Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
01/15/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-01447
|
01/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-01450
|
01/29/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-02840
|
02/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Kirsty E. Pickering as counsel for appellant). (SC) | | 21-03246
|
02/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall add attorney Kirsty E. Pickering as counsel of record for appellant on this court's docket. The clerk of this court is directed to remove attorney Gary Woodbury as counsel of record for appellant. Ms. Pickering shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement and either a supplemental transcript request form, or a certificate that no further transcripts will be requested. NRAP 9. The opening brief and appendix remain due to be filed on or before May 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-03412
|
02/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time (Lisa M. Manley, Court Reporter). (SC) | | 21-03874
|
02/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time (Tonja Lemich, Court Reporter). (SC) | | 21-03890
|
02/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Court reporters Lisa Manley and Tonja Lemich have filed motions for an extension of time to prepare the transcripts requested in this appeal. Ms. Manley and Ms. Lemich shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts in the district court and deliver copies to the requesting party. Within the same time period, Ms. Manley and Ms. Lemich shall file notices with this court that the completed transcripts have been filed and delivered. (SC) | | 21-03972
|
02/18/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Additional Transcript Request Pursuant to NRAP 9. (SC) | | 21-04791
|
02/18/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 21-04837
|
03/23/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa M. Manley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: October 6, 2020. (SC) | | 21-08320
|
04/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-12061
|
04/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Non-Opposition to Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-12262
|
04/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Non-Opposition to Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-12267
|
04/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 16, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-12396
|
04/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time (Tonja Lemich, Court Reporter). (SC) | | 21-12489
|
05/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court reporter Tonja Lemich's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-12637
|
06/01/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Tonja D. Lemich stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/7/20, 10/8/20, 10/9/20, 10/13/20, 10/14/20, 10/15/20, 10/16/20, 10/20/20, and 10/21/20. (SC) | | 21-15554
|
07/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-19958
|
07/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Non-Opposition to Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-20145
|
07/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant has filed a motion for a second extension of time (90 days) to file the opening brief and appendix. The motion is granted, in part, as follows. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: August 30, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20660
|
08/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-25232
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Master Index to Appendix. (SC) | | 21-25233
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part I. (SC) | | 21-25235
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part II. (SC) | | 21-25236
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part III. (SC) | | 21-25237
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part IV. (SC) | | 21-25238
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part V. (SC) | | 21-25239
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part VI. (SC) | | 21-25240
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part VII. (SC) | | 21-25242
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part VIII. (SC) | | 21-25245
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part IX. (SC) | | 21-25247
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part X. (SC) | | 21-25249
|
08/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Part XI. (SC) | | 21-25250
|
09/24/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: October 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27666
|
10/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/13/21) (SC) | | |
10/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance for Mercedes M. Martinez. (SC) | | 21-29385
|
10/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Mercedes M. Martinez. (SC) | | 21-29440
|
10/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-29441
|
11/10/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: November 29, 2021. (SC) | | 21-32291
|
11/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-33937
|
12/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting a second extension of time (60 days) to file the reply brief. The motion is denied. Appellant's reply brief due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-34591
|
12/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/9/21) (SC) | | |
12/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-35083
|
12/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-35104
|
12/09/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/10/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-00806
|
01/10/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/20/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | |
05/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
05/16/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-15420
|
05/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 19, 2022. (SC) | | 22-15420
|