Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82649
Short Caption:NUVEDA, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (TERRY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82767
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A817363Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/15/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Mitchell D. Stipp. (SC)
03/23/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)21-08251
03/23/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-08254
03/23/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-08255
03/23/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay Contempt Proceedings in the District Court Under NRAP 8(a) and 27(E). [Action Requested by Nevada Supreme Court on or before 9 am on April 5, 2021]. (SC)21-08306
04/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay. Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. We have reviewed the motion for stay. We grant the motion and hereby stay the district court contempt proceedings in this matter pending further order of this court. (SC)21-09610
04/23/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interests' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-11833
04/23/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ - Vol. 1. (SC)21-11835
04/23/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ - Vol. 2. (SC)21-11836
05/06/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Telephonic. Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ due: May 21, 2021. (SC)21-13073
05/21/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-14699
09/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-26697
09/23/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-27497
09/27/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-27790
09/27/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Mitchell D. Stipp. (SC)
09/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Errata To Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-27799
10/11/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-29037
11/09/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-32203
11/09/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)