Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/14/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-45226
|
12/14/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-45228
|
12/21/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nicholas Shook. Check no. 110. (SC) | | |
12/21/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-46067
|
12/28/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-46560
|
12/28/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC) | | 20-46695
|
01/13/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-01113
|
01/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-01152
|
01/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days.(SC) | | 21-01162
|
01/14/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Concluding Settlement Proceedings. Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement program. Accordingly, the settlement proceedings are concluding. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 21-01226
|
01/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service for Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-01451
|
01/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/22/21) (SC) | | |
01/22/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-01951
|
01/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice to this Court that Appellants' Response to Motion to Dismiss was timely. (SC) | | 21-02115
|
01/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Amended Notice of Timely Filing. (SC) | | 21-02117
|
01/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-02120
|
01/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion and Reinstating Briefing. The appeal may proceed, and the motion to dismiss is denied. Appellant's transcript request form due: 14 days. Opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. fn1 [Appellant's "Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Motion to Dismiss" is denied as moot.] (SC) | | 21-02303
|
02/02/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-03244
|
04/26/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: May 10, 2021. (SC) | | 21-11910
|
05/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 5/11/21). (SC) | | |
05/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-13418
|
05/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 of 3. (SC) | | 21-14139
|
05/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 of 3. (SC) | | 21-14140
|
05/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3 of 3. (SC) | | 21-14141
|
05/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-14223
|
06/10/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: June 30, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16638
|
06/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Medical Revenue Solutions' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-18603
|
06/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order to Extend The Time For Respondent to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-18763
|
06/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition to Medical Revenue Solutions' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-18817
|
07/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion and Disapproving Stipulation. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-19246
|
07/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/14/21) (SC) | | |
07/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-20257
|
07/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-20303
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-20305
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-20306
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-20307
|
08/12/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Reply Brief due: August 27, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23458
|
08/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Substitution of Attorneys from Amanda J. Brookhyser to Anthony B. Golden. (SC) | | 21-24033
|
08/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-24401
|
08/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Reply Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-24402
|
08/23/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental brief. Respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellant's supplemental brief to file and serve a supplemental response. The supplemental briefs shall comply with the page or type-volume limitations that apply to reply briefs under NRAP 32(a)(7)(A) (15 pages, 7000 words, or 650 lines of text). (SC) | | 22-07824
|
03/21/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Supplemental Brief due: April 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08821
|
04/08/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-11108
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-11109
|
04/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Medical Revenue Solutions, LLC's) Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-12994
|
04/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-13013
|
04/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-13418
|
05/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Despite its untimeliness and having considered appellant's opposition and respondent's reply, respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the supplemental brief is granted. Respondent's supplemental brief due: May 6, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14134
|
05/06/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-14601
|
08/03/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn5[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/JH/MG (SC) | | 22-24303
|
08/17/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Medical Revenue Solutions' Bill of Costs. (SC) | | 22-25733
|
08/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Objection to Bill of Costs. (SC) | | 22-25742
|
09/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Bill of Costs. The clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-27838
|
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-27839
|
09/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 7, 2022. (SC) | | 22-27839
|