Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/14/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-45168
|
12/14/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 20-45172
|
12/14/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-45174
|
12/14/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-45176
|
12/16/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-45560
|
12/21/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Frizell Law Firm. Check no. 2073. (SC) | | |
12/21/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-46063
|
12/22/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 20-46156
|
12/24/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/24/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 20-46482
|
12/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 20-46484
|
12/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 20-46486
|
01/04/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-00118
|
01/05/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Proof of Service for Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-00190
|
01/07/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Blackrock Legal. Check no. 1342. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | |
01/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. Docketing statement due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-00580
|
01/10/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-00713
|
01/25/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until February 5, 2021, to file and serve the transcript request form. (SC) | | 21-02138
|
01/29/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-02940
|
02/05/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/28/20, 11/18/20, and 12/9/20. To Court Reporter: Angie Calvillo. (SC) | | 21-03552
|
04/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines. (SC) | | 21-10829
|
05/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation in Part. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until May 21, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and appendix. (SC) | | 21-12844
|
05/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-14620
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-15163
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-15164
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-15165
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-15166
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-15167
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-15168
|
05/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-15169
|
05/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-15181
|
06/01/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants/cross-respondents' motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief on appeal and appendix is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on May 26 and 27, 2021. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until June 28, 2021, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-15514
|
06/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Respondents' to File Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-18405
|
06/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until July 28, 2021, to file and serve their combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-18648
|
06/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/30/21) (SC) | | |
06/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-18850
|
07/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-19353
|
07/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Proof of Service. (SC) | | 21-19397
|
07/13/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until July 27, 2021, to file and serve a response to the motion to dismiss appeal filed on July 6, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20074
|
07/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File an Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-21781
|
07/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-21831
|
07/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief. Vol.1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUSED ON 7/28/21) (SC) | | |
07/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-21850
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief. Vol.1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUSED ON 7/28/21) (SC) | | |
08/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-22428
|
08/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 1/28/22). (SC) | | |
08/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 1/28/22). (SC) | | |
08/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 3. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 1/28/22). (SC) | | |
08/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Response in Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Second Appeal. (SC) | | 21-22589
|
08/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on July 27, 2021, is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The opposition to the motion to dismiss was filed on August 3, 2021. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 21-23004
|
08/16/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until August 30, 2021, to file and serve their reply in support of the motion to dismiss. (SC) | | 21-23876
|
08/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Appeal. (SC) | | 21-25205
|
08/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-25220
|
08/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service for Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Appeal. (SC) | | 21-25244
|
01/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. The briefing schedule in this appeal and cross-appeal is reinstated as follows. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 28.1(f)(3)(D). (SC) | | 22-01926
|
01/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation To Strike Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix and To Amend Answering and Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-02482
|
01/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall strike the appendix filed on August 3, 2021. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended combined brief that is substantively identical to the brief filed on July 28, 2021, and amends only the citations to the appendix. Appellants/cross-respondents' combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal remains due to be filed by February 18, 2022. (SC) | | 22-02917
|
02/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Amended Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-03779
|
02/16/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: March 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-05144
|
03/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Second Request) (SC) | | 22-06697
|
03/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until April 4, 2022, to file and serve the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 22-07401
|
04/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Third Request) (SC) | | 22-10260
|
04/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-11460
|
04/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on April 12, 2022, is granted. The combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal was filed on April 12, 2022. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until April 26, 2022, to file and serve any reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 22-11614
|
04/19/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: May 10, 2022. (SC) | | 22-12264
|
05/09/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-14756
|
05/09/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Court to Consider Items Outside of the Record. (SC) | | 22-26918
|
09/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Response to Appellants' Motion for Court to Consider Items Outside of the Record. (SC) | | 22-27899
|
09/15/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[Chan's August 27, 2022, motion is granted.] fn8[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter.] RP/EC/MG (SC) | | 22-28942
|
09/30/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Petition for Rehearing due: October 17, 2022. (SC) | | 22-30836
|
10/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-32676
|
10/17/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert Duane Frizell. (SC) | | |
11/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-34519
|
11/28/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-36932
|
11/28/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 29, 2022. (SC) | | 22-36932
|