Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/10/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
03/10/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-06984
|
03/10/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-06986
|
03/15/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Law Firm of Herb Santos, Jr. Check no. 9449. (SC) | | |
03/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-07433
|
03/18/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jonathan L. Andrews. (SC) | | 21-07819
|
04/01/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Timothy E. Rowe. (SC) | | 21-09442
|
04/02/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil. (SC) | | 21-09650
|
04/09/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 19, 2021, at 1:00 pm. (SC). | | 21-10305
|
07/14/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 19, 2021, at 9:00 AM. The settlement judge requests a 90 day extension of the settlement process. (SC) | | 21-20255
|
07/15/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to December 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20423
|
10/20/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-30130
|
10/21/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-30290
|
11/03/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-31569
|
01/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/19/22) (SC) | | |
01/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 22-01893
|
01/19/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-01945
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-01950
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-01951
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-01952
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 22-01953
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-01954
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-01955
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-01957
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-01958
|
01/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-01961
|
02/17/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-05277
|
03/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-06869
|
04/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-10218
|
04/01/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Reply Brief. Vol. 10 (SC) | | 22-10219
|
04/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/11/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/AS/MG. (SC) | | 22-25186
|
08/25/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Herb Santos check no. 10505. (SC) | | |
08/25/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-26657
|
09/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-27605
|
09/16/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-29164
|
09/27/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). RP/AS/MG. (SC) | | 22-30372
|
10/11/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-32105
|
11/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-34358
|
11/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Amended Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondents' answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-34631
|
11/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-36297
|
12/08/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC fn1 [The Honorable Justice Silver having retired did not participate in the decision on rehearing.] (SC) | | 22-38595
|
01/03/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-00027
|
01/03/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/17/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on January 5, 2022. (SC) | | 23-00027
|