Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/01/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
03/01/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-05885
|
03/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 21-05887
|
03/02/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Niloofar Foughani. Check no. 155. (SC) | | |
03/11/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript if Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-07157
|
03/11/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-07159
|
03/12/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Matthew D. Francis and Arthur A. Zorio of the law firm of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, hereby enter their appearance as counsel for Respondent). (SC) | | 21-07237
|
03/16/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-07627
|
03/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-07629
|
03/19/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys, Rich Oshinski for Appellant. (SC) | | 21-08007
|
03/22/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-08130
|
03/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding counsel and Referring to Settlement Program. Attorneys Rick Oshinski and Mark Forsberg have filed a substitution of counsel purporting to substitute themselves as counsel in place of appellant. The substitution is construed as a notice of appearance and approved. The clerk shall add Mr. Oshinski and Mr. Forsberg as counsel of record for appellant. As all parties to this appeal are now represented by counsel, this matter is referred to this court's settlement program. (SC) | | 21-08706
|
03/30/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-09057
|
04/05/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript. (SC) | | 21-09722
|
04/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion For an Extension of Time to File Trial Court Record (First Judicial District Court Clerk's Office). (SC) | | 21-11061
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. I of XV. (SC) | | 21-11364
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. II of XV. (SC) | | 21-11365
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. III of XV. (SC) | | 21-11366
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. IV of XV. (SC) | | 21-11367
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. V of XV. (SC) | | 21-11369
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. VI of XV. (SC) | | 21-11372
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. VII of XV. (SC) | | 21-11373
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. VIII of XV. (SC) | | 21-11374
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. IX of XV. (SC) | | 21-11375
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. X of XV. (SC) | | 21-11376
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. XI of XV. (SC) | | 21-11377
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. XII of XV. (SC) | | 21-11378
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. XIII of XV. (SC) | | 21-11379
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. XIV of XV. (SC) | | 21-11380
|
04/20/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (09OC00579), Vol. XV of XV. (SC) | | 21-11381
|
04/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Appendix. The motion of the clerk of the district court for an extension of time to file the record on appeal is granted. The trial court record was filed on April 20, 2021. Because the trial court record has been filed in this appeal, the parties may, but are not required, to cite to that record in lieu of filing joint or separate appendices with their briefs. (SC) | | 21-11393
|
04/23/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-11749
|
06/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice (NRAP 27(a)(1)). (SC) | | 21-16054
|
06/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Untimely Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 21-16534
|
06/10/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's response to appellant's motion to take judicial notice due: June 25, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16647
|
06/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Untimely Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/23/21). (SC) | | |
06/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Untimely Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 21-18075
|
06/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-18110
|
06/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice (NRAP 27(a)(1)). (SC) | | 21-18220
|
06/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Untimely Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 21-18314
|
06/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a response to respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. The opposition was filed on June 25, 2021. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply in support of the motion. (SC) | | 21-18643
|
06/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Take Judicial Notice (NRAP 27(a)(4)). (SC) | | 21-18818
|
06/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Untimely Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 21-18827
|
07/27/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 11, 2021. (SC) | | 21-21665
|
07/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction, asserting that it was untimely filed. Appellant opposes the motion and respondent has replied. The motion to dismiss this appeal as untimely is denied. (SC) | | 21-22161
|
07/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant as filed a motion asking that this court take judicial notice of documents in a related bankruptcy case. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-22221
|
08/11/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-23303
|
09/07/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: September 24, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25850
|
09/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Take Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 21-27399
|
09/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27400
|
09/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Take Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 21-27977
|
09/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Take Judicial Notice. (SC) | | 21-28161
|
10/19/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: November 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30067
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion asking that this court take judicial notice of five affidavits of judgment filed in the district court after the docketing of this appeal. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-30320
|
11/04/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/4/21) | | |
11/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-31739
|
11/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-31864
|
11/05/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-05198
|
02/16/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP22-AS/EC/KP (SC) | | 22-05224
|
02/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's NRAP 38 Motion for Sanctions. (SC) | | 22-06117
|
03/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Respondent's NRAP 38 Motion for Sanctions. (SC) | | 22-06769
|
03/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-06846
|
03/03/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Mark R. Forsberg. (SC) | | |
03/08/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent shall have until March 24, 2022, to file and serve a reply in support of his motion for sanctions filed on February 24, 2022. (SC) | | 22-07377
|
03/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of NRAP 38 Motion for Sanctions. (SC) | | 22-09004
|
03/23/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [Respondent's motion for sanctions pursuant to NRAP 38 is denied.] (SC) | | 22-09136
|
04/05/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: April 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-10501
|
04/20/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-12483
|
05/04/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-14175
|
06/01/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-17294
|
06/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2022. (SC) | | 22-17294
|