Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0571
Short Caption:IN RE: MATTER OF STANDARDIZED FORMS RELATED TO THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN FROM ABUSE AND NEGLECTCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:12/21/2020Public Hearing:
Closed Date:04/28/2021

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Petition.20-45936
01/26/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing.21-02345
02/22/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Janice Wolf and Xavier Planta of the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.21-05164
02/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments. from Deonne Contine.21-05292
03/01/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order. On January 26, 2021, this court scheduled a public hearing on the petition filed in ADKT 0571 (In the Matter of Standardized Forms Related to the Protection of Children from Abuse and Neglect) for March 2, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. This matter will be removed from the public hearing agenda for March 2, 2021. (SC)21-06005
03/02/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Rescheduling Public Hearing.21-06083
03/30/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Court Improvement Program Template Subcommittee.21-09252
03/30/2021Administrative CaseFiled Court Improvement Program Template Subcommittee's joinder to the Comment Filed February 22, 2021, by the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.21-09253
04/01/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jane Jensen Saint.21-09405
04/08/2021Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
04/28/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Standardized Forms Related to the Protection of Children from Abuse and Neglect.21-12142
04/28/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order. The CIP having completed its work, we herby order ADKT 0571 closed.21-12153
04/28/2021Administrative CaseCase Closed.
12/20/2021Administrative CaseFiled Request from the Hon. Rebecca L. Burton. (Emailed Copy)21-36191
12/29/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order. On April 28, 2021, this court entered an order adopting standardized forms related to the protection of children from abuse and neglect. The order directed the use of the standardized forms to become mandatory in all child abuse and neglect cases in the Nevada on January 1, 2022. On December 10, 2021, the Clark County District Attorney's Office submitted a letter to the court requesting that the effective date for the mandatory use of the standardized forms be extended to January 1, 2023. The request for an extension of time is granted. Accordingly, the use of the standardized forms will become mandatory in all child abuse and neglect cases in Nevada on January 1, 2023.21-36910
01/03/2022Administrative CaseFiled Request from the Hon. Rebecca L. Burton. (Original)22-00085
12/29/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Granting Request for an Extension of Time.22-40830