Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/07/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
12/07/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-44241
|
12/07/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 20-44243
|
12/07/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle. (SC) | | 20-44390
|
12/10/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Grandbridge) (SC) | | |
12/10/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellant Grandbridge) (SC) | | 20-44893
|
12/10/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Grandbridge) (SC) | | 20-44895
|
12/11/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer. Check no. 17468. (Appellant Fed. Nat'l) (SC) | | |
12/21/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Holland & Hart. Check no. 66008947. (Appellant Grandbridge) (SC) | | |
12/29/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association's Docketing Statement due: January 11, 2021. (SC) | | 20-46731
|
01/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appellant Grandbridge Real Estate Capital, LLC's Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.(SC) | | 21-00004
|
01/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Assoc.) Motion to Enlarge the Page Limit of Stay Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 21-00695
|
01/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Assoc.) Expedited Motion for Stay. (SC) | | 21-00700
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 1)(SC) | | 21-00702
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 2)(SC) | | 21-00703
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 3)(SC) | | 21-00704
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 4)(SC) | | 21-00705
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 5)(SC) | | 21-00706
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 6)(SC) | | 21-00707
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 7)(SC) | | 21-00708
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 8)(SC) | | 21-00709
|
01/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Volume 9)(SC) | | 21-00710
|
01/11/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Assoc.) Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-00814
|
01/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Stay Motion with Excess Pages. Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association's motion for leave to file a motion for stay in excess of the NRAP 27(d)(2) 10-page limit is granted. The 25-page stay motion was filed on January 8, 2021. Respondents' response, if any, likewise may contain up to 25 pages. Any reply should accord with NRAP 27(d)(2)'s page limits. (SC) | | 21-00979
|
01/13/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01174
|
01/14/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John W. Hofsaess. (SC) | | 21-01207
|
01/14/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' response to appellants' expedited motion for stay due: January 29, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01266
|
01/14/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant Grandbridge Real Estate Capital, LLC's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-01309
|
01/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On January 14, 2021, John W. Hofsaess filed a notice of appearance on behalf of respondents. Mr. Hofsaess shall have 5 days from the date of this order to provide this court with a copy of the district court order that grants his SCR 42 application. (SC) | | 21-01335
|
01/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice Submission of Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel John W. Hofsaess, Esq. (SC) | | 21-01411
|
01/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Amended Submission of Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel John W. Hofsaess, Esq. (SC) | | 21-01412
|
01/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Joinder to Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 21-02467
|
01/29/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Appearance for J. Colby Williams and Philip R. Erwin. (SC) | | 21-02863
|
01/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Expedited Motion to Stay. (SC) | | 21-02865
|
01/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Opposition to Expedited Motion to Stay. Vol. 1 (SC) | | 21-02867
|
01/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Opposition to Expedited Motion to Stay. Vol. 2 (SC) | | 21-02868
|
01/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Opposition to Expedited Motion to Stay. Vol. 3 (SC) | | 21-02869
|
01/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Opposition to Expedited Motion to Stay. Vol. 4 (SC) | | 21-02872
|
01/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Opposition to Expedited Motion to Stay. Vol. 5 (SC) | | 21-02875
|
01/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On January 14, 2021, John W. Hofsaess, Esq. filed a notice of appearance on behalf of respondents. On January 15, 2021, he provided this court with a copy of the district court order granting his SCR 42 application in the matter below. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Hofsaess as counsel for respondents. (SC) | | 21-02878
|
02/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Stay Pending Appeal (Relief Requested by February 11, 2021). (SC) | | 21-03657
|
02/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Stay in Part and Denying Stay in Part. We conclude that only a partial stay of the district court's injunction pending appeal is warranted. In particular, we stay paragraphs (2) and (3) of the district court's injunction directing that Fannie Mae remove the notices of default and election to sell from the properties' titles, such that the notices remain of record pending resolution of this appeal and further order of this court. The remainder of the requested relief is denied subject to a decision on the merits of this appeal. (SC) | | 21-04099
|
02/11/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-04139
|
02/24/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-05418
|
02/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Reconsider. (SC) | | 21-05841
|
03/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Reconsider. (SC) | | 21-06569
|
03/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association's reply in support of appellant's motion to reconsider due: March 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-06730
|
03/08/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request for Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association. (SC) | | 21-06733
|
03/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion to Intervene. (SC) | | 21-08607
|
03/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. (Campbell & Williams) (SC) | | 21-08643
|
03/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' (Federal National Mortgage Assoc.) Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-08808
|
03/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Due: April 2, 2021. (SC) | | 21-09255
|
03/31/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Westland Liberty Village, LLC and Westland Village Square, LLC's opposition due: April 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-09282
|
04/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply In Support of Motion for Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-09680
|
04/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Appellant's reply due: April 9, 2021. (SC) | | 21-09867
|
04/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel (Michael A.F. Johnson). (SC) | | 21-09906
|
04/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Reply in Support of Motion to Reconsider. (SC) | | 21-10297
|
04/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion to Intervene. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 4/19/21)(SC) | | |
04/19/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-11198
|
04/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion to Intervene. (SC) | | 21-11231
|
04/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Proposed Intervener FHFA's Response to Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to FHFA's Motion to Intervene. (SC) | | 21-11839
|
04/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Federal Housing Finance Agency's Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene. (SC) | | 21-11841
|
04/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents' motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to Federal Housing Finance Agency's motion to Intervene is granted. Respondents shall have 3 days from the date of this order to refile and serve their opposition. (SC) | | 21-12084
|
04/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion to Intervene. (SC) | | 21-12110
|
04/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Ruling Granting Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion to Intervene in District Court Proceedings. (SC) | | 21-12403
|
05/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Grandbridge Real Estate Capital, LLC's opening brief and appendix due: June 8, 2021. (SC) | | 21-14629
|
05/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Federal Mortgage Association's opening brief and appendix due: June 8, 2021. (SC) | | 21-14706
|
05/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions to Reconsider and Intervene. In January 2021, Fannie Mae moved for a stay pending appeal. On February 11, 2021, we granted the stay motion in part. Fannie Mae moves for reconsideration of our stay order. We deny the motion for reconsideration. The Federal Housing Finance Agency has moved to intervene in this appeal. The motion to intervene is denied. fn1[In light of this order, the FHFA's motion to associate attorney Michael A.F. Johnson of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP, pursuant to SCR 42, is denied as moot.] (SC) | | 21-14910
|
06/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Joinder to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request by Motion). (SC) | | 21-16139
|
06/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request by Motion). (SC) | | 21-16150
|
06/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion is granted. Appellant Grandbridge Real Estate Capital, LLC, has filed a joinder to Fannie Mae's motion, and likewise moves for a 14-day extension of time to file its opening brief. Grandbridge's motion is granted. Appellants shall have until June 22, 2021, to file and serve the opening briefs and appendices. (SC) | | 21-16353
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 1 (SC) | | 21-17983
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 2 (SC) | | 21-17986
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 3 (SC) | | 21-17989
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 4 (SC) | | 21-17991
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 5 (SC) | | 21-17992
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 6 (SC) | | 21-17993
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 7 (SC) | | 21-17994
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 8 (SC) | | 21-17995
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 9 (SC) | | 21-17997
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 11 (SC) | | 21-18000
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Appendix Vol. 10 (SC) | | 21-18001
|
06/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's (Grandbridge Real Estate Capital, LLC) Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-18021
|
06/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-18027
|
06/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appendix to Opening Brief. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-18046
|
06/29/2021 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Appellant and Reversal of District Court's Preliminary Injunction Order. (SC) | | 21-18737
|
06/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Appellant's Appendix. (The appendix filed on 6/22/21 serves as a joint appendix for each appellant.) (SC) | | 21-18815
|
07/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Briefs.(SC) | | 21-19419
|
07/07/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date August 30, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19449
|
08/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of District Court Decision. (SC) | | 21-23385
|
08/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Amicus curiae the Federal Housing Finance Agency has filed a notice that the district court denied its motion to dissolve the preliminary injunction and asks this court to resolves this appeal expeditiously. This court will resolve this appeal as expeditiously as the court's calendar permits. (SC) | | 21-23892
|
08/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-25243
|
08/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief to Amicus Brief. (REJECTED PER 8/31/21 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix In Support Of Answering Brief (Vol. 1) (SC) | | 21-25251
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix In Support Of Answering Brief (Vol. 2) (SC) | | 21-25252
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix In Support Of Answering Brief (Vol. 3) (SC) | | 21-25255
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix In Support Of Answering Brief (Vol. 4) (SC) | | 21-25259
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix In Support Of Answering Brief (Vol. 6) (SC) | | 21-25262
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix In Support Of Answering Brief (Vol. 5) (SC) | | 21-25263
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix In Support Of Answering Brief (Vol. 7) (SC) | | 21-25265
|
08/31/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Answering Brief to Amicus Brief). (SC) | | 21-25304
|
08/31/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief to Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 21-25317
|
09/27/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association's reply brief due: October 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27791
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Grandbridge Real Estate Capital, LLC's reply brief due: October 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27824
|
10/12/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae's Notice of Appearance for John D. Tennert. (SC) | | 21-29341
|
10/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Federal National Mortgage Assoc.) (SC) | | 21-29421
|
10/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's (Grandbridge Real Estate Capital, LLC) Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-29481
|
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Federal National Mortgage Association shall have until October 20, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-29922
|
10/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Motion for Excess Pages, Motion to Enlarge the Length of Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-30275
|
10/20/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's (Federal National Mortgage Association) Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-30276
|
10/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant Federal National Mortgage Association's motion for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The reply brief was filed on October 20, 2021. (SC) | | 21-31095
|
10/28/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). (SC) | | 22-17435
|
06/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Amicus FHFA's Response to Westland's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 22-19617
|
08/11/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stigich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 57. En Banc. (SC). | | 22-25128
|
08/29/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 8/30/22) (SC) | | |
08/30/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-27147
|
08/30/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-27247
|
08/30/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Maria Scandalios. E-Payment Ref. no. 22083033130954. (SC) | | |
08/30/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-27274
|
09/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents have filed an untimely motion requesting an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. Cause appearing and despite its untimeliness, the motion is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1(A); NRAP 40(a)(1). The petition for rehearing was filed on August 30, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28038
|
09/16/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-29049
|
10/11/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-31968
|
10/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 12, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31968
|