Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/01/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
02/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-02966
|
02/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 21-05545
|
03/01/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On February 25, 2021, appellant filed with this court a copy of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis that was filed in the district court on February 17, 2021. District court order due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-05987
|
03/05/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from T. Matthew Phillips. Money Order no. 27025237293. (SC) | | |
03/08/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Documents from District Court Clerk regarding Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
03/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC) | | 21-06708
|
03/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-07169
|
03/29/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's docketing statement due: April 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08837
|
04/13/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (SEALED) Vols. 1-14. (SC) | | |
04/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-10686
|
04/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-10805
|
04/19/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's fast track statement due: April 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-11264
|
04/23/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-11784
|
04/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for an Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-11933
|
04/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Consolidate for a Single Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 21-12111
|
04/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 10, 2021, to file and serve the fast track statement. (SC) | | 21-12127
|
05/12/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-13657
|
05/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Fast Track Statement. (First Request)(SC) | | 21-15009
|
05/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent has filed a motion to consolidate the appeals. This court denies the motion to consolidate without prejudice. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the fast track response in Docket No. 82414 is granted. Respondent shall have until July 12, 2021, to file and serve the fast track response. Nos. 82414/82693/82724. (SC) | | 21-15430
|
06/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to File Amended Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-17032
|
06/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's amended fast track statement due: June 30, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18326
|
06/30/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's amended fast track statement due: July 7, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18756
|
07/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to File Amended Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-20000
|
07/12/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Proper Person Amended Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-20001
|
07/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Second Motion to File Amended Fast Track Statement and Counter-Motions for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-20015
|
07/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Opposition and Counter-Motion for Extension to File Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-20017
|
07/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's opposed motion for a second extension of time to file an amended fast track statement is granted. NRAP 3E(f). The amended fast track statement was filed on July 12, 2021. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the fast track response is granted. Fast track response due: August 31, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20600
|
08/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Expanded Child Custody Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-23879
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion for leave to file an expanded fast track response is granted. Respondent may file a fast track response of no more than 25 pages. The fast track response remains due to be filed on or before August 31, 2021. (SC) | | 21-24351
|
08/31/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/1/21) (SC) | | |
08/31/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-25454
|
09/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Fast Track Document/Child Custody. Corrected document due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-25463
|
09/01/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response Child Custody. (SC) | | 21-25498
|
09/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply to fast track response due: September 22, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26010
|
09/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Respondent's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-27557
|
09/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Fast Track. (SC) | | 21-28173
|
10/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file a reply to the fast track response. Respondent opposes the motion. The motion is denied. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a fast track reply that does not exceed 5 pages or 2,333 words. (SC) | | 21-28331
|
10/15/2021 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document, Fast Track Reply. (SC) | | 21-29723
|
10/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for leave to Late File fast Track Reply. (SC) | | 21-30216
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track reply due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-30364
|
10/28/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Proper Person Reply to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-31188
|
10/28/2021 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person's Request for Ruling. (SC) | | 22-05511
|
02/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Request to Submit Two Police Reports. (SC) | | 22-05527
|
03/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant has filed a motion for a ruling on the merits of this appeal and for leave to introduce two police reports that he offered into evidence in the proceedings below. The motion is denied. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the exhibits received on February 18, 2022. The motion for a ruling on the merits is granted to the following extent. This court will resolve the appeal as expeditiously as the court's calendar permits. (SC) | | 22-09749
|
04/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Order. (SC) | | 22-11969
|
04/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Order - Relief Sought by April 27, 2022. (SC) | | 22-12003
|
04/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Orders. (SC) | | 22-12702
|
04/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay District Court Orders. (SC) | | 22-12844
|
04/29/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgement of the district court AFFIRMED." fn13[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment. The motions to stay the custody order are denied as moot.] RP/EC/MG Nos. 82414/82693. (SC) | | 22-13646
|
05/16/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: May 31, 2022. (SC) | | 22-15453
|
06/06/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-17937
|
06/06/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Todd Matthew Phillips. Money Order no. 19-399608027. (SC) | | |
06/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). RP/EC/MG. (SC) | | 22-19315
|
06/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Stay Remittitur Pending Application to U.S. Supreme Court. (SC) | | 22-20246
|
07/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. Issuance of the remittitur shall be stayed until November 9, 2022. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by November 9, 2022, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by November 9, 2022, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-21563
|
09/26/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on September 15, 2022 and placed on the docket as Case No. 22-5622. (SC) | | 22-30184
|
11/28/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SC) | | 22-37109
|
11/29/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-37171
|
11/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/13/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Stay the Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-38974
|
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 30, 2022. (SC) | | 22-37171
|
12/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. This court will recall the remittitur only when, inadvertence, mistake of fact, or an incomplete knowledge of the circumstances of the case on the part of the court or its officers, whether induced by fraud or otherwise, has resulted in an unjust decision. Accordingly, the motion is denied. (SC) | | 22-39443
|