall Silberberg Aka Marshall Silberberg's Motion For Leave To Join In Appeal. (SC) | | 21-02910
|
02/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-04804
|
03/18/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Copperpoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company and Copperpoint General Insurance Company's Notice of Non-Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Leave to Join Appeal. (SC) | | 21-07791
|
03/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing, Denying Motion to Join Appeal, and Regarding Caption. Respondents Law Offices of Marshall Silberberg, P.C., and Kenneth Marshall Silberberg (Silberberg) have now filed a motion to join in the appeal. The motion to join appeal is denied. However, because it appears that Silberberg has an interest in this appeal, they shall remain as respondents. Respondents Thomas S. Alch and Shoop, A Professional Law Corporation, have not filed an objection to being removed as respondents. Accordingly, the clerk shall remove them as respondents to this appeal. Appellants: Transcript Request Form due: 7 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 21-08037
|
03/24/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/8/20. To Court Reporter: V. Medina. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/24/21)(SC) | | |
03/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-08453
|
03/24/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/8/20. To Court Reporter: V. Medina. (SC) | | 21-08476
|
06/18/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-17564
|
06/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/21/21) (SC) | | |
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/21/21) (SC) | | |
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/21/21) (SC) | | |
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/21/21) (SC) | | |
06/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-17713
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/21/21) (SC) | | |
06/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-17721
|
06/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-17791
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-17792
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-17793
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 3 (SC) | | 21-17796
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 4 (SC) | | 21-17797
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-17798
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 6 (SC) | | 21-17802
|
06/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 7 (SC) | | 21-17801
|
07/19/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Copperpoint General Insurance Company and Copperpoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company's answering brief due: August 4, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20740
|
08/04/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents CopperPoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company and CopperPoint General Insurance Company's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 08/04/21). (SC) | | |
08/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 21-22689
|
08/04/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-22700
|
08/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 21-22701
|
08/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents Law Offices of Marshall Silberberg, P.C. and Kenneth Marshall Silberberg have not filed their answering brief or otherwise communicated with this court. Respondents' answering brief due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-23455
|
08/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief [First Request]. (SC) | | 21-24109
|
08/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Motion for Extension to File Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-24803
|
08/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (Law Offices Of Marshall Silberberg, P.C. And Kenneth Marshall Silberberg Aka Marshall Silberberg's) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-24865
|
08/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-25053
|
08/31/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants have filed a motion for an extension of time, until October 4, 2021, to file their reply brief. The motion mistakenly assumes the reply brief is due to be filed by September 3, 2021. However, the last filed-answering brief was not filed and served until August 26, 2021. Thus, the reply brief is due to be filed by September 27, 2021. Under these circumstances, the motion is denied without prejudice. (SC) | | 21-25367
|
09/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-27777
|
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Reply Brief. Vol. 1 (SC) | | 21-27778
|
09/28/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented in this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for February 17, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-00400
|
01/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion (Copperpoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company and Copperpoint General Insurance Company's) to Take Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 22-02532
|
02/01/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-03291
|
02/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Respondents' Motion for Judicial Notice and Separate Motion for Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 22-03425
|
02/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply to Appellants' Response to Motion to Take Judicial Notice, and Response to Appellants' Motion to Take Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 22-04333
|
02/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply to Appellants' Response to Motion to Take Judicial Notice, and Response to Appellants' Motion to Take Judicial Notice w/attachment. (SC) | | 22-04342
|
02/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. (SC) | | |
03/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Respondents CopperPoint Mutual Insurance Holding Company and CopperPoint General Insurance Company have filed a motion for judicial notice. Appellants have filed a separate motion for judicial notice. Having considered the motions, responses, and reply, this court concludes that judicial notice is not warranted and denies the motions. (SC) | | 22-07781
|
05/05/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | 22-14323
|
06/01/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-17307
|
06/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 2, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17307
|